This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2019 at 07:01:30 (UTC).

American GNC Corporation v. GoPro, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 American GNC Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GoPro, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donna M. Ryu and Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-06778

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Donna M. Ryu

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American GNC Corporation

Defendants

Robert Bosch GmbH

Bosch Sensortec GmbH

GoPro, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory S. Markow

Attorney at CGS3, LLP

12750 High Bluff Drive, Suite 250

San Diego, CA 92130

Alison A. Richards

Attorney at Global IP Law Group, LLC

55 W. Monroe, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60603

David Powers Berten

Attorney at Global IP Law Group, LLC

55 W. Monroe, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Bas de Blank

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94205

Diana Rutowski

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Frances Sargent Cheever

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Diana Marie Rutowski

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Adam Robert Brausa

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Timothy Chen Saulsbury

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Timothy Patrick Horgan-Kobelski

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Allyson Roz Bennett

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

530 Molino Street, Suite 111, Los Angeles

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Mark A Lemley

Attorney at Durie Tangri, LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#63

#61

#60

#59

#58

#57

55 #1

*Restricted*

#55

32 #2

Declaration Rainer Bischof

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

140 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • (#64) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 5, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by January 29, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-06778-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/3/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • (#62) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American GNC Corporation.. (Berten, David) (Filed on 11/29/2018) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GoPro, Inc... (Brausa, Adam) (Filed on 11/29/2018) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bosch Sensortec GmbH, Robert Bosch GmbH.. (Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 11/29/2018) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) NOTICE of Appearance by David Powers Berten (Berten, David) (Filed on 11/29/2018) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00968. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ORDER: (1) DENYING DEFENDANT RB GmbH's RULE 12(b)(2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #32 , #39 ; (2) GRANTING DEFENDANTS GOPRO AND BOSCH SENSORTEC'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #37 AND (3) TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Case transferred to the United States District Court, Northern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: District of Northern District of California, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA 94102. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (sjm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Lemley on behalf of GoPro, Inc. (Lemley, Mark). Attorney Mark A. Lemley added to party GoPro, Inc.(pty:dft). (jah). (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Leave to Serve Summons and Complaint by Alternative Service. Court denies Plaintiff's request to the extent Plaintiff seeks to serve Defendants directly at their German addresses or some other method to which Germany has not consented under Hague Convention. Court grants Plaintiff's request only as to effectuating service under the Hague Convention by proceeding through Germany's Central Authority. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/4/2018. (jah) (Entered: 06/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel, Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:17-cv-01090-BAS-BLM. The new case number is 17cv1090-BAS-BLM. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/1/18. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/17/18.(dlg) (Entered: 06/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American GNC Corporation. GoPro, Inc. served. (Markow, Gregory) (dlg). (Entered: 05/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Serve Summons and Complaint by Alternative Service by American GNC Corporation. (Markow, Gregory) (jdt). (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by American GNC Corporation of case(s) 3:17-CV-1090 and 4:17-cv-620 in the Eastern District of Texas. (Markow, Gregory) Proposed LNO prepared (dlg). (Entered: 05/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *6,311,555*, *6,456,939*, *6,508,122*, *6,671,648*, *6,697,758* cc:USPTO (tcf) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American GNC Corporation. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (tcf) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bosch Sensortec GmbH, GoPro, Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11223588.), filed by American GNC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-968-GPC-KSC. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Markow, Gregory)(tcf) (sjt). (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American GNC Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where GOPRO, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allyson Roz Bennett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Chen Saulsbury