This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2018 at 07:46:04 (UTC).

Amorissani, Claude et al v. United Fire & Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 Amorissani, Claude filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United Fire Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00677

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Counter Defendants, Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

Steven Des Forge

Life Insurance Company of North America

Clause Amorissani

Group Health Cooperative of Eau Claire

Radial Commerce, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan

Linda Des Forge

Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services

Julie Des Forge-Amorissani

Grace Des Forge

Mayo Medical Plan

State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services

United Fire & Casualty Company

Claude Amorissani

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

Kevin Bartlett

Life Insurance Company of North America

Westfield Insurance Co.

Moran Transportation Corp.

Group Health Cooperative of Eau Claire

Radial Commerce, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan

Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services

Mayo Medical Plan

State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services

United Fire & Casualty Company

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Steven Des Forge

Linda Des Forge

Julie Des Forge-Amorissani

Grace Des Forge

Claude Amorissani

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

Group Health Cooperative of Eau Claire

Radial Commerce, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan

United Fire & Casualty Company

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Dana Wachs

Attorney at Richie, Wickstrom & Wachs, Llp

101 Putnam Street, P.O. Box 390

Eau Claire, WI 54702

Robert John Gingras

Attorney at Gingras, Cates & Luebke, S.C.

8150 Excelsior Dr.

Madison, WI 53717

Riley Leonard

Attorney at Gingras, Cates & Luebke

8150 Excelsior Drive

Madison, WI 53717

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Maria D. Sanders

Attorney at Peterson, Johnson, & Murray

733 North Van Buren Street, 6Th Floor

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Matthew Robert Falk

Attorney at Falk Legal Group

740 North Plankinton Avenue, Suite 800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Matthew Shawn Mayer

Attorney at Mallery & Zimmerman, S.C.

500 Third Street, Suite 800, P.O. Box 479

Wausau, WI 54402

Jesus Gabriel Garza

Attorney at State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services

1 West Wilson Street, Po Box 7850

Madison, WI 53707-7850

Russ J. Delury

Attorney at Kolb Clare & Arnold, PSC

125 North Executive Drive, Suite 206

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Matthew Robert Falk

Attorney at Falk Legal Group

740 North Plankinton Avenue, Suite 800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Matthew Shawn Mayer

Attorney at Mallery & Zimmerman, S.C.

500 Third Street, Suite 800, P.O. Box 479

Wausau, WI 54402

Russ J. Delury

Attorney at Kolb Clare & Arnold, PSC

125 North Executive Drive, Suite 206

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Maria D. Sanders

Attorney at Peterson, Johnson, & Murray

733 North Van Buren Street, 6Th Floor

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Jesus Gabriel Garza

Attorney at State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services

1 West Wilson Street, Po Box 7850

Madison, WI 53707-7850

Russ J. Delury

Attorney at Kolb Clare & Arnold, PSC

125 North Executive Drive, Suite 206

Brookfield, WI 53005

 

Court Documents

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2299362) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Kevin Bartlett, Moran Transportation Corp., Westfield Insurance Co. (jat) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#3

(#3) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Kevin Bartlett served on 8/19/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Moran Transportation Corp. served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#5

(#5) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Westfield Insurance Co. served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs may have until 9/5/2018 to file and serve an amended complaint containing good faith allegations sufficient to establish complete diversity of citizenship. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/22/2018. (arw) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kevin Bartlett, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Group Health Cooperative of Eau Claire, Life Insurance Company of North America, Mayo Medical Plan, Moran Transportation Corp., Radial Commerce, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services, United Fire & Casualty Company, Westfield Insurance Co., filed by Grace Des Forge, Steven Des Forge, Claude Amorissani, Linda Des Forge, Julie Des Forge-Amorissani. (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#44

(#44) ANSWER to Crossclaim by Defendants Kevin Bartlett, Moran Transportation Corp., Westfield Insurance Co. (Sanders, Maria) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#43

(#43) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant United Fire & Casualty Company. (Delury, Russ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#42

(#42) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Radial Commerce, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan. (Mayer, Matthew) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#41

(#41) ANSWER to Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Defendants Kevin Bartlett, Moran Transportation Corporation and Westfield Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Claude Amorissani by Defendant Radial Commerce, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan. (Mayer, Matthew) Modified on 10/5/2018. (lak) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#40

(#40) Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Shawn Mayer for Defendant Radial Commerce, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan. (Mayer, Matthew) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#37

(#37) Motion to Dismiss by Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Garza, Jesus) Modified on 9/25/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

37 #2

Certificate of Service

37 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#38

(#38) Affidavit of Jesus G.Q. Garza filed by Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services re: #37 Motion to Dismiss. (Garza, Jesus) Modified on 9/25/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ANSWER to Crossclaim by Defendants Kevin Bartlett, Moran Transportation Corp., Westfield Insurance Co. (Sanders, Maria) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant United Fire & Casualty Company. (Delury, Russ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Radial Commerce, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan. (Mayer, Matthew) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ANSWER to Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Defendants Kevin Bartlett, Moran Transportation Corporation and Westfield Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Claude Amorissani by Defendant Radial Commerce, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan. (Mayer, Matthew) Modified on 10/5/2018. (lak) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Shawn Mayer for Defendant Radial Commerce, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan. (Mayer, Matthew) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • (#39) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services is dismissed from this action with prejudice, and it releases and discharges its subrogation lien resulting from a claim under Wis. Stat. 49.89(2), without costs to any party and without further notice. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 9/26/2018. (arw) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Affidavit of Jesus G.Q. Garza filed by Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services re: #37 Motion to Dismiss. (Garza, Jesus) Modified on 9/25/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Motion to Dismiss by Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Garza, Jesus) Modified on 9/25/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Notice of Appearance filed by Jesus Gabriel Garza for Cross Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (Garza, Jesus) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Reply to Counterclaim by Plaintiffs Claude Amorissani, Grace Des Forge, Linda Des Forge, Steven Des Forge, Julie Des Forge-Amorissani. (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Claude Amorissani, Grace Des Forge, Linda Des Forge, Steven Des Forge, Julie Des Forge-Amorissani. (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kevin Bartlett, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Group Health Cooperative of Eau Claire, Life Insurance Company of North America, Mayo Medical Plan, Moran Transportation Corp., Radial Commerce, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services, United Fire & Casualty Company, Westfield Insurance Co., filed by Grace Des Forge, Steven Des Forge, Claude Amorissani, Linda Des Forge, Julie Des Forge-Amorissani. (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs may have until 9/5/2018 to file and serve an amended complaint containing good faith allegations sufficient to establish complete diversity of citizenship. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/22/2018. (arw) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Westfield Insurance Co. served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Moran Transportation Corp. served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Kevin Bartlett served on 8/19/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Kevin Bartlett, Moran Transportation Corp., Westfield Insurance Co. (jat) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2299362) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Gingras, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.