This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2018 at 07:29:28 (UTC).

Allen et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 Allen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirtan Khalsa and William P. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00744

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kirtan Khalsa

Presiding Judge

William P. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fannie Marie Jim

Leonard Lee

Rosina T Merritt

Ruby B Silas

Jean Jones

George L Sisco

Emerson Lee

Anita Hayes

Vernon Phillips

Johnson Washburn, Sr.

Juanita Kee

Lena J Jones

Cecilia Wallace

Wade Shorthair

Susie Scott

Roger Shaggy

Emma Mitchell

Evelyn M Lee

Defendants

Kinross Gold USA, Inc.

Weston Solutions, Inc.

279 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katherine M Ferlic

Attorney at Egolf, Ferlic & Harwood, LLC

123 W. San Francisco St., Second Floor

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Brian F Egolf, Jr

Attorney at Egolf, Ferlic & Harwood, LLC

123 W. San Francisco St., 2Nd Floor

Santa Fe, NM 87501

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants (including United States of America c/o Attorney General of the United States). (mnb) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Summons Issued as to United States of America c/o U.S. Attorney.(ln) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • (#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (meq) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER ASSOCIATING CASE WITH MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (meq) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5958856 re #1 Complaint filed by by Defendants (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ferlic, Katherine) Modified text on 8/8/2018 (bap). (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (kdh) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferlic, Katherine) Modified docket text on 8/6/2018 (kdh). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Weston Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kinross Gold Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine M Ferlic(Designation Retained)