This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2018 at 07:43:07 (UTC).

Allred v. Rodriguez et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 Allred filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Rodriguez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Edward G. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01178

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Edward G. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Allred

Defendants

Decatur County, Tennessee

Matthew Rodriguez

Stephen Whitlock

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Bryan Moseley

Attorney at MOSELEY & MOSELEY ATTORNEY'S AT LAW

237 Castlewood Drive, Suite D

Murfreesboro, TN 37129

Defendant Attorneys

James I. Pentecost

Attorney at PENTECOST, GLENN, MAULDIN & YORK PLLC

106 Stonebridge Blvd.

Jackson, TN 38305

J. Austin Stokes

Attorney at PENTECOST, GLENN, MAULDIN & YORK PLLC

106 Stonebridge Blvd.

Jackson, TN 38305

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS #11 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/31/18. (mbm) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by Decatur County, Tennessee, Stephen Whitlock. (Stokes, J.) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Austin Stokes on behalf of Decatur County, Tennessee, Stephen Whitlock (Stokes, J.) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James I. Pentecost on behalf of Decatur County, Tennessee, Stephen Whitlock (Pentecost, James) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Allred as to Decatur County, Tennessee. (Moseley, James) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Allred as to Stephen Whitlock. (Moseley, James) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mbm) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#2

(#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

1 #4

Summons Decatur Co. Summons

1 #3

Summons Whitlock Summons

1 #2

Summons Rodriguez Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2879794), filed by James Allred. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Rodriguez Summons, #3 Summons Whitlock Summons, #4 Summons Decatur Co. Summons)(Moseley, James) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS #11 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/31/18. (mbm) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by Decatur County, Tennessee, Stephen Whitlock. (Stokes, J.) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Austin Stokes on behalf of Decatur County, Tennessee, Stephen Whitlock (Stokes, J.) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James I. Pentecost on behalf of Decatur County, Tennessee, Stephen Whitlock (Pentecost, James) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Allred as to Decatur County, Tennessee. (Moseley, James) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Allred as to Stephen Whitlock. (Moseley, James) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mbm) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2879794), filed by James Allred. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Rodriguez Summons, #3 Summons Whitlock Summons, #4 Summons Decatur Co. Summons)(Moseley, James) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less