This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2019 at 07:13:53 (UTC).

AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 AMERICAN OVERSIGHT filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reggie B. Walton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02840

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reggie B. Walton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN OVERSIGHT

1030 15Th Street Nw, B255

Washington, DC 20005

Defendants

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET

EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW

U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE

U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES

U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Francis Yenouskas

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER, LLP

901 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900, 9Th Floor East

Washington, DC 20001

Glenn S. Kerner

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER, LLP

The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

April Sun

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kimberly Prior

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Austin Ridgely Evers

Attorney at AMERICAN OVERSIGHT

1030 15Th Street, Nw, Suite B255

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorney

Marina Utgoff Braswell

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Declaration of April Sun

#7

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order

6 #1

Declaration of Kimberly Prior

#6

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

#4

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order

3 #1

Declaration of Glenn S. Kerner

#3

#2

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER. In light of the continued lapse in appropriations, it is hereby ORDERED that the previously imposed deadline for filing a joint status report on or before January 28, 2019, is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before fourteen days after appropriations have been restored, the parties shall file a joint status report proposing new deadlines in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 23, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2019 (hs) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 11, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #10 Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the defendants seek to vacate the impending deadlines in this case. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the impending deadlines in this case are VACATED pending further Order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 28, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding how this case shall proceed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 11, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Stay (Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse in Appropriations) by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Ridgely Evers on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of All Defendants (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's #7 Motion for Admission, Pro Hac Vice, of April Sun as Additional Counsel for Plaintiff, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that April Sun, Goodwin Procter LLP, 3 Embarcadero Center, San Francisco, CA 94111, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 18, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- April Sun, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 3 Embarcadero Center, San Francisco, CA 94111-4003. Phone No. - (415) 733-6000. Fax No. - (415) 677-9041 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5844004. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of April Sun, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's #6 Motion for Admission, Pro Hac Vice, of Kimberly Prior as Additional Counsel for Plaintiff, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Kimberly Prior, Goodwin Procter LLP, 100 Northern Avenue, Boston, MA 02210, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 17, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's #3 Motion for Admission, Pro Hac Vice, of Glenn S. Kerner as Additional Counsel for Plaintiff, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Glenn S. Kerner, Goodwin Procter LLP, 620 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY 10018, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 17, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kimberly Prior, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 100 Northern Avenue, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - (617)570-3907. Fax No. - (617)523-1231 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5833280. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kimberly Prior, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT.(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, ) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Glenn S. Kerner, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 620 Eighth Avenue. Phone No. - (212)459-7460. Fax No. - (212)355-3333 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5822091. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn S. Kerner, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Yenouskas, Joseph) Modified event title on 12/17/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5821905) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Marshals Service (USMS) is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN OVERSIGHT is a litigant

Latest cases where EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW is a litigant