This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2018 at 07:03:14 (UTC).

American National Red Cross v. Simple Clinic LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 American National Red Cross filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Simple Clinic LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vicki Miles-LaGrange. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vicki Miles-LaGrange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American National Red Cross

Defendants

Simple Clinic LLC

Brett Cauthen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John D Stiner

Attorney at Stiner Law Firm PLLC

119 N Robinson, Suite 320

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Joseph H Bocock

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Kerry D Green

Attorney at Edward L White PC

829 E 33Rd St

Edmond, OK 73013

Edward L White

Attorney at Edward L White PC

829 E 33Rd St

Edmond, OK 73013

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(White, Edward) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#12

(#12) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (White, Edward) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Defendants, Simple Clinic, LLC d/b/a Today Clinic's and Brett Cauthen's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their answer to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than February 12, 2018. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 2/8/2018. (ks) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

#11

(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry D Green on behalf of All Defendants (Green, Kerry) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

#10

(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Edward L White on behalf of All Defendants (White, Edward) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

9 #2

Attachment

9 #1

Attachment

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Red Cross. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Bocock, Joseph) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Red Cross. All Defendants. (Bocock, Joseph) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

7 #1

Attachment Certified return receipt

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Red Cross. Simple Clinic LLC served on 1/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified return receipt)(Bocock, Joseph) STRICKEN BY NOTICE FILED 1/12/2018. (Entered: 01/11/2018)

6 #1

Attachment Certified return receipt

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Red Cross. Brett Cauthen served on 1/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified return receipt)(Bocock, Joseph) STRICKEN BY NOTICE FILED 1/12/2018. (Entered: 01/11/2018)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by American National Red Cross . (Bocock, Joseph) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph H Bocock on behalf of American National Red Cross (Bocock, Joseph) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by John D Stiner on behalf of American National Red Cross (Stiner, John) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Brett Cauthen, Simple Clinic LLC. (ac) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(White, Edward) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Defendants, Simple Clinic, LLC d/b/a Today Clinic's and Brett Cauthen's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their answer to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than February 12, 2018. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 2/8/2018. (ks) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (White, Edward) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry D Green on behalf of All Defendants (Green, Kerry) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Edward L White on behalf of All Defendants (White, Edward) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Red Cross. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Bocock, Joseph) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Red Cross. All Defendants. (Bocock, Joseph) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Docket Annotation: Stricken by notice 1/12/2018 6 and 7 Summons Returned Executed. Summons not filed with original stamped summons. Correct copies will be refiled. (ac) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Red Cross. Simple Clinic LLC served on 1/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified return receipt)(Bocock, Joseph) STRICKEN BY NOTICE FILED 1/12/2018. (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Red Cross. Brett Cauthen served on 1/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified return receipt)(Bocock, Joseph) STRICKEN BY NOTICE FILED 1/12/2018. (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by American National Red Cross . (Bocock, Joseph) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph H Bocock on behalf of American National Red Cross (Bocock, Joseph) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by John D Stiner on behalf of American National Red Cross (Stiner, John) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE American National Red Cross Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2623152. (Bocock, Joseph) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Brett Cauthen, Simple Clinic LLC. (ac) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Brett Cauthen, Simple Clinic LLC filed by American National Red Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint--USPTO Status Report, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint--Registration Certificates, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint--Screenshots, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint--Representative Samples, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.