This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2019 at 16:12:01 (UTC).

Align Technology, Inc. v. 3Shape A/S et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2017 Align Technology, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against 3Shape A/S. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonard P. Stark and Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-01646

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

Referral Judge

Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Align Technology, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

3Shape A/S

3Shape Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John W. Shaw

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

David M. Fry

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Blair M. Jacobs

Christina A. Ondrick

Patrick Stafford

James V. Razick

Mark J. Consilvio

John S. Holley

Elizabeth Bernard

Daryll M.R. Hawthorne-Searight

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jeffrey Thomas Castellano

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Raymond Stockstill

Grant N. Margeson

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Geoffrey Graham Grivner

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney P.C.

919 North Market Street, Suite 990

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew R. Cheslock

Kimberly E. Coghill

Philip L. Hirschhorn

S. Lloyd Smith

Bryan J. Cannon

16 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#231

#230

#229

#228

#227

#226

#225

#224

#214

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

310 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #231 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to serve opening expert reports to October 16, 2019 filed by Align Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/12/19. (ntl) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#231) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to serve opening expert reports to October 16, 2019 - filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Castellano, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#230) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Align Technology, Inc.s Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Align Technology, Inc..(Castellano, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#229) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas for Production and Testimony to 1) New Image Dental Laboratory, Inc. 2) Nakanishi Dental Laboratory, Inc. 3) Carbon, Inc. 4) Bona-Dent, Inc. 5) Arrowhead Dental, Inc. filed by Align Technology, Inc..(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#228) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Align Technology, Inc.'s Final Infringement Contentions filed by Align Technology, Inc..(Castellano, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#227) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Plaintiff Align Technology, Inc.s Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendants 3Shape A/S, 3Shape Trios A/S, and 3Shape Inc. (Nos. 20-25) 2. Plaintiff Align Technology, Inc.s Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things and/or Inspection to Defendants 3Shape A/S, 3Shape Trios A/S, and 3Shape Inc. (Nos. 123-126) 3. Plaintiff Align Technology, Inc.s Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Align Technology, Inc..(Castellano, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#226) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 8-12), Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-20), and Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Production Documents, Electronically Stored Information, and Things to Plaintiff (Nos. 131-152) filed by 3Shape A/S, 3Shape Inc..(Grivner, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#225) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Plaintiffs Supplemental Notice of Deposition of Nikolaj Kromann Jorgensen Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) 2. Plaintiffs Supplemental Notice of Deposition of Tais Clausen Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) 3. Plaintiffs Supplemental Notice of Deposition of Christoffer Melchior Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) filed by Align Technology, Inc..(Castellano, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#224) ANSWER to #214 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Align Technology, Inc..(Castellano, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#223) Official Transcript of Motion Hearing held on July 22, 2019 before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan Migatz of Veritext, Telephone number (302) 571-0510. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/23/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2019. (bpg) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
281 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Blair M. Jacobs, Christina A. Ondrick and Patrick J. Stafford filed by Align Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/27/17. (ntl) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Docket(#7) ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/27/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01646-LPS, 1:17-cv-01647-LPS, 1:17-cv-01648-LPS, 1:17-cv-01649-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01646-LPS, 1:17-cv-01647-LPS, 1:17-cv-01648-LPS, 1:17-cv-01649-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 11/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Align Technology, Inc.. 3Shape Inc. served on 11/15/2017, answer due 12/6/2017. (Shaw, John) (Entered: 11/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Blair M. Jacobs, Christina A. Ondrick and Patrick J. Stafford - filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Shaw, John) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to 3Shape A/S on 11/14/2017; 3Shape Inc. on 11/14/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Align Technology, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,510,757 B2; 7,112,065 B2; 9,451,873 B1; 9,299,192 B2; 9,427,916 B2; 8,454,364 B2; 8,845,330 B2. (nmg) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against 3Shape A/S, 3Shape Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2266007.) - filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3Shape Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Align Technology, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly E. Coghill