This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 08:00:08 (UTC).

Allstate Life Insurance Company v. Hansen et al(CONSENT)

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Allstate Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hansen CONSENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Wallace Capel, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00857

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wallace Capel, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Gail R. Hansen

Ann T. Hyles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Patrick Donahue

Attorney at Bressler, Amery & Ross, P.C.

2001 Park Place, Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Edward Parish, Jr.

Attorney at The Parish Law Firm

323 Adams Avenue

Montgomery, AL 36104

Russell Turner Duraski

Attorney at Attorney at Law

621 South Hull Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

1 #2

civil cover sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #2 Motion, & #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Gail Hansen for Gail R. Hansen served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

1 #3

fee receipt

#2

(#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #2 Motion, & #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Gail Hansen for Gail R. Hansen served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #2 Motion, & #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Gail Hansen for Gail R. Hansen served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Allstate Life Insurance Company. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Gail R. Hansen, Ann T. Hyles and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint, motion, and corporate disclosure to defendants. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#23

(#23) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Gail R. Hansen. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#22

(#22) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Allstate Life Insurance Company. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#21

(#21) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ann T. Hyles. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#20

(#20) Clerk's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the #18 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the parties on 11/26/2018 and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is dismissed with prejudice, without an order of the court. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#18

(#18) JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Ann T. Hyles, Allstate Life Insurance Company, Gail R. Hansen. (Duraski, Russell) (Main Document 18 replaced on 11/27/2018 due to original pdf contained improper electronic signatures.) (dmn, ). Modified on 11/27/2018 to include correct title of document, wrong event code selected when originally filed, see correct docket entry. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Correction re #18 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. The original pdf did not contain proper electronic signatures. The correct pdf is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Correct pdf of Doc. #18 ) (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

19 #1

Correct pdf of Doc. [18]

#17

(#17) (SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ann T. Hyles, Gail R. Hansen, Allstate Life Insurance Company. (Duraski, Russell) Modified on 11/16/2018 to add as also filed on behalf of Gail R. Hansen & Allstate Life Insurance Company and to correct the docket text to reflect as a Settlement Agreement (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#16

(#16) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/21/2018; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 11/21/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/1/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Gail R. Hansen. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Allstate Life Insurance Company. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ann T. Hyles. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Clerk's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the #18 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the parties on 11/26/2018 and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is dismissed with prejudice, without an order of the court. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Correction re #18 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. The original pdf did not contain proper electronic signatures. The correct pdf is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Correct pdf of Doc. #18 ) (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal by Allstate Life Insurance Company, Gail R. Hansen, Ann T. Hyles. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #18 for pdf. Wrong event code selected when originally filed.) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Ann T. Hyles, Allstate Life Insurance Company, Gail R. Hansen. (Duraski, Russell) (Main Document 18 replaced on 11/27/2018 due to original pdf contained improper electronic signatures.) (dmn, ). Modified on 11/27/2018 to include correct title of document, wrong event code selected when originally filed, see correct docket entry. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Settlement ("Settlement Agreement") by Allstate Life Insurance Company, Gail R. Hansen, Ann T. Hyles. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #17 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) (SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ann T. Hyles, Gail R. Hansen, Allstate Life Insurance Company. (Duraski, Russell) Modified on 11/16/2018 to add as also filed on behalf of Gail R. Hansen & Allstate Life Insurance Company and to correct the docket text to reflect as a Settlement Agreement (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/21/2018; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 11/21/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/1/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ann T. Hyles. (Duraski, Russell) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Ann T. Hyles.(Duraski, Russell) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Turner Duraski on behalf of Ann T. Hyles (Duraski, Russell) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Ann Hyles for Ann T. Hyles served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #2 Motion, & #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Gail Hansen for Gail R. Hansen served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Gail R. Hansen, Ann T. Hyles and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint, motion, and corporate disclosure to defendants. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Allstate Life Insurance Company. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Allstate Life Insurance Company. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Deposit Funds by Allstate Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(djy, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Interpleader relief against Gail R. Hansen, Ann T. Hyles ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050889.), filed by Allstate Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 fee receipt)(djy, ) Modified on 10/4/2018 to clarify text as for Interpleader (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.