This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 20:41:15 (UTC).

Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation v. Northern Dairy Equipment, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 Alpha Technology U S A Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Northern Dairy Equipment, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00173

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation

Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation d/b/a Futurecow, A Florida Corporation

Defendant

Northern Dairy Equipment, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin W. Wimberly

Attorney at Beusse Wolter Sanks Mora & Maire, P.A.

390 North Orange Avenue, Suite 2500

Orlando, FL 32801

Amber N. Davis

Attorney at Beusse Wolter Sanks Mora & Maire, PA

Suite 2500, 390 N Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

Robert L. Wolter

Attorney at Beusse Wolter Sanks Mora & Maire, PA

Suite 2500, 390 N Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

#5

(#5) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (lak) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#4

(#4) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation (Davis, Amber) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#3

(#3) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

1 #11

Exhibit Exhibit H to Complaint

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit G to Complaint

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint

1 #3

Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action

1 #2

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) PATENT COMPLAINT against Northern Dairy Equipment, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2208060.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 8869747, issued 10/28/2014, held by Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation; Patent # 9241472, issued 01/26/2016, held by Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation, filed by Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, #4 Exhibit A - Patent No.: US 8,869,747 B2 , #5 Exhibit B - Patent No.: US 9,241,472 B2, #6 Exhibit C - US Patent No.: 8,869,747 Claim Chart Without Limitations and Without Waiver, #7 Exhibit D - US Patent No.: 9,241,472 Claim Chart Without Limitations and Without Waiver, #8 Composite Exhibit E - Photos, etc., #9 Exhibit F - Printout from NDE's YouTube Account (Text is Unreadable), #10 Exhibit G - Letter dated August 3, 2015, #11 Exhibit H - NDE's Website) (Wimberly, Kevin) Modified on 3/13/2018: Added exhibit descriptions, etc. E-mail to counsel. Disregard future entries. (lak) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (lak) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jls) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation (Davis, Amber) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Northern Dairy Equipment, Ltd. (jls) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PATENT COMPLAINT against Northern Dairy Equipment, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2208060.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 8869747, issued 10/28/2014, held by Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation; Patent # 9241472, issued 01/26/2016, held by Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation, filed by Alpha Technology U.S.A. Corporation, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, #4 Exhibit A - Patent No.: US 8,869,747 B2 , #5 Exhibit B - Patent No.: US 9,241,472 B2, #6 Exhibit C - US Patent No.: 8,869,747 Claim Chart Without Limitations and Without Waiver, #7 Exhibit D - US Patent No.: 9,241,472 Claim Chart Without Limitations and Without Waiver, #8 Composite Exhibit E - Photos, etc., #9 Exhibit F - Printout from NDE's YouTube Account (Text is Unreadable), #10 Exhibit G - Letter dated August 3, 2015, #11 Exhibit H - NDE's Website) (Wimberly, Kevin) Modified on 3/13/2018: Added exhibit descriptions, etc. E-mail to counsel. Disregard future entries. (lak) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less