This case was last updated from PACER on 02/06/2019 at 01:14:00 (UTC).

AMERSON v. DOZIER

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 AMERSON filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against DOZIER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES H WEIGLE and TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00376

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CHARLES H WEIGLE

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON

Sparta, GA 31087

Defendants

SGT SERRIA HARRISON

KATHERINE WELLS

SGT FREDRICK WILSON

KANDI STEPHENS

MELONTAE HAVIOR

JEREMY FOSTON

KYNA WALLS

LT UNTRAY BELLINGER

GREGORY DOZIER

SHELIA CLARK

BRUSTAVIOIUS COOPER

ASHKEA LEWIS

GEORGE IVEY, JR

MICHAEL PASCHAL

PATRICIA MAPP

ANNETTIA ASHLEY-TOBY

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Envelope

14 #1

Cover Letter

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER re #9 Letter, #10 Letter, #7 Mail Returned, #8 Mail Returned, #5 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a third copy of the Consent Form, ECF No. 5. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 11/30/2018. (ggs) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

12 #15

Certificate of Service

12 #14

Exhibit R - Letter to Commissioner Gregory Dozier 11/10/2018

12 #11

Exhibit O - Emergency Grievance filed on Medical 11/7/208

12 #7

Exhibit K - Emergency Grievance 10/19/2018

12 #5

Exhibit I - Grievance Appeal No. 274172 10/17/2018

12 #4

Exhibit H - Letter to Betty Joyce Amerson

12 #2

Exhibit F - Grievance dated 9/24/2018

#10

(#10) Letter from G. Sellers in response re #9 Letter (ggs) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Letter from CHRISTOPHER AMERSON regarding status of case and mail sent to him by the US District Court, Athens Division. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned - #5 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON, #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge sent to CHRISTOPHER L. AMERSON returned as undeliverable. (ggs) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned - #5 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON, #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge sent to CHRISTOPHER L. AMERSON returned as undeliverable. (ggs) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#5

(#5) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON (ggs) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

1 #1

Cover Letter

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER re #9 Letter, #10 Letter, #7 Mail Returned, #8 Mail Returned, #5 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a third copy of the Consent Form, ECF No. 5. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 11/30/2018. (ggs) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • REMARK: Docket sheet mailed to Christopher Amerson (ggs) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) EXHIBIT(S) by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Grievance No. 273006, #2 Exhibit F - Grievance dated 9/24/2018, #3 Exhibit G - Grievance No. 274172, #4 Exhibit H - Letter to Betty Joyce Amerson, #5 Exhibit I - Grievance Appeal No. 274172 10/17/2018, #6 Exhibit J - GRI/on Libranan Ms. Lewis, #7 Exhibit K - Emergency Grievance 10/19/2018, #8 Exhibit L - Emergency Grievance on Foods Service 10/12/2018, #9 Exhibit M - Declaration of Christopher Amerson, #10 Exhibit N - Statement submitted to Ivey/Warden, #11 Exhibit O - Emergency Grievance filed on Medical 11/7/208, #12 Exhibit P - Grievance Filed on Grievance Procedure 11/14/2018, #13 Exhibit Q - Letter to Federal BOP 11/26/2018, #14 Exhibit R - Letter to Commissioner Gregory Dozier 11/10/2018, #15 Certificate of Service, #16 Envelope)(ggs) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Change of Address to Smith State Prison (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • REMARK: Docket sheet mailed to CHRISTOPHER AMERSON. (ggs) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from G. Sellers in response re #9 Letter (ggs) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter from CHRISTOPHER AMERSON regarding status of case and mail sent to him by the US District Court, Athens Division. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Mail Returned - #5 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON, #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge sent to CHRISTOPHER L. AMERSON returned as undeliverable. (ggs) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned - #5 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON, #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge sent to CHRISTOPHER L. AMERSON returned as undeliverable. (ggs) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Statement ofr Christopher Amerson, #2 Exhibit C - Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) ***NOTE There was no "Exhibit A" enclosed.(ggs) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON (ggs) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles H. Weigle issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CHRISTOPHER L AMERSON. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ggs) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less