This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2018 at 08:05:24 (UTC).

American National Property and Casualty Company v. Estate of Jason Farese et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 American National Property and Casualty Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Estate of Jason Farese. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy, Neal B. Biggers, Jane M. Virden and Debra M. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00177

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Roy Percy

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judges

Neal B. Biggers

Debra M. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American National Property and Casualty Company

Defendants

Estate of Angela Roark Poole

North Mississippi Equipment, Inc.

Oxford University Aircraft Charters, LLC

Estate of Lea Farese

Leslie Herring Miley

Estate of Jason Farese

Estate of Michael McConnell Perry

Robert Perry

Oxford Aircraft Charters, LLC

John S. Farese

James K. Warrington

Estate of Kimberly Westerfield Perry

Estate of Austin Poole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James L. Cresswell

Attorney at PETKOFF AND FEIGELSON, PLLC

305 Washington Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-1911

James Lamar Cresswell, Jr.

Attorney at PETKOFF & FEIGELSON

305 Washington Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-1911

Defendant Attorneys

Tom T. Ross, Jr.

Attorney at HUNT ROSS & ALLEN

P. O. Box 1196, 123 Court St.

Clarksdale, MS 38614-1196

William B. Raiford, III

Attorney at Chapman, Lewis & Swan

P. O. Box 428

Clarksdale, MS 38614-1388

Bailey R. Fair

Attorney at WATKINS & EAGER

400 E. Capitol St.

Jackson, MS 39202

Hugh Ruston Comley

Attorney at WATKINS & EAGER

P. O. Box 650

Jackson, MS 39205-0650

Richard Lee Kimmel

Attorney at UPSHAW, WILLIAMS, BIGGERS, BECKHAM & RIDDICK

P.O. Drawer 8230

Greenwood, MS 38930-8230

Lawrence John Tucker, Jr.

Attorney at HICKMAN, GOZA & SPRAGINS, PLLC

P O Drawer 668

Oxford, MS 38655-0668

Hal S. Spragins

Attorney at HICKMAN, GOZA & SPRAGINS, PLLC

P O Drawer 668

Oxford, MS 38655-0668

Benjamin M. Watson

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 38157

Robert A. Miller

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Christopher Nicklaus Bailey

Attorney at JACKS GRIFFITH LUCIANO, P.A.

P.O. Box 1209, 150 North Sharpe Avenue

Cleveland, MS 38732

 

Court Documents

#43

#41

25 #11

Exhibit 11 - Order Setting Hearing

25 #9

Exhibit 9 - American National Property and Casualty Companys Motion for Voluntar

25 #8

Exhibit 8 - Estate of Lea Farese Answer to Complaint

25 #4

Exhibit 4 - Defendants James K. Warrington, as Guardian of K.E.W, W.A.W., and J.

25 #3

Exhibit 3 - Defendants Kurt Rademacher, Executor of the Estate of Michael McConn

25 #2

Exhibit 2 - Leslie H. Mileys, as the parent and legal guardian of K.W.P. and W.J

25 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint for Interpleader and for Other Relief

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit Indictment

1 #2

Exhibit Perry Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit Certified Policy

#1

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Nicklaus Bailey on behalf of James K. Warrington (Bailey, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) JOINDER re #41 Response in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION to Dismiss, . (Fair, Bailey) Modified on 10/19/2018 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) RESPONSE in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Estate of Kimberly Westerfield Perry, Estate of Michael McConnell Perry, Robert Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Setting Hearing on Motions 10-11-18, #2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript of Hearing, #3 Exhibit 3 - ANPAC Response in Opposition to Perry Defendants MSJ, #4 Exhibit 4 - Complaint for Interpleader, #5 Exhibit 5 - Perry Defendants Answer to Complaint for Interpleader) (Gregory, Haley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to James K. Warrington (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Lee Kimmel on behalf of Estate of Jason Farese, Oxford Aircraft Charters, LLC (Kimmel, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Case Management Conference RESET for 11/20/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bailey R. Fair on behalf of Leslie Herring Miley (Fair, Bailey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Magistrate Judge Roy Percy no longer assigned to the case. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #35 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Perry Defendants re #25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. (Cresswell, James) Modified on 10/12/2018 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. (Cresswell, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lamar Cresswell, Jr on behalf of American National Property and Casualty Company Estate of Lea Farese served on 9/7/2018. (Cresswell, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lamar Cresswell, Jr on behalf of American National Property and Casualty Company Estate of Jason Farese served on 9/7/2018. (Cresswell, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lamar Cresswell, Jr on behalf of American National Property and Casualty Company Oxford Aircraft Charters, LLC served on 9/7/2018. (Cresswell, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Laman Cresswell, Jr on behalf of American National Property and Casualty Company Oxford University Aircraft Charters, LLC served on 9/7/2018. (Cresswell, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Case Reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown. Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers no longer assigned to the case. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 9/10/2018. (llw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE STATEMENT OF AMERICAN NATIONAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Cresswell, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Estate of Angela Roark Poole; Estate of Austin Poole; Estate of Jason Farese; Estate of Kimberly Westerfield Perry; Estate of Lea Farese; Estate of Michael McConnell Perry; John S. Farese; Leslie Herring Miley; North Mississippi Equipment, Inc.; Oxford Aircraft Charters, LLC; Oxford University Aircraft Charters, LLC; Robert Perry; James K. Warrington. (rcm) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF NON-LIABILITY OF INSURER; Filing fee $400, receipt number 0537-1586389, filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #(2) Exhibit B - Perry Complaint, #(3) Exhibit C - NTSB Final Report, #(4) Exhibit D - Indictment, #(5) Civil Cover Sheet) (rcm) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN NATIONAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James L. Cresswell, Jr.