This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2020 at 18:43:00 (UTC).

All Care Transport, LLC et al v. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 All Care Transport, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:17-CV-01390

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jose Pena

All Care Transport, LLC

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan D Selbin

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann and Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Marc L Godino

Attorney at Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Mark P Chalos

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann and Bernstein LLP

150 Fourth Avenue North Suite 1650

Nashville, TN 37219

Jasper Dudley Ward, IV

Attorney at Jones Ward PLC

1205 East Washington Street Suite 111

Louisville, KY 40206

Annika K Martin

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann and Bernstein LLP

250 Hudson Street 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10013-1413

Defendant Attorneys

Alexander G Calfo

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David L Balser

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street Se

Atlanta, GA 30309

Adam Reinke

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Lawrence A Slovensky

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Madison H Kitchens

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street Ne Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs All Care Transport, LLC, Jose Pena. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Martin, Annika) (Entered: 10/30/2017)

#38

(#38) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #37 . The Court hereby orders as follows: The deadline for Defendant Ford Motor Company to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint #12 in this matter is hereby continued from September 29, 2017 to October 30, 2017. (iva) (Entered: 09/29/2017)

37 #1

Proposed Order

#37

(#37) Third STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ford Motor Company answer now due 10/30/2017, filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 09/28/2017)

#36

(#36) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #35 . The Court herebyorders as follows: The deadline for Defendant Ford Motor Company to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint #12 in this matter is hereby continued from September 8, 2017 to September 29, 2017. (iva) (Entered: 08/28/2017)

35 #1

Proposed Order

#35

(#35) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ford Motor Company answer now due 9/29/2017, filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 08/25/2017)

#34

(#34) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence A. Slovensky APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Ford Motor Company, designating Alexander G. Calfo as local counsel. (iva) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

#12

(#36) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #35 . The Court herebyorders as follows: The deadline for Defendant Ford Motor Company to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint #12 in this matter is hereby continued from September 8, 2017 to September 29, 2017. (iva) (Entered: 08/28/2017)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jasper Ward. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark P Chalos. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Annika K Martin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ford Motor Company. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs All Care Transport, LLC, Jose Pena. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs All Care Transport, LLC, Jose Pena. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

#1

(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs All Care Transport, LLC, Jose Pena. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Martin, Annika) (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #37 . The Court hereby orders as follows: The deadline for Defendant Ford Motor Company to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint #12 in this matter is hereby continued from September 29, 2017 to October 30, 2017. (iva) (Entered: 09/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Third STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ford Motor Company answer now due 10/30/2017, filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 09/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #35 . The Court herebyorders as follows: The deadline for Defendant Ford Motor Company to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint #12 in this matter is hereby continued from September 8, 2017 to September 29, 2017. (iva) (Entered: 08/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ford Motor Company answer now due 9/29/2017, filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 08/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence A. Slovensky APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Ford Motor Company, designating Alexander G. Calfo as local counsel. (iva) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #29 Non-Resident Attorney Adam Reinke APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Ford Motor Company, designating Alexander G. Calfo as local counsel. (iva) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney Madison H. Kitchens APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Ford Motor Company, designating Alexander G. Calfo as local counsel. (iva) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #27 Non-Resident Attorney David L. Balser APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Ford Motor Company, designating Alexander G. Calfo as local counsel. (iva) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence A. Slovensky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20317764) filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jasper Ward. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark P Chalos. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Annika K Martin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ford Motor Company. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs All Care Transport, LLC, Jose Pena. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs All Care Transport, LLC, Jose Pena. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20165946 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs All Care Transport, LLC, Jose Pena. (Attorney Jonathan D Selbin added to party All Care Transport, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D Selbin added to party Jose Pena(pty:pla))(Selbin, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less