This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:44:03 (UTC).

ALLEN v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 ALLEN filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch, Tanya Walton Pratt, Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02622

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Debra McVicker Lynch

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judges

Tanya Walton Pratt

Richard L. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES ALLEN

Defendants

COOK MEDICAL, LLC

COOK INCORPORATED

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

COOK MEDICAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Debra J. Humphrey

Attorney at MARC J. BERN & PARTNERS, LLP

60 E. 42Nd Street, Suite 950

New York, NY 10165

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Debra J. Humphrey on behalf of Plaintiff JAMES ALLEN. (Humphrey, Debra) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#5

(#5) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/4/2018. (MAT) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#8

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02539-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02569-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02601-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02602-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02610-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02611-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ALLEN, JAMES against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5032833) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Humphrey, Debra) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#9

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02539-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02569-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02601-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02602-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02610-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02611-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#10

(#10) MARGINAL ENTRY re (9 in 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 9379 in 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by JAMES ALLEN - APPROVED. Case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB(MAT) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff JAMES ALLEN. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB (Humphrey, Debra) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt, Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:18-cv-2622-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (HET) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MARGINAL ENTRY re (9 in 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 9379 in 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by JAMES ALLEN - APPROVED. Case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB(MAT) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff JAMES ALLEN. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB (Humphrey, Debra) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02539-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02569-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02601-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02602-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02610-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02611-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02539-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02569-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02601-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02602-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02610-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02611-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • (#6) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02628-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 9/4/2018. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02613-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02614-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02617-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02622-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02628-RLY-TAB, 1:18-cv-02630-RLY-TAB (MAT) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/4/2018. (MAT) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt, Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:18-cv-2622-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (HET) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Debra J. Humphrey on behalf of Plaintiff JAMES ALLEN. (Humphrey, Debra) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ALLEN, JAMES against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5032833) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Humphrey, Debra) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.