This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 13:38:30 (UTC).

American Civil Liberties Union et al v. Wright et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 American Civil Liberties Union filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wright. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-05772

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEIU-UHW

American Civil Liberties Union

Defendants

R. Alexander Acosta

Steven Mnuchin

Don Wright

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brigitte Amiri

Melissa Allison Goodman

Daniel Mach

Louise F. Melling

Elizabeth K Watson

Matthew J. Bricker

Alexis Susan Coll-Very

Elizabeth O. Gill

Julia E. Heald

Lawrence Huang

Meredith D. Karp

Marissa Paige Lambert

John David Loy

Linton Mann, III

Patrick Casey Mathews

Christine Patricia Sun

Defendant Attorney

Justin Michael Sandberg

 

Court Documents

#40

#46

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 42 Administrative Motion for Relief From Referral to ADR Multi-Option Program. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less