This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 19:07:25 (UTC).

Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon L. Gleason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00294

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon L. Gleason

 

Party Details

Defendants

Abbott Laboratories

Mallinckrodt, LLC

Anda, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Mallinckrodt Plc

Henry Schein, Inc.

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Allergan Plc

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo International Plc

Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Allergan Finance LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Edmund Clay Goodman

Attorney at Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP

516 Se Morrison Steet, Suite 1200

Portland, OR 97214

Geoffrey D. Strommer

Attorney at Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP

516 Se Morrison Steet, Suite 1200

Portland, OR 97214

Dawn E. Winalski

Attorney at Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP

516 Se Morrison Steet, Suite 1200

Portland, OR 97214

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-75): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SLG TEXT ORDER: granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Edmund Clay Goodman. (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Edmund Clay Goodman. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2623919.) by Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc..(Strommer, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Related Case by Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc. (Strommer, Geoffrey) Modified on 12/18/2018 IN RE: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL-2804 (CME, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Strommer, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2623838.), filed by Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc..(Strommer, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo International Plc is a litigant

Latest cases where Anda, Inc. is a litigant