This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2019 at 07:45:14 (UTC).

Alexander et al v. Greenwood Hall, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 Alexander filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Greenwood Hall, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04540

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kandia Smart

Shane Ogden

Takela Davis

Vanessa Carballo

Linda Sanders

Tejus Collins

Rebecca Kopf

Cynthia Lampkin

Brittney Towell

Savannah Caldera

Terry Dalton

Kiara Shepard

Gloria Bernal

Defendants

Anastasia Banks

Michael Poutre

Timothy Boris

PCS Link, Inc.

Greenwood Hall, Inc.

Kelly Agpawa

Shane Cobb

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Darrell Sharpe

3131 East 29Th Street, Suite D-200

Bryan, TX 77802

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Joshua Israel Goldberg

Attorney at The Goldberg Law Office PLLC

2006 Commonwealth St

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Declaration of Timothy Boris in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's C

#5

(#5) First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Timothy Boris, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy Boris in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Goldberg, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#4

(#4) First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cynthia Alexander, Carmen Anderson, Connie Bernal, Gloria Bernal, Michelda Burns, Savannah Caldera, Vanessa Carballo, Tejus Collins, Brittney Covey, Terry Dalton, Takela Davis, Aquanita Hemphill, Desiree Hinojosa, Joanna Jimenez, Lorraine Juarez, Danielle Kirkpatrick, Teddy Kirkpatrick, Cora Klinkerfuss, Danielle Knipe, Rebecca Kopf, Cynthia Lampkin, Sherry Maxey, Andrea E Moore, Angela Ocon, Shane Ogden, Robbie Reece, Candice Rice, April Richardson, Linda Sanders, Raven Sanders, Kiara Shepard, Kandia Smart, LeDeidra Stonum, Phylicia Taylor, Suzan Timmins, Brittney Towell, Cecily Valdez, Haven Wallace, Jasmine White, Carol Wiede, Estella Wilson, Sharnita Woods, filed.(Sharpe, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

3 #15

Summons

3 #14

Summons

3 #13

Summons

3 #12

Summons

3 #11

Summons

3 #10

Summons

3 #9

Summons

3 #8

Summons

3 #7

Summons

3 #6

Summons

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons)(Sharpe, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Timothy Boris, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy Boris in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Goldberg, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Summons Re-Issued as to Bill Bradfield. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cynthia Alexander, Carmen Anderson, Connie Bernal, Gloria Bernal, Michelda Burns, Savannah Caldera, Vanessa Carballo, Tejus Collins, Brittney Covey, Terry Dalton, Takela Davis, Aquanita Hemphill, Desiree Hinojosa, Joanna Jimenez, Lorraine Juarez, Danielle Kirkpatrick, Teddy Kirkpatrick, Cora Klinkerfuss, Danielle Knipe, Rebecca Kopf, Cynthia Lampkin, Sherry Maxey, Andrea E Moore, Angela Ocon, Shane Ogden, Robbie Reece, Candice Rice, April Richardson, Linda Sanders, Raven Sanders, Kiara Shepard, Kandia Smart, LeDeidra Stonum, Phylicia Taylor, Suzan Timmins, Brittney Towell, Cecily Valdez, Haven Wallace, Jasmine White, Carol Wiede, Estella Wilson, Sharnita Woods, filed.(Sharpe, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Bill Bradfield. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Kelly Agpawa, AnswerNet Education Services, Inc., AnswerNet, Inc., Anastasia Banks, Timothy Boris, Josh Cage, Shane Cobb, Lianne Corbiere, Tina J. Gentile, Lyle Green, Greenwood Hall, Inc., Bryan Hale, Jonathan Newcomb, PCS Link, Inc., Michael Poutre, Dave Ruderman. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons)(Sharpe, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21383928) filed by LeDeidra Stonum, Kandia Smart, Cynthia Lampkin, Vanessa Carballo, Robbie Reece, Teddy Kirkpatrick, Carmen Anderson, Cynthia Alexander, Cora Klinkerfuss, Raven Sanders, Danielle Kirkpatrick, Candice Rice, Shane Ogden, April Richardson, Carol Wiede, Rebecca Kopf, Joanna Jimenez, Angela Ocon, Terry Dalton, Kiara Shepard, Suzan Timmins, Takela Davis, Sharnita Woods, Sherry Maxey, Desiree Hinojosa, Andrea E Moore, Linda Sanders, Savannah Caldera, Jasmine White, Brittney Towell, Connie Bernal, Brittney Covey, Estella Wilson, Aquanita Hemphill, Lorraine Juarez, Haven Wallace, Tejus Collins, Gloria Bernal, Phylicia Taylor, Cecily Valdez, Danielle Knipe, Michelda Burns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharpe, Matthew) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCS Link, Inc is a litigant