This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:56:47 (UTC).

Andree A. v. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Andree A filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00470

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andree M Allaire

Defendant

Nancy A. Berryhill

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen P. Maguire

41 Auburn Street, 781-7700, Fax: 808-8701

Cranston, RI 02910

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/28/2018. (Saucier, Martha) Modified on 8/28/2018 (Saucier, Martha). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andree M Allaire. (Maguire, Stephen) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Andree M Allaire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons.Berryhill, #3 Summons.Dambruch, #4 Summons.GenCounsel, #5 Summons.Sessions)(Maguire, Stephen) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andree M Allaire. (Maguire, Stephen) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Andree M Allaire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons.Berryhill, #3 Summons.Dambruch, #4 Summons.GenCounsel, #5 Summons.Sessions)(Maguire, Stephen) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.