This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2018 at 07:16:10 (UTC).

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

Case Summary

On 10/17/2018 AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher R. Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02388

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher R. Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS

SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER

GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE

Defendant

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Josephine T. Morse

Attorney at DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION

1333 H Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorney

Benton Gregory Peterson

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER. (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

6 #1

Declaration

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/24/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/23/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/29/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 10/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Morse, Josephine) Modified on 11/6/2018 (ztd). Modified on 11/7/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#4

(#4) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#3

(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5742536) filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' #8 joint status report, the parties shall file an updated joint status report on or before December 21, 2018, in which they should advise the Court of the volume of responsive records and a schedule for production. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/12/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER. (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/11/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ordered that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by December 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/21/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/23/2018, (ztd) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISREGARD THIS NOTICE OF ERROR re #6 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to jmorse@democracyforward.org, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Documents need to be refiled along with the proofs of service. (ztd, ) Modified on 11/7/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/24/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/23/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/29/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 10/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Morse, Josephine) Modified on 11/6/2018 (ztd). Modified on 11/7/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5742536) filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Department of Education is a litigant

Latest cases where The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. is a litigant