This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 14:20:29 (UTC).

Allen v. Kiewit Power Constructors Co. et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 Allen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kiewit Power Constructors Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Thomas L. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02569

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bernell Allen

Defendants

Kiewit Power Constructors Co.

Western Oilfields Supply Company d/b/a Rain For Rent

HydroChem, LLC

ISCO Industries, Inc.

Western Oilfields Supply Company

Western Oilfields Supply Company doing business as Rain for Rent

Not Classified By Court

Jimmy Moore

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Randall J. Fishman

Attorney at BALLIN BALLIN & FISHMAN

200 Jefferson Ave., Ste. 1250

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Ann Benton

Attorney at ALLEN SUMMERS SIMPSON LILLIE & GRESHAM, PLLC

80 Monroe Ave., Ste. 650

Memphis, TN 38103-2466

James B. Summers

Attorney at ALLEN SUMMERS SIMPSON LILLIE & GRESHAM, PLLC

80 Monroe Ave., Ste. 650

Memphis, TN 38103-2466

Todd B. Murrah

Attorney at GLASSMAN WYATT TUTTLE & COX, P.C.

26 N. Second Street

Memphis, TN 38103

William David Darnell

Attorney at Leitner Williams Dooley & Napolitan

80 Monroe Avenue, Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38103

Tracy A. Overstreet

Attorney at LEITNER WILLIAMS DOOLEY & NAPOLITAN, PLLC

Brinkley Plaza, Suite 800, 80 Monroe Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Ann Benton on behalf of Kiewit Power Constructors Co. (Benton, Jessica) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#19

(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Bernell Allen. (Fishman, Randall) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#18

(#18) ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/8/18. (jgb) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Summers on behalf of Kiewit Power Constructors Co. (Summers, James) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#16

(#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Rule 26(f) Conference Report. (Fishman, Randall) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#15

(#15) Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Summers, James) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#14

(#14) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/*9/2018 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk) Modified on 9/18/2018 to correct docket text to 10/9/2018 (not 10/19/2018) - image on setting letter is correct (jpw). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 09/10/18. (jgb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#12

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 09/10/18. (jgb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by HydroChem, LLC.(Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Western Oilfields Supply Company d/b/a Rain For Rent.(Darnell, William) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy A. Overstreet on behalf of Western Oilfields Supply Company d/b/a Rain For Rent (Overstreet, Tracy) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit Order of Voluntary Non-Suit as to Kiewit Corporation

1 #3

Exhibit Amended Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HydroChem, LLC from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-002956-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2858761), filed by HydroChem, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Order of Voluntary Non-Suit as to Kiewit Corporation)(Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Ann Benton on behalf of Kiewit Power Constructors Co. (Benton, Jessica) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #19 Amended Complaint filed by Bernell Allen has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Filer did not add additional party when prompted to "add parties". Clerk's office has added the additional party. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jae) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • (#20) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: Scheduling Conference held on 10/9/2018. Randy Fishman appeared for the Plaintiff. Jessica Shannon appeared for Kiewit Power Constructors Co.; Tracy Overstreet appeared for the Western Oilfields Supply Company. Todd Murrah appeared for HydroChem, LLC. HydroChem removed the case to Federal Court due to diversity. Plaintiff's injuries consisted of a broken rib, injured left shoulder and torn rotor cup. Defendant is back at work with a different employer. Plaintiff filed a Second Amended Compliant adding Isco Industries. The Court will reset the Scheduling Conference to a later date to allow Isco Industries to file an Appearance. (Court Reporter, Cathy Best) (mlk) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Bernell Allen. (Fishman, Randall) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/8/18. (jgb) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Summers on behalf of Kiewit Power Constructors Co. (Summers, James) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Rule 26(f) Conference Report. (Fishman, Randall) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Summers, James) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/*9/2018 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk) Modified on 9/18/2018 to correct docket text to 10/9/2018 (not 10/19/2018) - image on setting letter is correct (jpw). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 09/10/18. (jgb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of of Consultation by Bernell Allen. (Fishman, Randall) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Amend/Correct proposed order submitted by Bernell Allen. (Fishman, Randall) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by HydroChem, LLC.(Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Western Oilfields Supply Company d/b/a Rain For Rent.(Darnell, William) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy A. Overstreet on behalf of Western Oilfields Supply Company d/b/a Rain For Rent (Overstreet, Tracy) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HydroChem, LLC from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-002956-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2858761), filed by HydroChem, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Order of Voluntary Non-Suit as to Kiewit Corporation)(Murrah, Todd) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ISCO Industries, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where HYDROCHEM LLC (F/K/A HYDROCHEM INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC) is a litigant

Latest cases where KIEWIT POWER CONSTRUCTORS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN OILFIELDS SUPPLY COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant