This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2019 at 07:35:01 (UTC).

All v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 All filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert D. Mariani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02140

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert D. Mariani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rose All

Defendant

Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David S. Senoff

Attorney at Anapol Weiss

One Logan Square, 130 N. 18Th St., Suite 1600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael L. McGlamry

83 Walton Street

Atlanta, GA 30303

Michael L McGlamry

Attorney at Pope McGlamry, PC

3391 Peachtree Road, Ne, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30326

Defendant Attorneys

Dana J. Ash

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Anne A Gruner

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Doc. 6). Mail sent to Michael McGlamry (lh) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#11

(#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Doc. 5) Mail sent to Michael McGlamry (lh) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Gruner, Anne) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#9

(#9) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Anne A. Gruner, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/28/18. (jam) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#8

(#8) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Anne A Gruner on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Attorney Anne Gruner is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4609318.. (Gruner, Anne) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Dana J. Ash on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Ash, Dana) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#6

(#6) LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/20/18. (jam) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#5

(#5) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michael L. McGlamry, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/20/18. (jam) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wright Medical Technology, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company on 11/09/2018, filed by Rose All. (Senoff, David) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#3

(#3) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by David S. Senoff on behalf of Rose All Attorney Michael L. McGlamry is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4593406.. (Senoff, David) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4592196), filed by Rose All. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Anne Gruner is active with the PA state bar. (lh) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Doc. 6). Mail sent to Michael McGlamry (lh) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Doc. 5) Mail sent to Michael McGlamry (lh) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Gruner, Anne) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Anne A. Gruner, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/28/18. (jam) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Anne A Gruner on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Attorney Anne Gruner is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4609318.. (Gruner, Anne) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Dana J. Ash on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Ash, Dana) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/20/18. (jam) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michael L. McGlamry, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/20/18. (jam) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wright Medical Technology, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company on 11/09/2018, filed by Rose All. (Senoff, David) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by David S. Senoff on behalf of Rose All Attorney Michael L. McGlamry is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4593406.. (Senoff, David) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Mariani (jw) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Spoke to Attorney McGlamry's office and they will be filing a Petition for Special Admission. (lh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4592196), filed by Rose All. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.