This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2018 at 07:18:55 (UTC).

American Cable Association et al v. Scott et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 American Cable Association filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Scott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judges overseeing this case are John M. Conroy and Christina Reiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00167

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John M. Conroy

Christina Reiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CTIA - The Wireless Association

USTelecom - The Broadband Association

New England Cable & Telecommunications Association

NCTA - The Internet & Television Association

American Cable Association

Defendants

Philip B. Scott

June E. Tierney

Susanne R. Young

John J. Quinn, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Pocius, Esq.

Attorney at Paul Frank + Collins PC

1 Church Street, P.O. Box 1307

Burlington, VT 05402-1307

Scott H. Angstreich, Esq.

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036-3209

Brendan J. Crimmins, Esq.

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036-3209

Adam Tuetken, Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Matthew A. Brill, Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Jeffrey A. Lamken, Esq.

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw, Suite 660

Washington, DC 20037

Rachel P. May, Esq.

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036-3209

Matthew T. Murchison, Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

13 #1

Exhibit A

#13

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association (Pocius, David) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association re #18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed, #17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed, #16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed, #19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed.(Pocius, David) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: June E. Tierney waiver sent on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018.(Pocius, David) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: John J. Quinn, III waiver sent on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018.(Pocius, David) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Susanne R. Young waiver sent on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018.(Pocius, David) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Philip B. Scott waiver sent on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018.(Pocius, David) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Brendan J. Crimmins; granting #11 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Scott H. Angsteich; granting #12 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Lamken; granting #13 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Adam J. Tuetken; granting #14 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Matthew T. Murchison. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 10/26/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Rachel P. May; granting #8 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Matthew A. Brill. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 10/26/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Matthew T. Murchison filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Brendan J. Crimmins filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Matthew A. Brill filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Rachel P. May filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • ISSUED Summons as to John J. Quinn, III, Philip B. Scott, June E. Tierney, Susanne R. Young.(kac) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by USTelecom - The Broadband Association (Pocius, David) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by NCTA - The Internet & Television Association (Pocius, David) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by New England Cable & Telecommunications Association (Pocius, David) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by CTIA - The Wireless Association (Pocius, David) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by American Cable Association (Pocius, David) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Philip B. Scott, June E. Tierney, John J. Quinn, III, Susanne R. Young filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association.Summonses issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(law) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USTelecom - The Broadband Association is a litigant

Latest cases where CTIA - THE WIRELESS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NCTA - The Internet & Television Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew T. Murchison, Esq.