This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2018 at 08:09:57 (UTC).

Alexander v. Carmin et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 Alexander filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Carmin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr and P SO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr

Referral Judge

P SO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimmie D. Alexander

Eddyville, KY 42038

Defendants

Linda Cook

Deedra Hart

Alexander Ledford

Shawn Carmin

Paul Coppage

 

Court Documents

11 #1

*Restricted*

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to Alexander Ledford; Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (JLS) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/7/2018) (KSS). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2018: #1 Time Stamped Summons) (JLS). (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER : 1) Alexander's claims against KSR Lieutenant Shawn Carmin, KSR Correctional Officer Paul Coppage, KSR Correctional Officer Linda cook, and KSR Warden Deedra Hart are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and those four officials are DISMISSED AS PARTIES from this action; 2) Alexander's claims for theft and inadequate medical care against Deft Alexander Ledford are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; 3) the deputy clerk shall prepare one "Service Packet" for service upon deft Correctional Officer Alexander Ledford. Each packet shall contain: (a) a completed summons form; (b) the complaint; (c) this Order; and (d) a completed USM Form 285; 4) the deputy clerk shall send the service packet to the USM in Lexington and note the date of delivery of the packet; 5) the USM shall personally serve the packet upon deft Ledford at the Little Sandy Correctional Complex at the address herein; 6) Alexander must immediately advise the clerk of any change in his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case; 7) If Alexander wishes to seek relief from the court, he must do so by filing a formal motion sent to the clerk's office. Every motion filed must include a written certification that it has been mailed to Deft or his counsel and state date of mailing. The Court may disregard letters sent directly to the judge's chambers or motions lacking a certificate of service.. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 11/7/18.(JLS)cc: COR, Alexander via US Mail (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER: 1. Petitioner Alexander's motion to proceed in forma pauperis R #7 is GRANTED. 2. Within twenty-eight (28) days, Alexander must pay $4.61 to the Clerk of the Court as an initial partial filing fee. 3. The Clerk of Court shall open an account in Alexander's name for receipt of filing fee. Clerk shall complete Form EDKy 525 and serve copy of this Order and form upon warden 4. Each month Alexander's custodian shall send the Clerk a pymt in an amount equal to 20% of Alexander's income for the preceding month out of his acct., but only if amount exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue such mthly pymts until entire $350.00 fee is paid. 5. Petitioner Alexander must immedly advise Clerk of any change to his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. 6. This matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 11/5/18. (KSS)cc: COR, Finance, Alexander (via US Mail) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

7 #6

Envelope postmark10/30/18

7 #5

USM-285 Forms

7 #4

Proposed Order Form AO-240A

7 #3

Proposed Order State Court Form

7 #2

Ky State Penet. Documents

7 #1

Affidavit Jimmie D. Alexander

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmie D. Alexander, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jimmie D. Alexander, #2 Ky State Penet. Documents, #3 Proposed Order State Court Form, #4 Proposed Order Form AO-240A, #5 USM-285 Forms, #6 Envelope postmark10/30/18)(KSS) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER: 1) The clerk is DIRECTED to send Alexander an Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application (AO-240) and a Certificate of Inmate Account (EDKY Form 523); 2) Should Alexander wish to pursue this matter, he must either pay $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application and (3) file both of these documents with the Clerk; 3) Alexander must take these steps within thirty (30) days or his case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/3/18. (JLS)cc: COR, Alexander w/appropriate forms, via US Mail (Entered: 10/03/2018)

5 #1

Sample Caption

#5

(#5) IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JLS) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmie D. Alexander, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JLS) Modified on 9/28/2018 (JLS). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Issued as to Alexander Ledford; Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (JLS) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/7/2018) (KSS). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2018: #1 Time Stamped Summons) (JLS). (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER : 1) Alexander's claims against KSR Lieutenant Shawn Carmin, KSR Correctional Officer Paul Coppage, KSR Correctional Officer Linda cook, and KSR Warden Deedra Hart are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and those four officials are DISMISSED AS PARTIES from this action; 2) Alexander's claims for theft and inadequate medical care against Deft Alexander Ledford are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; 3) the deputy clerk shall prepare one "Service Packet" for service upon deft Correctional Officer Alexander Ledford. Each packet shall contain: (a) a completed summons form; (b) the complaint; (c) this Order; and (d) a completed USM Form 285; 4) the deputy clerk shall send the service packet to the USM in Lexington and note the date of delivery of the packet; 5) the USM shall personally serve the packet upon deft Ledford at the Little Sandy Correctional Complex at the address herein; 6) Alexander must immediately advise the clerk of any change in his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case; 7) If Alexander wishes to seek relief from the court, he must do so by filing a formal motion sent to the clerk's office. Every motion filed must include a written certification that it has been mailed to Deft or his counsel and state date of mailing. The Court may disregard letters sent directly to the judge's chambers or motions lacking a certificate of service.. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 11/7/18.(JLS)cc: COR, Alexander via US Mail (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: 1. Petitioner Alexander's motion to proceed in forma pauperis R #7 is GRANTED. 2. Within twenty-eight (28) days, Alexander must pay $4.61 to the Clerk of the Court as an initial partial filing fee. 3. The Clerk of Court shall open an account in Alexander's name for receipt of filing fee. Clerk shall complete Form EDKy 525 and serve copy of this Order and form upon warden 4. Each month Alexander's custodian shall send the Clerk a pymt in an amount equal to 20% of Alexander's income for the preceding month out of his acct., but only if amount exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue such mthly pymts until entire $350.00 fee is paid. 5. Petitioner Alexander must immedly advise Clerk of any change to his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. 6. This matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 11/5/18. (KSS)cc: COR, Finance, Alexander (via US Mail) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmie D. Alexander, pro se (KSS) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jimmie D. Alexander, pro se. (Received in envelope with Motion DE #7 ) (Attachments: #1 Commonwealth of KY Form)(KSS) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmie D. Alexander, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jimmie D. Alexander, #2 Ky State Penet. Documents, #3 Proposed Order State Court Form, #4 Proposed Order Form AO-240A, #5 USM-285 Forms, #6 Envelope postmark10/30/18)(KSS) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: 1) The clerk is DIRECTED to send Alexander an Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application (AO-240) and a Certificate of Inmate Account (EDKY Form 523); 2) Should Alexander wish to pursue this matter, he must either pay $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application and (3) file both of these documents with the Clerk; 3) Alexander must take these steps within thirty (30) days or his case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/3/18. (JLS)cc: COR, Alexander w/appropriate forms, via US Mail (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmie D. Alexander. (JLS) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JLS) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (JLS) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jimmie D. Alexander, pro se. (JLS) Modified on 9/28/2018 (JLS). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmie D. Alexander, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JLS) Modified on 9/28/2018 (JLS). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Jimmie D. Alexander, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alexander, #2 Exhibit State Court documents, #3 Env, no PM)(JLS) Modified on 9/28/2018 (JLS). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.