This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2018 at 07:53:24 (UTC).

Allison v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (JRG2)

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 Allison filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Wakefield Associates, Inc JRG2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J Ronnie Greer and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00123

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Ronnie Greer

Referral Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harley Allison

Defendant

Wakefield & Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan C Lee

Attorney at Alan C. Lee, Attorney

Post Office Box 1357

Talbott, TN 37877-1357

Defendant Attorney

Russell Thomas Fisher

Attorney at Wakefield & Associates, Inc.

7005 Middlebrook Pike

Knoxville, TN 37919

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal Case with prejudice as to all Defendants by Harley Allison. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer by Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Fisher, Russell) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#10

(#10) Administrative Notice to Counsel #9 Stipulation : Document has been filed in "landscape format. Please refile Stipulation in a "portrait" orientation format. Requirements due by 9/10/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer by Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Fisher, Russell) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#8

(#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel #7 Stipulation : Please refile document in the correct orientation format. Requirements due by 9/4/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION For Extension of Time to File Answer by Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Fisher, Russell) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harley Allison. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 8/6/2018. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/2/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/2/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/2/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

1 #12

Summons - Wakefield

1 #11

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - May 17, 2018 Filed Sworn Denial

1 #9

Exhibit 9 - Feb 8, 2018 LtS Weber - Interest Calculations

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Feb 6, 2018 LtS Weber - Dispute

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - TN Corp Info - Southeastern

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3732577.), filed by Harley Allison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Aug 1, 2017 Coll Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lee Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sept 30, 2017 Experian CR - Takoma, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sept 30, 2017 Experian CR - Laughlin, #5 Exhibit 5 - Jan 2, 2018 FxR Weber, #6 Exhibit 6 - Jan 3, 2018 FxR Tiffany, #7 Exhibit 7 - TN Corp Info - Southeastern, #8 Exhibit 8 - Feb 6, 2018 LtS Weber - Dispute, #9 Exhibit 9 - Feb 8, 2018 LtS Weber - Interest Calculations, #10 Exhibit 10 - May 17, 2018 Filed Sworn Denial, #11 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal Case with prejudice as to all Defendants by Harley Allison. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer by Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Fisher, Russell) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Administrative Notice to Counsel #9 Stipulation : Document has been filed in "landscape format. Please refile Stipulation in a "portrait" orientation format. Requirements due by 9/10/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer by Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Fisher, Russell) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Administrative Notice to Counsel #7 Stipulation : Please refile document in the correct orientation format. Requirements due by 9/4/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION For Extension of Time to File Answer by Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Fisher, Russell) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harley Allison. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 8/6/2018. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/2/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/2/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/2/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3732577.), filed by Harley Allison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Aug 1, 2017 Coll Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lee Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sept 30, 2017 Experian CR - Takoma, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sept 30, 2017 Experian CR - Laughlin, #5 Exhibit 5 - Jan 2, 2018 FxR Weber, #6 Exhibit 6 - Jan 3, 2018 FxR Tiffany, #7 Exhibit 7 - TN Corp Info - Southeastern, #8 Exhibit 8 - Feb 6, 2018 LtS Weber - Dispute, #9 Exhibit 9 - Feb 8, 2018 LtS Weber - Interest Calculations, #10 Exhibit 10 - May 17, 2018 Filed Sworn Denial, #11 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less