This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 08:03:24 (UTC).

Allemand v. Anco Insulations, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Allemand filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Anco Insulations, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01019

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Louis Allemand

Defendants

The McCarty Corporation

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Goulds Pumps, LLC

Marathon Petroleum Company LP

El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Eagle, Inc.

General Electric Company

Occidental Chemical Corporation

Anco Insulations, Inc.

Travelers Indemnity Company

Wyeth Holdings LLC

Uniroyal Holding Inc

Chevron Phillip Chemical Company LLC

Union Carbide Corporation

Entergy Louisiana LLC

Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc.

GATX Corporation

CBS Corporation

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Janice Marie Culotta

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas R. Kinler

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Douglas W. Redfearn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163

April A. McQuillar

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, L.L.P.

1100 Poydras Street, 30Th Floor, Energy Centre

New Orleans, LA 70163

Kelsey Anne Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

James H. Brown, Jr.

Attorney at Frilot, Partridge, LC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70163

Kelly Lorraine Long

Attorney at Frilot LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Lacey T McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Magali Ann Puente-Martin

Attorney at Frilot LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Mitchell F Tedesco

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

1000 Louisiana St, Suite 4000

Housotn, TX 77098

Lauren Ann McCulloch

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1000 Louisiana, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

E. Stuart Ponder

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara

1 Galleria Blvd, Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001

Richard J. Garvey, Jr

Attorney at Hailey McNamara Hall Larmann & Papale LLC

One Galleria Blvd, Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001

Shannon Suggs Sale

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford PLLC

601 Poydras Street, 1200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Erin Fury Parkinson

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford- N.O.

601 Poydras Street, 12Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

Christopher T. Grace, III

Attorney at Blue Williams LLP - Metairie

3421 North Causeway Blvd., Ninth Floor

Metairie, LA 70002

Brian C. Bossier

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP

3421 North Causeway Blvd, Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002-3733

Laura Michelle Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, L.L.P.

3421 N. Causeway Blvd Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION to Remand Proceedings to State Court by Michael Louis Allemand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blackwell, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to appropriate judicial district court). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/7/2019. (Dick, Shelly) . Modified on 1/8/2019 to add document (LLH). (Entered: 01/07/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order

10 #1

proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION AND ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice by Michael Louis Allemand. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order)(Blackwell, Brian) Modified on 1/4/2019 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Deadline to file Status Report by Michael Louis Allemand. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order)(Blackwell, Brian) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

8 #1

proposed Order

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 02:15 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/5/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Compliance by CBS Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Record)(Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

5 #1

Attachment State Court Record

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CBS Corporation.(Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc., Corporate Parent NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation.. (Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to appropriate judicial district court). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/7/2019. (Dick, Shelly) . Modified on 1/8/2019 to add document (LLH). (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION AND ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice by Michael Louis Allemand. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order)(Blackwell, Brian) Modified on 1/4/2019 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue Deadlines. The deadlines to file a status report and the scheduling conference set for January 17, 2019 are cancelled. Upon resolution of the pending Motion to Remand, counsel shall contact the undersigned should a scheduling conference be necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Deadline to file Status Report . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Deadline to file Status Report by Michael Louis Allemand. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order)(Blackwell, Brian) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Joint MOTION to Remand Proceedings to State Court. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION to Remand Proceedings to State Court by Michael Louis Allemand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blackwell, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 02:15 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/5/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Compliance by CBS Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Record)(Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CBS Corporation.(Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc., Corporate Parent NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation.. (Eagan, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, PARISH OF EAST BATON ROUGE, Case Number 674589. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1863366), filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Eagan, Kelsey) Modified on 11/19/2018 to rotate pages in attachments 6, 7, 9-12 (SGO). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.