This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2018 16:01:50

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/28/2017 a Intellectual Property - Copyright case was filed by American Society For Testing against Public Resource Org, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit.

Case Details

  • Case Number 17-7035
  • Filing Date 02/28/2017
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Intellectual Property - Copyright
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Courts Of Appeals
  • Courthouse U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

Party Details

  • Amicus Curiae David Michaels
  • Represented By
    • Charles Duan
  • Amicus Curiae Bruce R. James
  • Represented By
    • Charles Duan
  • Amicus Curiae Robert B. Reich
  • Represented By
    • Charles Duan
  • Amicus Curiae American Society Of Safety Engineers
  • Represented By
    • Bonnie Hochman Rothell
  • Amicus Curiae Beth Williams
  • Represented By
    • Charles Duan
  • Amicus Curiae Edward Felten
  • Represented By
    • Charles Duan
  • Amicus Curiae Yvette Joy Liebesman
  • Represented By
    • Charles Duan
  • Amicus Curiae Margaret Chon
  • Represented By
    • Charles Duan
  • Amicus Curiae Megan J. Smith
  • Represented By
    • Charles Duan
  • Amicus Curiae Roger Skalbeck
  • Represented By
    • Charles Duan

Court Documents

Open Document

OPINION [1740942] filed (Pages: 37) for the Court by Judge T...

Free with Subscription
Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER [1728460] filed allocating oral argument ti...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Tatel, Wilkins and Katsas. ...

Fees Apply
Open Document

APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1718058] filed by Public.Resource.Org...

Fees Apply
Open Document

APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1718049] filed by American Society for...

Fees Apply
Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [17-7035, 17-7...

Fees Apply
Open Document

AMICUS FOR APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1718064] filed by Public C...

Fees Apply
Open Document

APPELLANT FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1718060] filed by Public.Resour...

Fees Apply
Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1740943] filed withholding issuance of the ma...

Fees Apply
Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1721464] filed scheduling oral argument on Mo...

Fees Apply
Open Document

PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1740935] filed that the District Courts...

Fees Apply
Open Document

APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1718044] filed by American Educational...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 08/28/2018 10:09 AM]
  • 07/17/2018
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1740943] filed withholding issuance of the mandate. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 07/17/2018 10:58 AM]
  • 07/17/2018
  • OPINION [1740942] filed (Pages: 37) for the Court by Judge Tatel, CONCURRING OPINION (Pages: 3) by Judge Katsas. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 07/17/2018 10:57 AM]
  • 07/17/2018
  • PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1740935] filed that the District Courts permanent injunctions be vacated, the partial grant of summary judgment against PRO be reversed, and the case is hereby remanded to the District Court for further proceedings, for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Tatel, Wilkins, and Katsas. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 07/17/2018 10:53 AM]
  • 05/14/2018
  • ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Tatel, Wilkins and Katsas. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 05/15/2018 11:26 AM]
  • 05/03/2018
  • FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Corynne McSherry, on behalf of Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [17-7035, 17-7039] (McSherry, Corynne) [Entered: 05/03/2018 03:35 PM]
  • 05/02/2018
  • FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., on behalf of Appellees National Fire Protection Association, Inc., American Society for Testing and Materials and American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. in 17-7035, Appellees National Fire Protection Association, Inc., American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-conditioning Engineers, Inc., American Society for Testing and Materials and American Educational Research Association, Inc. in 17-7039 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [17-7035, 17-7039] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 05/02/2018 03:38 PM]
  • 04/27/2018
  • PER CURIAM ORDER [1728460] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellant - 15 Minutes, Appellees - 15 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 05/07/2018 [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 04/27/2018 10:33 AM]
  • 03/09/2018
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1721464] filed scheduling oral argument on Monday, 05/14/2018. [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 03/09/2018 11:21 AM]
  • 02/14/2018
  • AMICUS FOR APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1718064] filed by Public Citizen, Inc., Center for Science in the Public Interest, Consumers Union, National Employment Law Project and United States Public Interest Research Group, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 02/14/2018 ] Length of Brief: 4,989 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Rosenbaum, Adina) [Entered: 02/14/2018 05:47 PM]
  • 02/14/2018
  • APPELLANT FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1718060] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 02/14/2018 ] Length of Brief: 8,997 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 02/14/2018 05:16 PM]
  • 02/14/2018
  • APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1718058] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 02/14/2018 ] Length of Brief: 12,959 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 02/14/2018 05:12 PM]
  • 02/14/2018
  • APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1718049] filed by American Society for Testing and Materials, American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. and National Fire Protection Association, Inc. in 17-7035 [Service Date: 02/14/2018 ] Length of Brief: 11,206 Words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 02/14/2018 04:55 PM]
  • 02/14/2018
  • APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1718044] filed by American Educational Research Association, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc. and National Council on Measurement In Education, Inc. in 17-7039 [Service Date: 02/14/2018 ] Length of Brief: 5,931 words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Elgarten, Clifton) [Entered: 02/14/2018 04:41 PM]
  • 02/02/2018
  • APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1716359] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039 [Service Date: 02/02/2018 ] Length of Brief: 8,993 Words. [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 02/02/2018 07:13 PM]
  • 01/31/2018
  • REDACTED JOINT APPENDIX [1715850] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035, 17-7039. [Volumes: 6] [Service Date: 01/31/2018 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 01/31/2018 06:52 PM]
  • 01/31/2018
  • NOTICE [1715802] of submission of paper filing filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035 [Service Date: 01/31/2018 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Bridges, Andrew) [Entered: 01/31/2018 03:27 PM]
  • 01/31/2018
  • SEALED APPENDIX [1715754] filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-7035. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 01/31/2018 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] [Entered: 01/31/2018 02:00 PM]
  • 01/30/2018
  • LETTER [1715483] advising of arguing counsel's availability for oral argument filed by American Educational Research Association, Inc., American Psychological Association, Inc. and National Council on Measurement In Education, Inc. in 17-7039 [Service Date: 01/30/2018 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Elgarten, Clifton) [Entered: 01/30/2018 01:54 PM]
  • 01/25/2018
  • LETTER [1714688] advising of arguing counsel's availability for oral argument filed by American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. in 17-7035 [Service Date: 01/25/2018 ] [17-7035, 17-7039] (Wetzel, Joseph) [Entered: 01/25/2018 02:07 PM]

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.