This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:39:54 (UTC).

American Bedding Company Inc et al v. Carpenter Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2013 American Bedding Company Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Carpenter Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary (MDL2196). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:13-PF-10009

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary (MDL2196)

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Bedding Company Inc

Diamond Mattress Company

Rest Master Bedding Company

Defendants

E. R. Carpenter, L.P.

Carpenter Company

Carpenter Holdings, Inc.

Crest Foam Industries, Inc.

Domfoam International Inc

Flexible Foam Products, LLC

FXI Foamex Innovations Inc

Future Foam Inc

Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company

Inoac Corporation

Inoac USA Inc.

Leggett & Platt Inc.

Mohawk Industries Inc.

Ohio Decorative Products Inc.

Otto Bock Polyurethane Technologies, Inc.

Plastomer Corporation

Scottdel Inc

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David C. Eddy

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet - Columbia

1230 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Dennis J. Lynch

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet - Columbia

1230 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Travis C. Wheeler

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet - Columbia

1230 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Defendant Attorneys

Bethany G. Lukitsch

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Howard Feller

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

James H. Walsh

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Howard B. Iwrey

Attorney at Dykema Gossett - Bloomfield Hills

39577 Woodward Avenue

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Bradley R. Love

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Deborah Pollack-Milgate

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kathleen M. Anderson

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

888 South Harrison Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Kendall Millard

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Larry A. Mackey

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Michael D. Mustard

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

888 South Harrison Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Rachel K. Steinhofer

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

600 One Summit Square

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Francis P. Newell

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Cozen O'Connor - Philadelphia

3Rd Floor, 1900 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Peter M. Ryan

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor - Philadelphia

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Matthew S. Noren

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Kutak Rock

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Edward G. Warin

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Kutak Rock - Omaha

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

John P. Passarelli

Attorney at Kutak Rock - Omaha

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Meghan M. Blinn

Attorney at Kutak Rock - Omaha

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

44 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#50

(#50) Order. The Plaintiff in this case has resolved all claims against all Defendants. Therefore, this case is now closed. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/12/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

#49

(#49) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs' claims against Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. Related document #48 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/2/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

48 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

48 #48

Main Document

#47

(#47) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs' claims against Flexible Foam Products, LLC. Related document #45 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/16/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

#46

(#46) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs' claims against Vitafoam, Inc., Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, and British Vita Unlimited. Related document #44 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/16/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

45 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

45 #45

Main Document

44 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#5

(#5) Case transferred to Ohio Northern per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 1:10-md-02196-JZ. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. Associated Cases: 6:13-cv-02084-JMC, 6:13-cv-02085-JMC(mbro) [Transferred from scd on 9/16/2013.] (Entered: 09/12/2013)

4 #2

Summons Issued - Scottdel Inc

4 #1

Summons Issued - David Carson

4 #4

Main Document

3 #2

26.01 Interrogatories for Rest Master Bedding Company

3 #1

26.01 Interrogatories for Diamond Mattress Company

3 #3

Main Document

#1

(#11) Answer to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand filed by FXI Foamex Innovations Inc. (Ryan, Peter) (Entered: 10/28/2013)

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Order. The Plaintiff in this case has resolved all claims against all Defendants. Therefore, this case is now closed. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/12/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs' claims against Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. Related document #48 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/2/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by American Bedding Company Inc, Diamond Mattress Company, Rest Master Bedding Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Lynch, Dennis) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs' claims against Flexible Foam Products, LLC. Related document #45 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/16/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs' claims against Vitafoam, Inc., Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, and British Vita Unlimited. Related document #44 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/16/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by American Bedding Company Inc, Diamond Mattress Company, Rest Master Bedding Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 06/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by American Bedding Company Inc, Diamond Mattress Company, Rest Master Bedding Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Order of dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiff's claims against Mohawk Industries, Inc. Related document #42 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 5/28/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by American Bedding Company Inc, Diamond Mattress Company, Rest Master Bedding Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Order of dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiffs' claims against Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc., and Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc. Related document #40 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 4/14/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Answer to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand filed by FXI Foamex Innovations Inc. (Ryan, Peter) (Entered: 10/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Future Foam's Answer to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand filed by Future Foam Inc. (Blinn, Meghan) (Entered: 10/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Answer to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand filed by Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. (McGuire, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint filed by David Carson. (S,R) (Entered: 09/26/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon David Carson on 9/2/2013, filed on behalf of American Bedding Company Inc; Rest Master Bedding Company; Diamond Mattress Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Proof of Service)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 09/24/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of South Carolina. Case number 6:13-cv-02084. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/16/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred to Ohio Northern per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 1:10-md-02196-JZ. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. Associated Cases: 6:13-cv-02084-JMC, 6:13-cv-02085-JMC(mbro) [Transferred from scd on 9/16/2013.] (Entered: 09/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to David Carson, Louis Carson, Scottdel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - David Carson, #2 Summons Issued - Scottdel Inc) Modified on 8/22/2013 to edit text (mbro). [Transferred from scd on 9/16/2013.] (Entered: 08/22/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Bedding Company Inc, Diamond Mattress Company, Rest Master Bedding Company. (Attachments: #1 26.01 Interrogatories for Diamond Mattress Company, #2 26.01 Interrogatories for Rest Master Bedding Company)(mbro) [Transferred from scd on 9/16/2013.] (Entered: 08/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against British Vita Unlimited, Carpenter Company, Carpenter Holdings Inc, David Carson, Louis Carson, Crest Foam Industries Inc, Domfoam International Inc, E.R. Carpenter LP, FXI Foamex Innovations Inc, Flexible Foam Products Incorporated, Future Foam Inc, Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company, Inoac Corporation, Inoac USA Inc, Leggett & Platt Inc, Mohawk Industries Inc, Ohio Decorative Products Inc, Otto Bock Polyurethane Technologies Inc, Plastomer Corporation, Scottdel Inc, Valle Foam Industries Inc (1995), Vitafoam Inc, Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating Inc, Woodbridge Sales & Engineering Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-4855786), filed by American Bedding Company Inc, Rest Master Bedding Company, Diamond Mattress Company.Service due by 12/5/2013(mbro) [Transferred from scd on 9/16/2013.] (Entered: 08/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carpenter Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Domfoam International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc. is a litigant