This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2019 at 07:07:21 (UTC).

Amawi v. Pflugerville Independent School District et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2018 Amawi filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Pflugerville Independent School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01091

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bahia Amawi

Consolidated Plaintiffs

George Hale

Zachary Abdelhadi

John Pluecker

Obinna Dennar

Defendants

Pflugerville Independent School District

Ken Paxton

Consolidated Defendants

Board of Regents of the University of Houston System

Trustees of the Klein Independent School District

Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System

Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District

Amicus Curiae

State of Arizona

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher M. Choate

Attorney at John T. Floyd Law Firm

2000 Smith Street

Houston, TX 77002

John T. Floyd, III

Attorney at John T. Floyd Law Firm

4900 Woodway Drive, Suite 725

Houston, TX 77056

Gadeir L. Abbas

Attorney at CAIR Legal Defense Fund

453 New Jersey Ave, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Lena F. Masri

Attorney at Council on American Islamic Relations

453 New Jersey Ave, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Carolyn Homer

Attorney at Council on American Islamic Relations

453 New Jersey Avenue Se

Washington, DC 20003

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Andre I. Segura

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc.

P.O. Box 8306

Houston, TX 77288

Adriana Cecilia Pinon

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Texas

P.O. Box 8306

Houston, TX 77288

Thomas Paul Clancy

Attorney at ACLU of Texas

P.O. Box 8306

Houston, TX 77288

Edgar Saldivar

Attorney at ACLU of Texas

P.O. Box 8306

Houston, TX 77288

Vera Eidelman

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Inc.

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Brian M. Hauss

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, INc.

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Defendant and Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Todd Aaron Clark

Attorney at Walsh Gallegos Trevino Russo & Kyle PC

505 E. Huntland Drive, Suite 600

Austin, TX 78752

Joey W. Moore

Attorney at Walsh Gallegos Trevino Russo & Kyle PC

P.O. Box 2156

Austin, TX 78768

Randall Wilson Miller

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 W. 15Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Michael Abrams

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

Po Box 12548, General Lit (019), Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78701

Laura Dahl O'Leary

Attorney at Fannying Harper Martinson Brandt & Kutchin

4849 Greenville Ave., Suite 130

Dallas, TX 75205

Francisco J. Valenzuela

Attorney at Fanning Harper Martinson Brandt and Kutchin PC

4849 Greenville Ave., Suite 1300

Dallas, TX 75206

Thomas Phillip Brandt

Attorney at Fanning Harper Martinson Brandt & Kutchin, P.C.

Two Energy Square, 4849 Greenville Ave., Suite 1300

Dallas, TX 75206

Caroline Sileo

Attorney at Fanning Harper Martinson Brandt and Kutchin PC

4849 Greenville Avenue, Suite 1300

Dallas, TX 75206

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Diana Day

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#50

(#50) ORDER DENYING #46 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; DENYING #46 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#49

(#49) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker, re #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Consol Defendant Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Consol Defendant Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District (Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

46 #3

Proposed Order

46 #2

Appendix Response with Appendix

46 #1

Appendix Response with Appendix

#46

(#46) Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation , Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Response with Appendix, #2 Appendix Response with Appendix, #3 Proposed Order)(Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

44 #1

Appendix

43 #1

Appendix

#43

(#43) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#8

(#45) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System, re #24 MOTION to Dismiss and Response to #8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Consol Defendant Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Consol Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Houston System (Abrams, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Floyd, III for Lena F. Masri ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11571962) by on behalf of Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Floyd, III for Gadeir I. Abbas ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11571938) by on behalf of Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Floyd, III for Carolyn M. Homer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11571903) by on behalf of Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Ken Paxton, Pflugerville Independent School District. (cj) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#3

(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Gadeir I. Abbas, Carolyn M. Homer, and Lena Masri, for Plaintiff Bahia Amawi, re: non-admitted status. (cj) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John) (Entered: 12/16/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11560917), filed by Bahia Amawi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Floyd, John) (Entered: 12/16/2018)

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) ORDER DENYING #46 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; DENYING #46 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker, re #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Consol Defendant Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Consol Defendant Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District (Saldivar, Edgar) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District, re #46 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Consol Defendant Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Consol Defendant Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District (Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Bahia Amawi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker, re #46 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Consol Defendant Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Consol Defendant Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Masri, Lena) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation , Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Response with Appendix, #2 Appendix Response with Appendix, #3 Proposed Order)(Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System, re #24 MOTION to Dismiss and Response to #8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Consol Defendant Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Consol Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Houston System (Abrams, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Trustees of the Klein Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) AMICUS BRIEF by State of Arizona in Support of Defendants. (dm) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER DENYING #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Including Request for Oral Argument by Bahia Amawi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo in Support, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(Floyd, John) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Floyd, III for Lena F. Masri ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11571962) by on behalf of Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Floyd, III for Gadeir I. Abbas ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11571938) by on behalf of Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Floyd, III for Carolyn M. Homer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11571903) by on behalf of Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Ken Paxton, Pflugerville Independent School District. (cj) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Gadeir I. Abbas, Carolyn M. Homer, and Lena Masri, for Plaintiff Bahia Amawi, re: non-admitted status. (cj) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2018
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bahia Amawi. (cj) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John) (Entered: 12/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11560917), filed by Bahia Amawi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Floyd, John) (Entered: 12/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pflugerville Independent School District is a litigant

Latest cases where The Board of Regents of the University of Houston System is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diana Day Esquire