This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2021 at 09:33:36 (UTC).

Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC et al v. UnitedHealth Group Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2014 Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against UnitedHealth Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Victor B. Kenton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-02139

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Victor B. Kenton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Hills Surgery Center LLC

Defendants

Wolverine Worldwide Flexible Spending Account Plan

Monrovia Nursery Company Employee Benefit Plan

Future Electronics Corp.

Ikaria Research, Inc.

Commmunity Development Institute Head Start

Polyair Corporation Flexible Benefits Plan

Pfizer, Inc.

Diageo North America, Inc. Medical Care and Life Insurance Plan for Salaried and Retired Emmployees

Sally Beauty Holdings, Inc.

Avery Dennison Corporation

L Brands, Inc.

BWAY Corporation

Darden Group Life and Health Benefit Plan for Salaried Employees

The Interpublic Medical and Dental Plan

Velocity Express, LLC

Verizon Communications, Inc.

Plains All American GP LLC Employee Benefit Plan

Tech Data Corporation

TTX Company

886 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert J Rice

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert Rice

6380 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 820

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Roger Jon Diamond

Attorney at Law Office of Roger J Diamond

1717 Fourth Street 3Rd Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Mark LaRue Jubelt

Attorney at Law Office of Mark Jubelt

6380 Wilshire Boulevard, Ste 820

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Defendant Attorneys

Michelle S Grant

Attorney at Dorsey and Whitney LLP

50 South Sixth Street Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Andrew G Sakallaris

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2541

Nicole A Diller

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

One Market Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

Sean P Nalty

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

Steuart Tower, Suite 1300, One Market Plaza

San Francisco, CA 94105

Sean T Strauss

Attorney at Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

455 Golden Gate Ave, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102-7014

Other Attorneys

Thomas L Watters

Attorney at Watters Law Firm APLC

12400 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Bridget A Gordon

Attorney at Hooper Lundy and Bookman PC

1875 Century Park East Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

John Joseph Harris

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

Nancy C Hagan

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Leslie Anne Holmes

Attorney at Hogan Holmes & Usoz

333 W Santa Clara, Ste 800

San Jose, CA 95113

Rebecca K Kimura

Attorney at Lafayette & Kumagai LLP

1300 Clay Street Suite 810

Oakland, CA 94612

Jessica R Moore

Attorney at Gibbs Giden Locher Turner Senet & Wittbrodt LLP

1880 Century Park East, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1621

Michael P Roche

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Monica A Novak

Attorney at Drinker Biddle and Reath LLP

50 Fremont Street 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Susan T Kumagai

Attorney at Lafayette and Kumagai LLP

1300 Clay Street Suite 810

Oakland, CA 94612

Susan Graham Lovelace

Attorney at Laquer Urban Clifford and Hodge LLP

225 South Lake Avenue Suite 200

Pasadena, CA 91101-3030

Helen B Kim

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

2029 Century Park East 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

131 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1909

#1396

#1770

#2090

#2089

#2088

#2087

#2081

#2080

#2079

#2078

#2077

#2076

#2075

#2074

#2073

#2072

#2071

3,441 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2090) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Laurence S Zakson on behalf of Defendant Construction Teamsters Security Fund for Southern California (Attorney Laurence S Zakson added to party Construction Teamsters Security Fund for Southern California(pty:dft), Attorney Laurence S Zakson added to party Construction Teamsters Security Fund for Southern California(pty:dft))(Zakson, Laurence) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2089) MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #2056 , CCA # 17-55301. The judgment of this Court, entered June 11, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum #2081 , AFFIRMED.] (mat) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2088) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #2087 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information G6. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2087) Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Informtion filed by Plaintiff Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC (Diamond, Roger) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2086) Mail addressed to attorney Roger Jon Diamond (Docket No. #2081 ) returned as undeliverable. Correct address -- 1717 Fourth Street, Third Floor, Santa Monica, CA 90401 -- confirmed by phone; message left regarding Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information. Mail was re-sent to correct address, along with Form G-6. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2085) Notice of Electronic Filing re USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order #2081 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #2080 e-mailed to James J. Moak, jmoak@mmhllp.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2084) Notice of Electronic Filing re USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order #2081 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #2080 e-mailed to Nicole A. Diller, ndiller@morganlewis.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2083) Notice of Electronic Filing re USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order #2081 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #2080 e-mailed to Melissa Badgett, mbadgett@gordonrees.com bounced due to 550 5.7.134 RESOLVER.RST.SenderNotAuthenticatedForMailbox. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2082) Notice of Electronic Filing re USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order #2081 e-mailed to Teresita Ferrera, TFerrera@schiffhardin.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2081) MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #2056 filed by Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC. CCA # 17-55301. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (iv) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2,065 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC, upon Defendant ADP Totalsource Inc served on 3/24/2014, answer due 4/14/2014; ADP Totalsource Inc. Health and Welfare Plan served on 3/24/2014, answer due 4/14/2014. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. Under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Entered: 04/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC, upon Defendant Accenture LLP served on 3/27/2014, answer due 4/17/2014; Accenture United States Benefit Trust served on 3/27/2014, answer due 4/17/2014. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. Under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Entered: 04/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC, upon Defendant AARP served on 3/24/2014, answer due 4/14/2014; AARP Employees Welfare Plan served on 3/24/2014, answer due 4/14/2014. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. Under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Entered: 04/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) ONLY as to Telecare Corporation, Telecare Corporation Group Welfare Plan. (Tooch, Daron) (Entered: 04/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) ONLY as to Providence Service Corporation, Providence Service Corporation Health Benefits Plan. (Tooch, Daron) (Entered: 04/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY: FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kss) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) ONLY as to Classic Party Rentals Health & Welfare Plan, Classic Party Rentals, Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Entered: 03/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC, Bakerfield Surgery Institute LLC, Ciro Surgery Center LLC, Independent Medical Services Inc, Modern Institute of Plastic Surgery & Antiaging Inc, Palmdale Surgery Center LLC, San Diego Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC, San Joaquin Valley Surgery Center LLC, Skin Cancer & Reconstructive Surgery Specialist of Beverly Hills Inc, Valencia Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC, West Hills Surgery Center LLC. (et) (mg). (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants AARP, AARP Employees Welfare Plan, ADP Totalsource Inc, ADP Totalsource Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, AEG Employee Health & Welfare Plan, APL Limited, APTCO LLC, APTCO LLC(a California limited liability company), AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan, ATI Systems International Inc., ATI Systems- A Garda ompany Group Health Plan, Accenture LLP, Accenture United States Benefit Trust, Accor North America Inc, Accor North America Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Actavis Health and Welfare Plan, Actavis Inc, Acushnet Company, Acushnet Company Consolidated Health and Welfare Plan, Advance/Newhouse Partnership Health Benefits Plan, Aegis Media Americas Inc, Aegis Media North America Welfare Benefit Plan, Aegon Companies Flexible Benefits Plan, Aegon USA LLC, Aera Energy Services Company, Aera Energy Services Company Medical Benefits Plan, Air Liquide USA LLC, Air Liquide USA LLC Group Benefits Plan, Akzo Nobel Inc, Akzo Nobel Inc. Salaried Employees Group Benefits Program, Alcan Salaried Welfare Benefits Program, Alcon Laboratories Inc, Alcon Laboratories Inc. Voluntary Employees Beneficiary Association Trust, Alexander Gallo Holdings LLC, Alexander Gallo Holdings LLC Welfare Benefit Plan, All American Containers Inc, All American Containers Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Allstate Cafeteria Plan, Allstate Insurance Company, Alpha Mechanical Heating & Air Conditioning Inc. Health Insurance Plan, Alpha Mechanical Inc, Alta Resources Corp, Alta Resources Corp. Plan, Altec Industries Inc, Altec Industries Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Altegrity Inc, Altegrity Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Altura Credit Union, Altura Credit Union Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, American Airlines Inc, American Building Supply Inc, American Building Supply, Inc. Employees Benefit Plan, American Financial Group Inc, American Financial Group, Inc. Group Welfare Benefit Plan, American International Group Inc, American International Group Inc. Medical Plan, Amplan, The Amtrak Union Benefits Plan, Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC, Anheuser-Busch Employees Benefit Trust, Anixter Inc, Anixter Inc. Group Insurance, Ann Inc, Ann, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Anschutz Entertainment Group Inc, Apartment Management Consultants Benefits Plan, Apartment Management Consultants LLC, Apollo Health Street Inc, Apollo Health Street Welfare Benefit Plan, Apple American Group LLC, Apple American Group LLC Section 125 Plan, Apple Inc, Apple Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Arch Aluminum & Glass Co. Inc, Arch Aluminum & Glass Co. Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, Ardent Services LLC, Ardent Services, LLC Medical Plan, Auction.com Employee Benefit Plan, Auction.com LLC, Automatic Data Processing Inc., Automatic Data Processing, Inc. Flex 2000 Plan, Avery Dennison Corporation, Avery Dennison Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Avon Products Inc., Avon Products Inc. Medical Plan for Active Employees, BBA Aviation Benefit Plan, BBA Aviation USA Inc., BMS Enterprises, Inc., BMS Enterprises, Inc. Employee Injury Benefit Plan, BMW of North America LLC, BMW of North America LLC Health and Welfare Plans, BNSF Railway Company, BNSF Railway Company Flexible Benefit Plan, BUPA Worldwide Corporation, BUPA Worldwide Corporation Health & Beneifts Plan, BWAY Corporation, BWAY Corporation Comprehensive Medical Plan, Baker Hughes Incorporated, Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefits Plan, Barnes & Noble Inc., Barnes & Noble Inc. Comprehensive Medical and Dental Plan, Bausch & Lomb Comprehensive Medical Plan, Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, Bayside Management Company LLC, Bayside Management CompanyLLC Employee Benefit Plan, Becton Dickinson and Company, Becton, Dickinson and Company Group Life and Health Plan, Belmont Village LP HealthCare Benefits Plan, Belmont Village, LP, Bennett International Group, LLC, Bennett Motor Express Management Employee Benefit Plan, Berry Petroleum Company, Berry Petroleum Company Comprehensive Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Best Buy Co. Inc., Best Buy Flexible Benefits Plan, Best Medical International Benefit Plan, Best Medical International Inc, Biomed Realty LP, Biomed Realty, LP Welfare Benefits Plan, Black Box Network Services Group Medical Plan, Black Box Network Services Inc, Boat America Corporation, Boat U.S. Health Plan, Boeing North American Employee Health Plan, Boston Market Corporation, Boston Market Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Brady Corporation, Brighthouse, Inc., Brink's Incorporated, Brinker International, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Brinker Services Corporation, Buca Inc. Health Care Benefit Plan, Buca Restaurants 2, Inc., Building Materials Corporation of America, C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., CBIZ Inc. Group Health and Welfare Plan, CBIZ MHM, LLC, CBS Corporation, CBS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, CCSA Employee Benefit Welfare Trust c/o BRMS, CDI Group Welfare Plan, CEC Entertainment Concepts LP, CEC Entertainment Welfare Benefit Plan, CGX Energy, LLC, CH Robinson Company Group Health Major Medical Plan, CNA Financial Corporation, CNA Financial Corporation Health and Group Benefits Program, CRW Flexible Benefit Plan, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., California Charter Schools Association, California Healthcare Industry Program, California Healthcare Industry Trust, Cbeyond Communications Health and Welfare Plan, Cbeyond Communications LLC, Central Parking System, Central Parking System Health and Welfare Plan, Centric Group LLC, Centrix Group Hospital Plan, Charlotte Russe Holding, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Charlotte Russe, Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc. Medical Plan, Chevron Corporation, Chevron Corporation Omnibus Health Care Plan, Child Development Incorporated, Cingular Wireless Medical Plus Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Citigroup Management Corp., Classic Party Rentals Health & Welfare Plan, Classic Party Rentals, Inc., Cogentrix Energy, LLC Group Insurance Plan, Cognizant Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation, Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Colonial Bancgroup Cafeteria Plan, Comfort Systems USA Health & Welfare Plan, Comfort Systems USA, Inc., Commmunity Development Institute Head Start, Commscope Welfare Benefit Plan, Commscope, Inc. of North Carolina, Community Development Institute Group Medical, Dental & Life Insurance for Employees, Conesys Employee Benefit Plan, Conesys, Inc., Conmed Corporation, Conmed Corporation Healthcare Plan, Construction Teamsters Security Fund for Southern California, Court Business Services Corporation, Court Business Services Corporation Group Insurance Plan, Covidien Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, Covidien, LP, Credit Agricole Cheuvreux North America, Inc., Credit Agricole Insurance Plan, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Group Health Care Plan, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Crowley Maritime Corporation Welfare Health Life & Accidental Death & Dismemberment Plans, Cytec Industries Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Cytec Industries, Inc., DGA-Producers Pension and Health Plans, Inc., DHL Express, Inc., DHL Worlwide Express Group Insurance Plan, DS Waters of America, Inc., DS Waters of America, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Danaher Corporation, Danaher Corporation & Subsidiaries Medical Plan, Darden Group Life and Health Benefit Plan for Salaried Employees, Darden Restaurants, Inc., Deere & Company, DellaCamera Capital Management, LLC, DellaCamera Capital Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Deloitte, LLP, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Delta Family-Care Medical Plan, Denso Sales California, Inc., Denso Sales California, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Devry Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Devry, Inc., Diageo North America, Inc., Diageo North America, Inc. Medical Care and Life Insurance Plan for Salaried and Retired Employees, Discovery Communications Welfare Benefit Plan, Discovery Communications, LLC, Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc., Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Door to Door Storage Health & Welfare Plan, Door to Door Storage, Inc., Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc., Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc. Health Plan, Drivetime Automotive Group, Inc., Drivetime Welfare Benefit Plan, Ecolab Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Ecolab, Inc., Edison International, Edison International Welfare Benefit Plan Number Two, Edward D. Jones & Co. Employees Health and Welfare Program, Edward D. Jones & Co., LP, Electrograph Systems Health and Welfare Plan, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Emcor Group, Inc., Emcor Group, Inc. Employee Welfare Plan, Employee Benefit Plan of the Compass Group USA, Inc., Ensign US Drilling Employee Benefit Plan, Ensign United States Drilling, Inc., Enterprise Holdings Hospital Insurance Plan, Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Environmental Systems Research Institute, Inc., Environmental Systems Research Institute, Inc. Life Ltd. Travel Accident, Vision Service, Medical Dental, Epson America Inc. Group Plan, Epson America, Inc., Equity Residential Properties Trust Group Insurance Plan, Equity Residential Services, LLC, Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ernst & Young, LLP, Essilor of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc. Employer Welfare Benefit Plan, Estee Lauder, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Express Messenger Systems, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Expressjet Airlines, Inc., Expressjet Airlines, Inc. Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, FC USA Inc. Benefits, FC USA, Inc., FNPC Healthcare and Welfare Plan, Farmers Group, Inc., Farmers Group, Inc. Employee Prepaid Benefit Plan, Ferragamo USA, Inc.(a New York corporation), Ferragamo USA, Inc., Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Group Employees Medical, Dental and Cafeteria Plan, Fifth & Pacific Companies, Inc., Finra Dispute Resolution, Inc., Finra Employee Group Medical, Fiserv, Inc., Fiserv, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Five Star Quality Care, Five Star Quality Care-CA, Inc., Flextronics Employee Benefits Plan, Flextronics International USA, Inc., Foot Locker Retail, Inc., Foot Locker Welfare Benefit Payment Plan, Founders Healthcare, LLC, Founders Healthcare, LLC Preferred Homecare Employee Benefit Plan, Fox Entertainment Group, Inc., Fox Health Plan, Fresenius Kabi USA EE Benefit Plan, Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Fugate Aviation, Inc., Fugate Enterprises Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, Future Electronics Corp., Future Electronics Corp. Group Insurance Plan, G4S Secure Solutions, Inc., GAF Materials Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, GAP Inc. Health and Life Plan, GE Global Health Plan, GF Health Products Inc., GF Health Products, Inc., GP Strategies Corporation, GP Strategies Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, GTech Corporation, GTech Corporation Participant Benefit Plan, Gap, Inc., General Electric Company, General Parts, Inc., General Parts, Inc. Employee Benefits Plan Medical Insurance, Genon Energy Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Genon Energy Services, LLC, Genpact Process Solutions, LLC, Genpact Welfare Benefit Plan, Georg Fischer Employee Benefit Plan, Georg Fischer Signet, LLC, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Gevity HR Inc. Section 125 Plan, GlaxoSmithKline Health and Welfare Benefits Plan for US Employees, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Great-West Life & Ann Ins Flexible Benefit Plan, Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company, Greenberg Traurig, PA, Greenberg Traurig, PA Group Health Insurance Plan for Employees, Greystar Management Services, LP, Greystar Management Services, LLP, Group Benefits Plan For Employees of Parsons Corporation & Designated Subsidiaries, Group Benefits Plan for Employees of WorleyParsons Corporation, Group Insurance Plan Hourly and Salaried Employees of Parker Hannifin Corp., Group Insurance Plan for Employees of NEC and Affiliates, Group Insurance Plan for Employees of Rexam, Inc., Group Life and Health Benefits Plan, HD Supply Health and Welfare Program, HD Supply, Inc., HRG North America Welfare Plan, Health & Welfare Benefit Plans of Vulcan Materials Company, Health Care Plan of the Employees of MCM Corp, Health Insurance Plan of Multiplan, Inc., Health Inventures Health and Wellness Benefit Plan, Health Inventures, LLC, Healthcare Partners Medical Group, Inc., Healthcare Partners Medical Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Heartland Automotive Services, Inc., Heartland Automotive Services, Inc. Group Medical and Life Plan, Hertz Custom Benefit Program, Hewlett-Packard Company, Hewlett-Packard Company Health Maintenance Organization Program, Hoffman-La Roche, Inc., Hogg Robinson USA, LLC, Honeywell International Inc. Benefit Plan, Honeywell International, Inc., Hot Topic, Inc., Hot Topic, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Hotels AB, LLC, Hugo Boss USA Inc. Wrap Welfare Benefits Plan, Hugo Boss USA, Inc., Huhtamaki Americas, Inc., Huhtamaki Americas, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, IBM Medical & Dental Plan for Regular and Part-time Employees, IMortgage.com, Inc. Cafeteria Plan, IMortgage.com. Inc., ING Americas Welfare Benefits Plan, ING North America Insurance Corporation, INX International Group Medical/Dental Plan, INX International Ink Co., Ikaria Research, Inc., Ikaria, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Informa USA, Inc., Informa USA, Inc. and Subsidiaries Insurance Plan, Ingram Micro Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Ingram Micro, Inc., Insperity Group Health Plan, Insperity Holdings, Inc., Instant Web, Inc., Integra LifeSciences Corp. Medical/Prescription, Dental and STD Plan, Integra Lifesciences Corporation, Intelsat Corporation, Intelsat Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Inter-Rail Transport, Inc., Inter-Rail, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Intercare Holdings, Inc., Intercare Holdings, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, International Aluminum Corporation, International Aluminum Corporation Health and Welfare Plans, International Business Machines Corporation, International Paper Company, International Paper Group Insurance Plan, International Speedway Corporation, International Speedway Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, Interstate Hotels & Resorts Benefits Program, Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Istant Web Inc. and Subsidiary Medical Benefit Plan, J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services Inc., Jack in the Box, Inc., Jack in the Box, Inc. Crew Employees Health & Welfare Plan, Jackson Lewis LLP Welfare Plan, Jackson Lewis, LLP, Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. Employee Group Insurance Plan, JetBlue Airways Corporation, JetBlue Airways Group Health Insurance Plan, John Deere Flexible Benefits Plan, Joie de Vivre Hospitality, Inc., Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc., Jones Lang Lasalle Group Benefits Plan, KCI Holding USA, Inc. Employee Health Care Plan, KCI Holdings, LLC, KLA-Tencor Corporation, KLA-Tencor Corporation Group Insurance Plan, KMI Flexible Benefit Plan, Kellogg, Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, Incorporated Hourly Employees Health & Welfare Plan, Kelly Mitchell Group Inc. Medical Plan, Kelly Mitchell Group, Inc., Kinder Morgan G.P. Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc., Kinetics Concepts Inc. Employee Benefits Trust, Konica Minolta Business Solutions USA, Inc.(a New York corporation), Konica Minolta Business Solutions USA, Inc.(Life, Disability, Accident, Medical and Dental Plan), L Brands, Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc. Comprehensive Medical Plan, LA-Z-BOY Incorporated, LA-Z-BOY Incorporated Medical Plan, Landry's Management, LP, Landry's Medical Benefit Plan, Larson-Juhl US LLC Welfare Plan, Larson-Juhl US, LLC, Leavitt Group Agency Association, Leavitt Group Agency Association Health Benefit Plan, Level 3 Communications, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Level 3 Communications, LLC, Levy Restaurants, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde North America, Inc., Linde North America, Inc. Insurance Plan, Local Staff, LLC, Loomis Armored US, LLC, Loomis Health & Welfare Plan, MAKO Surgical Corp., MCM Corporation, MISA Group Benefit Plans, Maersk Inc. Active NonUnion Health and Welfare Plan, Maersk, Inc., Mako Surgical Corp Health and Welfare Plan, Marubeni Itochu Steel America, Inc., Mary Kay, Inc., May Kay, Inc. Comprehensive Employee Health and Welfare Plan, McCarthy &Holthus, LLP Welfare Benefits Plan, McCarthy Holthus, LP, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company Group Insurance Program, McNichols Company, McNichols Company Health Benefit Plan, Medco Health Solutions, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Medegen Welfare Benefit Plan, Medegen, Inc., Medical Plan of Hoffman-La Roche Inc., Medical Specialties Distributors, LLC, Medical Specialties Distributors, LLC Group Benefit Plan, Medstaff, Inc. Section 125 Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Midamerican Energy Company, Midamerican Energy Company Welfare Benefit Plan, Millard Refrigerated Services, Inc., Millard Refrigerated Services, Inc. Group Major Medical, Mission Linen Supply, Mission Linen Supply Group Health, Mitek USA, Inc., Mitek USA, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Mobile Mini, Inc., Mobile Mini, Inc. Benefit Plan, Mocean Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Mocean, LLC, Monavie, LLC, Monavie, LLC Fringe Benefit Plan, Monrovia Nursery Company, Monrovia Nursery Company Employee Benefit Plan, Mountain Valley Express Co. Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc., Multiplan, Inc., Myriad Genetics, Inc., Myriad Genetics, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, NCH Corporation, NCH Corporation Employee Life and Health Benefit Plan, NEC Corporation of America, NPL Construction Co., NPL Construction Co. Employee Health Benefit Plan, NRC Payroll Management Health and Welfare Plan, NRC Payroll Management, LLC, National Captioning Institute, Inc., National Captioning Institute, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, National Financial Partners Corp., National Financial Partners Corp. Group Health Plan for Employees, National Mentor Holdings, LLC, National Mentor Holdings, LLC Flexible Benefit Plan, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, National Railroad Passenger Corporation Choiceplus Cafetiria Plan, Nationstar Mortgage Group Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Neff Rental LLC Health & Welfare Plan, Neff Rental, LLC, Nestle USA Nescare Plan, Nestle USA, Inc., NetApp, Inc., NetApp, Inc. Group Health Plan, New Breed Corporate Services, Inc., New Breed Corporte Services Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Nike, Inc., Nike, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, Northrup Grumman Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. Welfare Benefits Plan, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nursefinders, Inc., Nursefinders, LLC, OCLC Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc., Oberthur Technologies of America Corp., Oberthur Technologies of America Corp. Group Benefits Plan, Old Dominion Employee Benefit Plan, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Olin Corporation, Olin Medical/Dental PLan, Onward Healthcare, Inc., Onward Healthcare, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Optuminsight Inc., Orange County Container Group Medical Plan, Orix USA Corporation, Orix USA Corporation Welfare Plan, Osram Sylvania, Inc., Osram Sylvania, Inc. Plan for Group Insurance, PPS Holdings, Inc., PPS Holdings, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, PSC Environmental Services, LLC, PSC, LLC Group Welfare Benefits Plan, PSN USA Holdings, Inc., PSN USA Holdings, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Paetec Holding Corp., Paetec Holding Corp. Health Care-Medical, Panalpina, Inc., Panalpina, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Park Electrochemical Corp., Park Electrochemical Corp. Employee Health & Life Benefit Plan, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Parsons Corporation, Payless Shoesource, Inc., Payless Shoesource, Inc. Medical Plan, Pechiney Plastic Packaging, Inc., Peformance Food Group Inc. Employee Benefits Plan, Pentair, Inc., Pentair, Inc. Active Employee Welfare Plan, Performance Food Group, Inc., Perkins & Marie Callender's LLC, Perkins Flexible Benefits Plan, Perot Systems Corporation, Perot Systems Corporation Health Wrap Plan, Petco Animal Supplies Inc. Group Benefit Plan and Trust, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Peter Kiewit Sons', Inc., Peter Kiewit Sons', Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Petsmart Smartchoices Benefit Plan, Petsmart, Inc., Pfizer Medical Pan, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC Welfare Benefit Plan, Phibro Animal Health Corporation, Phibro Animal Health Corporation Health and Benefit Plan, Plains All American GP LLC Employee Benefit Plan, Plains All American GP, LLC, Platinum Home Mortgage Corporation(an Illinois corporation), Platinum Home Mortgage Corporation, Playboy Enterprises International, Inc., Playboy Health Benefit Plan, Polycom, Inc., Polycom, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan, Prada USA Corp., Prada USA Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, Precyse Solutions, Inc., Prime Administration LLC Consolidated Health & Welfare Plan, Prime Administration, LLC, Probuild Holdings, Inc., Probuild Holdings, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Proctor & Gamble RHD, Inc., Producers' Health Benefits Plan, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC Medical & Life Insurance Benefits Plan, Protection One Alarm Monitoring, Inc., Protection One Alarm Monitorning, Inc. Welfare Plan, Providence Service Corporation, Providence Service Corporation Health Benefits Plan, QBE First Group Health and Welfare Plan, QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., Quantum Corporation, Quantum Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Rainbow USA, Inc., Rainbow USA, Inc. Medical Plan, Raytheon Company, Raytheon Health Benefits Plan, Red Wing Shoe Company Flexible Benefit Plan, Red Wing Shoe Company, Inc., Rexam, Inc., Rexnord Industries, LLC, Rexnord Welfare Plan, Reyes Holdings, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Corporation Health Insurance Plan, Rural Metro Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Rural/Metro Corporation, Rush Enterprises Medical Plan, Rush Truck Centers of California, Inc., Ryder System, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Ryder Systems Corporation, S & A Computer Services, Inc., S and A Computer Services Welfare Benefit Plan, Saddle Creek Corp. Group Insurance and Flexible Benefit Plan, Saddle Creek Corporation, Safran USA, Inc., Safran USA, Inc. Cafeteria Plan, Saia Motor Freight Line LLC Employee Preferred Provider Plan, Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC, Sally Beauty Holdings Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Sally Beauty Holdings, Inc., Santander Consumer USA Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Santander Consumer USA, Inc., Schneider National, Inc., Schneider National, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California, Inc., Seasons Hospice Flexible Benefit Plan, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services. Welfare Benefit Plan, Select Specialized Staffing, Inc., Select Staffing-Flexible Benefits Plan, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Company Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Siemens Corporation, Siemens Corporation Group Life, Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc., Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Skywest Airlines, Inc., Skywest, Inc. Cafeteria Plan, Sleep Innovations, Inc., Sleep Innovations, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Smurfit Kappa Orange County, LLC, Sodexo, Inc., Sodexo, Inc. Medical Benefits Plan, Sorrento Capital Welfare Benefits Plan, Sorrento Capital, Inc., SourceHov, LLC, SourceHov, LLC Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Southwest Airlines Co., Southwest Airlines Co. Welfare Benefit Plan, Southwest Gas Corporation, Southwest Gas Corporation Life Insurance & Health Plan, Station Casinos, Inc., Station Casinos, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Stein Mart, Inc. & Subsidiaries Group Disability and Vision Plan, Stein, Mart, Inc., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan, Sunburst Hospitality Corporation, Sunburst Hospitality Corporation Employee Welfare Plan, Sunstate Equipment Co. LLC Employee Benefit Plan, Sunstate Equipment Co., LLC, Systems Application & Technologies, Inc., Systems Application and Technologies, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, TGI Friday's, Inc., TIC Holdings, Inc., TTX Company, TTX Company Group and Health Plan, Target Corporation, Target Corporation Employee Umbrella Trusteed Benefit Plan, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, Teijin Holdings USA, Inc., Teijin Holdings USA, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Telaid Group Health Plan, Telaid Industries, Inc., Telecare Corporation, Telecare Corporation Group Welfare Plan, TestAmerica Employye Benefits Plan, TestAmerica Laboratories, Inc., Textron Bargained Insured Benefits Plan, Textron, Inc., The Arora Group, Inc., The Arora Group, Inc. Medical and Prescription Drug Plan, The Boeing Company, The Brinks Company Comprehensive Health and Welfare Plan, The Children's Place Health Care, Short Term Disability & Life Insurance Plan, The Children's Place Retail Stores, Inc., The Clorox Company, The Clorox Company Group Insurance Plan, The Coca-Cola Company, The Coca-Cola Company Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, The Converse Professional Group, The Converse Professional Group Major Medical Plan, The Estate Lauder Companies, Inc., The Guardian High Deductible Health Plan Through UnitedHealthcare Home Office, The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. Benefits Plan, The Hertz Corporation, The Interpublic Group of Companies Inc, The Interpublic Medical and Dental Plan, The JPmorgan Chase Health & Protection Plan for Active Employees, The Joie de Vivre Employee Benefit Plan, The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc. Group Health Plan, The Proctor & Gamble Health Care Plan, The Reyes Holdings Flexible Benefits Plan, The Salvation Army, The Salvation Army Flexible Benefit Plan, The ServiceMaster Company, LLC, The ServiceMaster Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, The Standard/Hotels AB Welfare Benefit Plan, The Steritech Group, Inc., The Steritech Group, Inc. Cafeteria Plan, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Trusteed Employee Benefit PLan, The Turner Corporation, The Turner Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan, Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Tic Holdings, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan, Time Warner Cable, Inc., Tire Centers, LLC, Tire Centers, LLC Employee Benefit Plan, Toshiba America Inc. Group Welfare Benefit Plan, Toshiba America, Inc., Towers Watson America, LLC, Towers Watson Medical Plan, Tribune Company, Tribune Company Benefit Program, Trinet HR Corporation, Tucker Ellis & West LLP Welfare Benefit Plan, Tucker Ellis, LLP, U.S. Auto Parts Network, Inc., U.S. Logistics, Inc., U.S. Logistics, Inc. Health and Dental, U.S. Nursing Corporation, UPM Raflatac, Inc., UPM-Raflatac, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, US Airways Group, Inc., US Airways, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, US Auto Parts Network Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, US Nursing Corp. Employee Benefit Plan, USA Truck Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, USA Truck, Inc., UTI Services, Inc., UTI Services, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Union Bank Health Benefit Plan, Union Bank, N.A., Union Pacifc Railroad Employees Health Systems, Union Pacific Railroad Company, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, United Airlines, Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, Univision Communcations, Inc., Univision Welfare Benefits Plan, Urban Decay Cosmetics Health and Welfare Plan, Urban Decay Cosmetics, LLC, Valeant Pharmaceuticals Internatinal Group Welfare Plan, Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Velocity Express LLC Flexible Benefits Plan, Velocity Express, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Veolia Environmental Services North America Corp. Employee Health Benefit Plan, Veolia Environmental Services North America, LLC, Vericrest Financial, Inc. Welfare and Benefits Plan, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Plan 550, Via Technologies, Inc., Via Technologies, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Viacom Health Plan, Viacom, Inc., Volt Information Sciences, Inc., Volt Information Sciences, Inc. and Affiliate Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, Vulcan Materials Company, W. W. Grainger Inc. Group Benefit Plan I, W. W. Grainger, Inc., W.H. Brady Co. Insured Benefits Plan, WSA Group, WSA Group, Inc., Wachovia Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Wachovia Financial Services, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, We're Ready To Assemble, We're Ready To Assemble, Inc., Welfare Benefit Plan for EES. of Metropolitan Life, Welfare Benefit Plan for Employees of Precyse Solutions LLC, Welfare Plan for Employees of APL Limited, Welfare Trust for G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. and Affiliates, Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan, Wells Fargo & Company, Westways Staffing Services Health Plan, Westways Staffing Services, Inc., Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Corporation Group Benefit Plan, Whole Foods Market California, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. Cafeteria Plan, Williams-Sonoma Stores, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Wipro Health and Welfare Plan, Wipro Limited, Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Wolverine Worldwide Flexible Spending Account Plan, World Travel Holdings, Inc., World Travel Holdings, Inc. Flexible Benefit Plan, WorleyParsons Corporation, Wynright Corporation, Wynright Welfare Benefit Plan, Xeta Technologies, Inc., Xeta Technologies, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Yum! Brands, Inc., Yum! Brands, Inc. Restraurant Employees Group Insurance Plan, Zale Corporation, Zale Corporation Benefits Plan. (et) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants AARP, AARP Employees Welfare Plan, ADP Totalsource Inc, ADP Totalsource Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, AEG Employee Health & Welfare Plan, APL Limited, APTCO LLC, APTCO LLC(a California limited liability company), AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan, ATI Systems International Inc., ATI Systems- A Garda ompany Group Health Plan, Accenture LLP, Accenture United States Benefit Trust, Accor North America Inc, Accor North America Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Actavis Health and Welfare Plan, Actavis Inc, Acushnet Company, Acushnet Company Consolidated Health and Welfare Plan, Advance/Newhouse Partnership Health Benefits Plan, Aegis Media Americas Inc, Aegis Media North America Welfare Benefit Plan, Aegon Companies Flexible Benefits Plan, Aegon USA LLC, Aera Energy Services Company, Aera Energy Services Company Medical Benefits Plan, Air Liquide USA LLC, Air Liquide USA LLC Group Benefits Plan, Akzo Nobel Inc, Akzo Nobel Inc. Salaried Employees Group Benefits Program, Alcan Salaried Welfare Benefits Program, Alcon Laboratories Inc, Alcon Laboratories Inc. Voluntary Employees Beneficiary Association Trust, Alexander Gallo Holdings LLC, Alexander Gallo Holdings LLC Welfare Benefit Plan, All American Containers Inc, All American Containers Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Allstate Cafeteria Plan, Allstate Insurance Company, Alpha Mechanical Heating & Air Conditioning Inc. Health Insurance Plan, Alpha Mechanical Inc, Alta Resources Corp, Alta Resources Corp. Plan, Altec Industries Inc, Altec Industries Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Altegrity Inc, Altegrity Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Altura Credit Union, Altura Credit Union Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, American Airlines Inc, American Building Supply Inc, American Building Supply, Inc. Employees Benefit Plan, American Financial Group Inc, American Financial Group, Inc. Group Welfare Benefit Plan, American International Group Inc, American International Group Inc. Medical Plan, Amplan, The Amtrak Union Benefits Plan, Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC, Anheuser-Busch Employees Benefit Trust, Anixter Inc, Anixter Inc. Group Insurance, Ann Inc, Ann, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Anschutz Entertainment Group Inc, Apartment Management Consultants Benefits Plan, Apartment Management Consultants LLC, Apollo Health Street Inc, Apollo Health Street Welfare Benefit Plan, Apple American Group LLC, Apple American Group LLC Section 125 Plan, Apple Inc, Apple Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Arch Aluminum & Glass Co. Inc, Arch Aluminum & Glass Co. Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, Ardent Services LLC, Ardent Services, LLC Medical Plan, Auction.com Employee Benefit Plan, Auction.com LLC, Automatic Data Processing Inc., Automatic Data Processing, Inc. Flex 2000 Plan, Avery Dennison Corporation, Avery Dennison Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Avon Products Inc., Avon Products Inc. Medical Plan for Active Employees, BBA Aviation Benefit Plan, BBA Aviation USA Inc., BMS Enterprises, Inc., BMS Enterprises, Inc. Employee Injury Benefit Plan, BMW of North America LLC, BMW of North America LLC Health and Welfare Plans, BNSF Railway Company, BNSF Railway Company Flexible Benefit Plan, BUPA Worldwide Corporation, BUPA Worldwide Corporation Health & Beneifts Plan, BWAY Corporation, BWAY Corporation Comprehensive Medical Plan, Baker Hughes Incorporated, Baker Hughes Incorporated Welfare Benefits Plan, Barnes & Noble Inc., Barnes & Noble Inc. Comprehensive Medical and Dental Plan, Bausch & Lomb Comprehensive Medical Plan, Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, Bayside Management Company LLC, Bayside Management CompanyLLC Employee Benefit Plan, Becton Dickinson and Company, Becton, Dickinson and Company Group Life and Health Plan, Belmont Village LP HealthCare Benefits Plan, Belmont Village, LP, Bennett International Group, LLC, Bennett Motor Express Management Employee Benefit Plan, Berry Petroleum Company, Berry Petroleum Company Comprehensive Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Best Buy Co. Inc., Best Buy Flexible Benefits Plan, Best Medical International Benefit Plan, Best Medical International Inc, Biomed Realty LP, Biomed Realty, LP Welfare Benefits Plan, Black Box Network Services Group Medical Plan, Black Box Network Services Inc, Boat America Corporation, Boat U.S. Health Plan, Boeing North American Employee Health Plan, Boston Market Corporation, Boston Market Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Brady Corporation, Brighthouse, Inc., Brink's Incorporated, Brinker International, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Brinker Services Corporation, Buca Inc. Health Care Benefit Plan, Buca Restaurants 2, Inc., Building Materials Corporation of America, C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., CBIZ Inc. Group Health and Welfare Plan, CBIZ MHM, LLC, CBS Corporation, CBS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, CCSA Employee Benefit Welfare Trust c/o BRMS, CDI Group Welfare Plan, CEC Entertainment Concepts LP, CEC Entertainment Welfare Benefit Plan, CGX Energy, LLC, CH Robinson Company Group Health Major Medical Plan, CNA Financial Corporation, CNA Financial Corporation Health and Group Benefits Program, CRW Flexible Benefit Plan, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., California Charter Schools Association, California Healthcare Industry Program, California Healthcare Industry Trust, Cbeyond Communications Health and Welfare Plan, Cbeyond Communications LLC, Central Parking System, Central Parking System Health and Welfare Plan, Centric Group LLC, Centrix Group Hospital Plan, Charlotte Russe Holding, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Charlotte Russe, Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc. Medical Plan, Chevron Corporation, Chevron Corporation Omnibus Health Care Plan, Child Development Incorporated, Cingular Wireless Medical Plus Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Citigroup Management Corp., Classic Party Rentals Health & Welfare Plan, Classic Party Rentals, Inc., Cogentrix Energy, LLC Group Insurance Plan, Cognizant Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation, Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Colonial Bancgroup Cafeteria Plan, Comfort Systems USA Health & Welfare Plan, Comfort Systems USA, Inc., Commmunity Development Institute Head Start, Commscope Welfare Benefit Plan, Commscope, Inc. of North Carolina, Community Development Institute Group Medical, Dental & Life Insurance for Employees, Conesys Employee Benefit Plan, Conesys, Inc., Conmed Corporation, Conmed Corporation Healthcare Plan, Construction Teamsters Security Fund for Southern California, Court Business Services Corporation, Court Business Services Corporation Group Insurance Plan, Covidien Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, Covidien, LP, Credit Agricole Cheuvreux North America, Inc., Credit Agricole Insurance Plan, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Group Health Care Plan, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Crowley Maritime Corporation Welfare Health Life & Accidental Death & Dismemberment Plans, Cytec Industries Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Cytec Industries, Inc., DGA-Producers Pension and Health Plans, Inc., DHL Express, Inc., DHL Worlwide Express Group Insurance Plan, DS Waters of America, Inc., DS Waters of America, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Danaher Corporation, Danaher Corporation & Subsidiaries Medical Plan, Darden Group Life and Health Benefit Plan for Salaried Employees, Darden Restaurants, Inc., Deere & Company, DellaCamera Capital Management, LLC, DellaCamera Capital Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Deloitte, LLP, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Delta Family-Care Medical Plan, Denso Sales California, Inc., Denso Sales California, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Devry Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Devry, Inc., Diageo North America, Inc., Diageo North America, Inc. Medical Care and Life Insurance Plan for Salaried and Retired Employees, Discovery Communications Welfare Benefit Plan, Discovery Communications, LLC, Does, Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc., Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Door to Door Storage Health & Welfare Plan, Door to Door Storage, Inc., Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc., Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc. Health Plan, Drivetime Automotive Group, Inc., Drivetime Welfare Benefit Plan, Ecolab Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Ecolab, Inc., Edison International, Edison International Welfare Benefit Plan Number Two, Edward D. Jones & Co. Employees Health and Welfare Program, Edward D. Jones & Co., LP, Electrograph Systems Health and Welfare Plan, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Emcor Group, Inc., Emcor Group, Inc. Employee Welfare Plan, Employee Benefit Plan of the Compass Group USA, Inc., Ensign US Drilling Employee Benefit Plan, Ensign United States Drilling, Inc., Enterprise Holdings Hospital Insurance Plan, Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Environmental Systems Research Institute, Inc., Environmental Systems Research Institute, Inc. Life Ltd. Travel Accident, Vision Service, Medical Dental, Epson America Inc. Group Plan, Epson America, Inc., Equity Residential Properties Trust Group Insurance Plan, Equity Residential Services, LLC, Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ernst & Young, LLP, Essilor of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc. Employer Welfare Benefit Plan, Estee Lauder, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Express Messenger Systems, Inc., Express Messenger Systems, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Expressjet Airlines, Inc., Expressjet Airlines, Inc. Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, FC USA Inc. Benefits, FC USA, Inc., FNPC Healthcare and Welfare Plan, Farmers Group, Inc., Farmers Group, Inc. Employee Prepaid Benefit Plan, Ferragamo USA, Inc.(a New York corporation), Ferragamo USA, Inc., Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Group Employees Medical, Dental and Cafeteria Plan, Fifth & Pacific Companies, Inc., Finra Dispute Resolution, Inc., Finra Employee Group Medical, Fiserv, Inc., Fiserv, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Five Star Quality Care, Five Star Quality Care-CA, Inc., Flextronics Employee Benefits Plan, Flextronics International USA, Inc., Foot Locker Retail, Inc., Foot Locker Welfare Benefit Payment Plan, Founders Healthcare, LLC, Founders Healthcare, LLC Preferred Homecare Employee Benefit Plan, Fox Entertainment Group, Inc., Fox Health Plan, Fresenius Kabi USA EE Benefit Plan, Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Fugate Aviation, Inc., Fugate Enterprises Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, Future Electronics Corp., Future Electronics Corp. Group Insurance Plan, G4S Secure Solutions, Inc., GAF Materials Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, GAP Inc. Health and Life Plan, GE Global Health Plan, GF Health Products Inc., GF Health Products, Inc., GP Strategies Corporation, GP Strategies Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, GTech Corporation, GTech Corporation Participant Benefit Plan, Gap, Inc., General Electric Company, General Parts, Inc., General Parts, Inc. Employee Benefits Plan Medical Insurance, Genon Energy Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Genon Energy Services, LLC, Genpact Process Solutions, LLC, Genpact Welfare Benefit Plan, Georg Fischer Employee Benefit Plan, Georg Fischer Signet, LLC, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Gevity HR Inc. Section 125 Plan, GlaxoSmithKline Health and Welfare Benefits Plan for US Employees, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Great-West Life & Ann Ins Flexible Benefit Plan, Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company, Greenberg Traurig, PA, Greenberg Traurig, PA Group Health Insurance Plan for Employees, Greystar Management Services, LP, Greystar Management Services, LLP, Group Benefits Plan For Employees of Parsons Corporation & Designated Subsidiaries, Group Benefits Plan for Employees of WorleyParsons Corporation, Group Insurance Plan Hourly and Salaried Employees of Parker Hannifin Corp., Group Insurance Plan for Employees of NEC and Affiliates, Group Insurance Plan for Employees of Rexam, Inc., Group Life and Health Benefits Plan, HD Supply Health and Welfare Program, HD Supply, Inc., HRG North America Welfare Plan, Health & Welfare Benefit Plans of Vulcan Materials Company, Health Care Plan of the Employees of MCM Corp, Health Insurance Plan of Multiplan, Inc., Health Inventures Health and Wellness Benefit Plan, Health Inventures, LLC, Healthcare Partners Medical Group, Inc., Healthcare Partners Medical Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Heartland Automotive Services, Inc., Heartland Automotive Services, Inc. Group Medical and Life Plan, Hertz Custom Benefit Program, Hewlett-Packard Company, Hewlett-Packard Company Health Maintenance Organization Program, Hoffman-La Roche, Inc., Hogg Robinson USA, LLC, Honeywell International Inc. Benefit Plan, Honeywell International, Inc., Hot Topic, Inc., Hot Topic, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Hotels AB, LLC, Hugo Boss USA Inc. Wrap Welfare Benefits Plan, Hugo Boss USA, Inc., Huhtamaki Americas, Inc., Huhtamaki Americas, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, IBM Medical & Dental Plan for Regular and Part-time Employees, IMortgage.com, Inc. Cafeteria Plan, IMortgage.com. Inc., ING Americas Welfare Benefits Plan, ING North America Insurance Corporation, INX International Group Medical/Dental Plan, INX International Ink Co., Ikaria Research, Inc., Ikaria, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Informa USA, Inc., Informa USA, Inc. and Subsidiaries Insurance Plan, Ingram Micro Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Ingram Micro, Inc., Insperity Group Health Plan, Insperity Holdings, Inc., Instant Web, Inc., Integra LifeSciences Corp. Medical/Prescription, Dental and STD Plan, Integra Lifesciences Corporation, Intelsat Corporation, Intelsat Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Inter-Rail Transport, Inc., Inter-Rail, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Intercare Holdings, Inc., Intercare Holdings, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, International Aluminum Corporation, International Aluminum Corporation Health and Welfare Plans, International Business Machines Corporation, International Paper Company, International Paper Group Insurance Plan, International Speedway Corporation, International Speedway Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, Interstate Hotels & Resorts Benefits Program, Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Istant Web Inc. and Subsidiary Medical Benefit Plan, J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services Inc., Jack in the Box, Inc., Jack in the Box, Inc. Crew Employees Health & Welfare Plan, Jackson Lewis LLP Welfare Plan, Jackson Lewis, LLP, Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. Employee Group Insurance Plan, JetBlue Airways Corporation, JetBlue Airways Group Health Insurance Plan, John Deere Flexible Benefits Plan, Joie de Vivre Hospitality, Inc., Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc., Jones Lang Lasalle Group Benefits Plan, KCI Holding USA, Inc. Employee Health Care Plan, KCI Holdings, LLC, KLA-Tencor Corporation, KLA-Tencor Corporation Group Insurance Plan, KMI Flexible Benefit Plan, Kellogg, Brown & Root, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, Incorporated Hourly Employees Health & Welfare Plan, Kelly Mitchell Group Inc. Medical Plan, Kelly Mitchell Group, Inc., Kinder Morgan G.P. Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc., Kinetics Concepts Inc. Employee Benefits Trust, Konica Minolta Business Solutions USA, Inc.(a New York corporation), Konica Minolta Business Solutions USA, Inc.(Life, Disability, Accident, Medical and Dental Plan), L Brands, Inc., L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc. Comprehensive Medical Plan, LA-Z-BOY Incorporated, LA-Z-BOY Incorporated Medical Plan, Landry's Management, LP, Landry's Medical Benefit Plan, Larson-Juhl US LLC Welfare Plan, Larson-Juhl US, LLC, Leavitt Group Agency Association, Leavitt Group Agency Association Health Benefit Plan, Level 3 Communications, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Level 3 Communications, LLC, Levy Restaurants, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde North America, Inc., Linde North America, Inc. Insurance Plan, Local Staff, LLC, Loomis Armored US, LLC, Loomis Health & Welfare Plan, MAKO Surgical Corp., MCM Corporation, MISA Group Benefit Plans, Maersk Inc. Active NonUnion Health and Welfare Plan, Maersk, Inc., Mako Surgical Corp Health and Welfare Plan, Marubeni Itochu Steel America, Inc., Mary Kay, Inc., May Kay, Inc. Comprehensive Employee Health and Welfare Plan, McCarthy &Holthus, LLP Welfare Benefits Plan, McCarthy Holthus, LP, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company Group Insurance Program, McNichols Company, McNichols Company Health Benefit Plan, Medco Health Solutions, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Medegen Welfare Benefit Plan, Medegen, Inc., Medical Plan of Hoffman-La Roche Inc., Medical Specialties Distributors, LLC, Medical Specialties Distributors, LLC Group Benefit Plan, Medstaff, Inc. Section 125 Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Midamerican Energy Company, Midamerican Energy Company Welfare Benefit Plan, Millard Refrigerated Services, Inc., Millard Refrigerated Services, Inc. Group Major Medical, Mission Linen Supply, Mission Linen Supply Group Health, Mitek USA, Inc., Mitek USA, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Mobile Mini, Inc., Mobile Mini, Inc. Benefit Plan, Mocean Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Mocean, LLC, Monavie, LLC, Monavie, LLC Fringe Benefit Plan, Monrovia Nursery Company, Monrovia Nursery Company Employee Benefit Plan, Mountain Valley Express Co. Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Mountain Valley Express Co., Inc., Multiplan, Inc., Myriad Genetics, Inc., Myriad Genetics, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, NCH Corporation, NCH Corporation Employee Life and Health Benefit Plan, NEC Corporation of America, NPL Construction Co., NPL Construction Co. Employee Health Benefit Plan, NRC Payroll Management Health and Welfare Plan, NRC Payroll Management, LLC, National Captioning Institute, Inc., National Captioning Institute, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, National Financial Partners Corp., National Financial Partners Corp. Group Health Plan for Employees, National Mentor Holdings, LLC, National Mentor Holdings, LLC Flexible Benefit Plan, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, National Railroad Passenger Corporation Choiceplus Cafetiria Plan, Nationstar Mortgage Group Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Neff Rental LLC Health & Welfare Plan, Neff Rental, LLC, Nestle USA Nescare Plan, Nestle USA, Inc., NetApp, Inc., NetApp, Inc. Group Health Plan, New Breed Corporate Services, Inc., New Breed Corporte Services Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Nike, Inc., Nike, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, Northrup Grumman Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. Welfare Benefits Plan, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Nursefinders, Inc., Nursefinders, LLC, OCLC Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc., Oberthur Technologies of America Corp., Oberthur Technologies of America Corp. Group Benefits Plan, Old Dominion Employee Benefit Plan, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Olin Corporation, Olin Medical/Dental PLan, Onward Healthcare, Inc., Onward Healthcare, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Optuminsight Inc., Orange County Container Group Medical Plan, Orix USA Corporation, Orix USA Corporation Welfare Plan, Osram Sylvania, Inc., Osram Sylvania, Inc. Plan for Group Insurance, PPS Holdings, Inc., PPS Holdings, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, PSC Environmental Services, LLC, PSC, LLC Group Welfare Benefits Plan, PSN USA Holdings, Inc., PSN USA Holdings, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Paetec Holding Corp., Paetec Holding Corp. Health Care-Medical, Panalpina, Inc., Panalpina, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Park Electrochemical Corp., Park Electrochemical Corp. Employee Health & Life Benefit Plan, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Parsons Corporation, Payless Shoesource, Inc., Payless Shoesource, Inc. Medical Plan, Pechiney Plastic Packaging, Inc., Peformance Food Group Inc. Employee Benefits Plan, Pentair, Inc., Pentair, Inc. Active Employee Welfare Plan, Performance Food Group, Inc., Perkins & Marie Callender's LLC, Perkins Flexible Benefits Plan, Perot Systems Corporation, Perot Systems Corporation Health Wrap Plan, Petco Animal Supplies Inc. Group Benefit Plan and Trust, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Peter Kiewit Sons', Inc., Peter Kiewit Sons', Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Petsmart Smartchoices Benefit Plan, Petsmart, Inc., Pfizer Medical Pan, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC Welfare Benefit Plan, Phibro Animal Health Corporation, Phibro Animal Health Corporation Health and Benefit Plan, Plains All American GP LLC Employee Benefit Plan, Plains All American GP, LLC, Platinum Home Mortgage Corporation(an Illinois corporation), Platinum Home Mortgage Corporation, Playboy Enterprises International, Inc., Playboy Health Benefit Plan, Polycom, Inc., Polycom, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan, Prada USA Corp., Prada USA Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, Precyse Solutions, Inc., Prime Administration LLC Consolidated Health & Welfare Plan, Prime Administration, LLC, Probuild Holdings, Inc., Probuild Holdings, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Proctor & Gamble RHD, Inc., Producers' Health Benefits Plan, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC Medical & Life Insurance Benefits Plan, Protection One Alarm Monitoring, Inc., Protection One Alarm Monitorning, Inc. Welfare Plan, Providence Service Corporation, Providence Service Corporation Health Benefits Plan, QBE First Group Health and Welfare Plan, QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., Quantum Corporation, Quantum Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Rainbow USA, Inc., Rainbow USA, Inc. Medical Plan, Raytheon Company, Raytheon Health Benefits Plan, Red Wing Shoe Company Flexible Benefit Plan, Red Wing Shoe Company, Inc., Rexam, Inc., Rexnord Industries, LLC, Rexnord Welfare Plan, Reyes Holdings, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Corporation Health Insurance Plan, Rural Metro Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Rural/Metro Corporation, Rush Enterprises Medical Plan, Rush Truck Centers of California, Inc., Ryder System, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Ryder Systems Corporation, S & A Computer Services, Inc., S and A Computer Services Welfare Benefit Plan, Saddle Creek Corp. Group Insurance and Flexible Benefit Plan, Saddle Creek Corporation, Safran USA, Inc., Safran USA, Inc. Cafeteria Plan, Saia Motor Freight Line LLC Employee Preferred Provider Plan, Saia Motor Freight Line, LLC, Sally Beauty Holdings Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Sally Beauty Holdings, Inc., Santander Consumer USA Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Santander Consumer USA, Inc., Schneider National, Inc., Schneider National, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California, Inc., Seasons Hospice Flexible Benefit Plan, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services. Welfare Benefit Plan, Select Specialized Staffing, Inc., Select Staffing-Flexible Benefits Plan, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Company Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Siemens Corporation, Siemens Corporation Group Life, Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc., Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Skywest Airlines, Inc., Skywest, Inc. Cafeteria Plan, Sleep Innovations, Inc., Sleep Innovations, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Smurfit Kappa Orange County, LLC, Sodexo, Inc., Sodexo, Inc. Medical Benefits Plan, Sorrento Capital Welfare Benefits Plan, Sorrento Capital, Inc., SourceHov, LLC, SourceHov, LLC Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Southwest Airlines Co., Southwest Airlines Co. Welfare Benefit Plan, Southwest Gas Corporation, Southwest Gas Corporation Life Insurance & Health Plan, Station Casinos, Inc., Station Casinos, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Stein Mart, Inc. & Subsidiaries Group Disability and Vision Plan, Stein, Mart, Inc., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan, Sunburst Hospitality Corporation, Sunburst Hospitality Corporation Employee Welfare Plan, Sunstate Equipment Co. LLC Employee Benefit Plan, Sunstate Equipment Co., LLC, Systems Application & Technologies, Inc., Systems Application and Technologies, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, TGI Friday's, Inc., TIC Holdings, Inc., TTX Company, TTX Company Group and Health Plan, Target Corporation, Target Corporation Employee Umbrella Trusteed Benefit Plan, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, Teijin Holdings USA, Inc., Teijin Holdings USA, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Telaid Group Health Plan, Telaid Industries, Inc., Telecare Corporation, Telecare Corporation Group Welfare Plan, TestAmerica Employye Benefits Plan, TestAmerica Laboratories, Inc., Textron Bargained Insured Benefits Plan, Textron, Inc., The Arora Group, Inc., The Arora Group, Inc. Medical and Prescription Drug Plan, The Boeing Company, The Brinks Company Comprehensive Health and Welfare Plan, The Children's Place Health Care, Short Term Disability & Life Insurance Plan, The Children's Place Retail Stores, Inc., The Clorox Company, The Clorox Company Group Insurance Plan, The Coca-Cola Company, The Coca-Cola Company Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, The Converse Professional Group, The Converse Professional Group Major Medical Plan, The Estate Lauder Companies, Inc., The Guardian High Deductible Health Plan Through UnitedHealthcare Home Office, The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., The Hain Celestial Group, Inc. Benefits Plan, The Hertz Corporation, The Interpublic Group of Companies Inc, The Interpublic Medical and Dental Plan, The JPmorgan Chase Health & Protection Plan for Active Employees, The Joie de Vivre Employee Benefit Plan, The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc. Group Health Plan, The Proctor & Gamble Health Care Plan, The Reyes Holdings Flexible Benefits Plan, The Salvation Army, The Salvation Army Flexible Benefit Plan, The ServiceMaster Company, LLC, The ServiceMaster Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, The Standard/Hotels AB Welfare Benefit Plan, The Steritech Group, Inc., The Steritech Group, Inc. Cafeteria Plan, The Travelers Companies, Inc., The Travelers Trusteed Employee Benefit PLan, The Turner Corporation, The Turner Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan, Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., Tic Holdings, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan, Time Warner Cable, Inc., Tire Centers, LLC, Tire Centers, LLC Employee Benefit Plan, Toshiba America Inc. Group Welfare Benefit Plan, Toshiba America, Inc., Towers Watson America, LLC, Towers Watson Medical Plan, Tribune Company, Tribune Company Benefit Program, Trinet HR Corporation, Tucker Ellis & West LLP Welfare Benefit Plan, Tucker Ellis, LLP, U.S. Auto Parts Network, Inc., U.S. Logistics, Inc., U.S. Logistics, Inc. Health and Dental, U.S. Nursing Corporation, UPM Raflatac, Inc., UPM-Raflatac, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, US Airways Group, Inc., US Airways, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, US Auto Parts Network Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, US Nursing Corp. Employee Benefit Plan, USA Truck Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, USA Truck, Inc., UTI Services, Inc., UTI Services, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Union Bank Health Benefit Plan, Union Bank, N.A., Union Pacifc Railroad Employees Health Systems, Union Pacific Railroad Company, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, United Airlines, Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, Univision Communcations, Inc., Univision Welfare Benefits Plan, Urban Decay Cosmetics Health and Welfare Plan, Urban Decay Cosmetics, LLC, Valeant Pharmaceuticals Internatinal Group Welfare Plan, Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Velocity Express LLC Flexible Benefits Plan, Velocity Express, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Veolia Environmental Services North America Corp. Employee Health Benefit Plan, Veolia Environmental Services North America, LLC, Vericrest Financial, Inc. Welfare and Benefits Plan, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Plan 550, Via Technologies, Inc., Via Technologies, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Viacom Health Plan, Viacom, Inc., Volt Information Sciences, Inc., Volt Information Sciences, Inc. and Affiliate Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, Vulcan Materials Company, W. W. Grainger Inc. Group Benefit Plan I, W. W. Grainger, Inc., W.H. Brady Co. Insured Benefits Plan, WSA Group, WSA Group, Inc., Wachovia Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Wachovia Financial Services, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, We're Ready To Assemble, We're Ready To Assemble, Inc., Welfare Benefit Plan for EES. of Metropolitan Life, Welfare Benefit Plan for Employees of Precyse Solutions LLC, Welfare Plan for Employees of APL Limited, Welfare Trust for G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. and Affiliates, Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan, Wells Fargo & Company, Westways Staffing Services Health Plan, Westways Staffing Services, Inc., Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Corporation Group Benefit Plan, Whole Foods Market California, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. Cafeteria Plan, Williams-Sonoma Stores, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Wipro Health and Welfare Plan, Wipro Limited, Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Wolverine Worldwide Flexible Spending Account Plan, World Travel Holdings, Inc., World Travel Holdings, Inc. Flexible Benefit Plan, WorleyParsons Corporation, Wynright Corporation, Wynright Welfare Benefit Plan, Xeta Technologies, Inc., Xeta Technologies, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Yum! Brands, Inc., Yum! Brands, Inc. Restraurant Employees Group Insurance Plan, Zale Corporation, Zale Corporation Benefits Plan. Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Almont Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC, Bakerfield Surgery Institute LLC, Ciro Surgery Center LLC, East Bay Ambulatory Surgery LLC, Independent Medical Services Inc, Modern Institute of Plastic Surgery & Antiaging Inc, New Life Surgery Center LLC, Orange Grove Surgery Center LLC, Palmdale Surgery Center LLC, San Diego Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC, San Joaquin Valley Surgery Center LLC, Skin Cancer & Reconstructive Surgery Specialist of Beverly Hills Inc, Valencia Ambulatory Surgery Center LLC, West Hills Surgery Center LLC. (et) (mg). (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Future Electronics Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Velocity Express, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Diageo North America, Inc. Medical Care and Life Insurance Plan for Salaried and Retired Emmployees is a litigant

Latest cases where Sally Beauty Holdings, Inc. is a litigant