This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2021 at 18:46:50 (UTC).

American Sales Company, LLC v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2014 American Sales Company, LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Pfizer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas E. Miller and Arenda L. Wright Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00361

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Miller

Presiding Judge

Arenda L. Wright Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Sales Company, LLC

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.

Cesar Castillo, Inc.

Defendants and Consolidated Defendants

Pfizer Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd.

G.D. Searle LLC

Pfizer, Inc.

Interested Parties

Greenstone LLC

Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Defendant, Consolidated Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

William Hanes Monroe, Jr.

580 E Main St, Suite 600

Norfolk, VA 23510

David Scott Nalven

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP (MA-NA)

55 Cambridge Pkwy, Suite 301

Cambridge, MA 02142

Kenneth Pickle

Attorney at Radice Law Firm PC

34 Sunset Blvd

Long Beach, NJ 08008

Jessica Rose MacAuley

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP (MA-NA)

55 Cambridge Pkwy, Suite 301

Cambridge, MA 02142

Kristen Anne Johnson

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP (MA-NA)

55 Cambridge Pkwy, Suite 301

Cambridge, MA 02142

Alfred Luke Smith

Attorney at Radice Law Firm PC

34 Sunset Blvd

Long Beach, NJ 08008

Barry Steven Taus

Attorney at Taus, Cebulash & Landau LLP

80 Maiden Ln, Suite 1204

New York, NY 10038

Joseph Thomas Lukens

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP (PA-NA)

One Penn Center, Suite 1550, 1617 John F. Kennedy Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Linda Phyllis Nussbaum

Attorney at Nussbaum Law Group P. C.

1211 Avenue Of The Americas, Floor 40

New York, NY 10036

Defendant, Consolidated Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

Farrah Robyn Berse

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP (NY-NA)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Jayashree Mitra

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Sheryn George

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Bryan Gant

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Jaime Manuel Crowe

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 13Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005-3807

Stephen Edward Noona

Attorney at Kaufman & Canoles, P.C.

150 W Main St, Suite 2100

Norfolk, VA 23510

Brendan Woodard

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Adam Robert Gahtan

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Mark Edward Warmbier

Attorney at Kaufman & Canoles PC (Norfolk)

150 W Main St, Suite 2100, Po Box 3037

Norfolk, VA 23510

Amit Thakore

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY-NA)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

William Hanes Monroe, Jr.

580 E Main St, Suite 600

Norfolk, VA 23510

Zarema A. Jaramillo

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP (DC-NA)

2200 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw, Suite 500E

Washington, DC 20037

27 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#636

635 #2

Proposed Order Revised Proposed Order

635 #1

Exhibit Revised Exhibit B.

#635

634 #2

Exhibit B. Class Member Shares

634 #1

Exhibit A. Proof of Claim and Release

#634

633 #1

Proposed Order Re Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Funds

#633

4 #1

Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Applications

#4

3 #1

Letter

#3

1 #3

Receipt

1 #2

Letter

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

#2

1,512 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#636) ORDER granting #633 Motion For Distribution of Net Settlement Fund Unopposed. (See order for details). Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 3/8/2019. (clou) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#635) NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #634 Declaration, Notice of Filing Revised Exhibit B to the Declaration of Angie Birdsell in Support of DPP's Unopposed Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Exhibit B., #2 Proposed Order Revised Proposed Order)(Monroe, William) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#634) Declaration re #633 MOTION For Distribution of Net Settlement Fund Unopposed (Declaration of Angie Birdsell) by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Proof of Claim and Release, #2 Exhibit B. Class Member Shares)(Monroe, William) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#633) MOTION For Distribution of Net Settlement Fund Unopposed by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Funds)(Monroe, William) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#632) TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 04/18/2018, before Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen, Court Reporter/Transcriber Heidi Jeffreys, Telephone number 757-222-7075. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 6/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2018.(jeffreys, heidi) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#631) ORDER for Approval of Proposed Claim Form to be Utilized in Administration of Settlement re #626 MOTION For Approval of Proposed Claim Form to be Utilized in Administration of Settlement. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 4/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (clou) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#630) FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Order granting #617 Motion for Attorney Fees and #622 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Distribution. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 4/18/18. (lhow) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#629) NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #622 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, Entry of Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A. Claim Form)(Monroe, William) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#628) Final Approval of Settlement Hearing held on 4/18/2018 before District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen: William Monroe, Thomas Sobol, Kristen Johnson, Steven Noona and Raj Gandesha present. Opening statements and arguments of Counsel heard by the Court. Comments of Court. Order entered and filed in open court granting #622 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and #617 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Heidi Jeffreys.)(lhow) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#626) MOTION For Approval of Proposed Claim Form to be Utilized in Administration of Settlement re #622 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, Entry of Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal by American Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Proof of Claim and Release)(Monroe, William) (Entered: 03/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
632 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #5 the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Scott Nalven as certified by Local Counsel William H. Monroe, Jr. for the Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 7/17/2014. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #4 , the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas M. Sobol as certified by Local Counsel William H. Monroe, Jr. for the Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 7/17/2014. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 07/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketCase transferred in from Alexandria Division. Case Number 1:14cv826. (afar) (Entered: 07/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER It appearing that this action should be transferred to the Norfolk Division of this Court, it is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 7/14/14. (klau, ) (Entered: 07/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristen Johnson Parker and Certification of Local Counsel William H. Monroe, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4034852. by American Sales Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Applications)(Monroe, William) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Scott Nalven and Certification of Local Counsel William H. Monroe, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4034843. by American Sales Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Applications)(Monroe, William) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas M. Sobol and Certification of Local Counsel William H. Monroe, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4034801. by American Sales Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Applications)(Monroe, William) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued and mailed to attorney for service by SPS as to G.D. Searle LLC, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(klau, ) (Entered: 07/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against G.D. Searle LLC, Pfizer Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., Pfizer, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 24683023829.), filed by American Sales Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Receipt)(klau, ) Modified on 7/7/2014 (dcap, ). (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by American Sales Company, LLC (klau, ) (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G.D. Searle LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Greenstone LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cesar Castillo, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant