This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2018 at 08:25:58 (UTC).

Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01513

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited

Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Defendants

Glaxo Group Limited

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelly E. Farnan

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) PROPOSED Consent Judgment, by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 11/26/2018 (nms). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/26/2018 - filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/16/2018 - filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Corporate Parent Alembic Global Holdings S/A for Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (crb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,637,512 ;9,144,547. (crb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A and B

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Glaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2470666.) - filed by Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED Consent Judgment, by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 11/26/2018 (nms). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/26/2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: GlaxoSmithKline LLC answer due 11/26/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/16/2018. (nms) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/26/2018 - filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/16/2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: GlaxoSmithKline LLC answer due 11/16/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/9/2018. (nms) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/16/2018 - filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to GlaxoSmithKline LLC on 10/18/2018. (ceg) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • No Summons Issued. (crb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Corporate Parent Alembic Global Holdings S/A for Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (crb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,637,512 ;9,144,547. (crb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Glaxo Group Limited, GlaxoSmithKline LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2470666.) - filed by Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLAXO GROUP LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where GlaxoSmithKline LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian E. Farnan