This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/05/2018 at 07:24:33 (UTC).

Alvarado v. CV Sciences, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 Alvarado filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against CV Sciences, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are George Foley, Jr and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01709

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

George Foley, Jr

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lenny Alvarado

Petitioners

Jerry Faulkner

Kenneth Zelden

Richard Ina, as Trustee for The Ina Family Trust

Defendants

Michael Mona, III

CV Sciences, Inc.

Michael Mona, Jr

Joseph D Dowling

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Andrew R. Muehlbauer

Attorney at Muehlbauer Law Office, Ltd.

7915 West Sahara Ave., Ste. 104

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Martin muckleroy

6077 S Fort Apache Rd, Suite 140

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

5 #6

Proposed Order

5 #5

Exhibit E

5 #4

Exhibit D

5 #3

Exhibit C

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve Counsel by Movants Kenneth Zelden, Jerry Faulkner. Responses due by 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order) (Muehlbauer, Andrew) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

4 #8

Proposed Order

4 #7

Exhibit E - Muckleroy Lunt, LLC Firm Resume

4 #6

Exhibit D - Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP Firm Resume

4 #5

Exhibit C - Loss Calculation

4 #4

Exhibit B - PSLRA Certification

4 #3

Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice

4 #2

Index of Exhibits

4 #1

Declaration of Martin A. Muckleroy

#4

(#4) MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Appointment as Lead Plaintiff; and Approval of Lead Counsel by Movant Richard Ina, as Trustee for The Ina Family Trust. Responses due by 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin A. Muckleroy, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #4 Exhibit B - PSLRA Certification, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Calculation, #6 Exhibit D - Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP Firm Resume, #7 Exhibit E - Muckleroy Lunt, LLC Firm Resume, #8 Proposed Order) (muckleroy, Martin) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (SLD) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

1 #5

Summons Michael Mona, III

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE Setting Hearing on #4 and #5 MOTIONS to Consolidate Cases: Motions Hearing set for 11/15/2018 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve Counsel by Movants Kenneth Zelden, Jerry Faulkner. Responses due by 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order) (Muehlbauer, Andrew) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Appointment as Lead Plaintiff; and Approval of Lead Counsel by Movant Richard Ina, as Trustee for The Ina Family Trust. Responses due by 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin A. Muckleroy, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #4 Exhibit B - PSLRA Certification, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Calculation, #6 Exhibit D - Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP Firm Resume, #7 Exhibit E - Muckleroy Lunt, LLC Firm Resume, #8 Proposed Order) (muckleroy, Martin) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (SLD) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lenny Alvarado. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Muehlbauer, Andrew) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5230517) by Lenny Alvarado. Proof of service due by 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons CV Sciences, Inc., #3 Summons Michael Mona, Jr., #4 Summons Joseph D. Dowling, #5 Summons Michael Mona, III)(Muehlbauer, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CV Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin A. Muckleroy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew R. Muehlbauer