This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2018 at 05:14:18 (UTC).

Aldapa et al v. Fowler Packing Company Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2015 Aldapa filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Fowler Packing Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Garland E. Burrell and Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00420

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Garland E. Burrell

Referral Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Beatriz Aldapa

Elmer Avalos

Defendants

AG Force LLC

Fowler Marketing International LLC

Fowler Packing Company Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ira Lawrence Gottlieb

Mario Martinez

Defendant Attorneys

Howard A. Sagaser

Ian Blade Wieland

 

Court Documents

#185

(#185) ORDER GRANTING Motion for Class Certification IN PART and DENYING Motion for Trial Plan 145 , 149 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/24/2018. (Hellings, J)

#182

(#182) ORDER Granting Request for Redaction, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/19/2017. (1. Defendants' 180 request for the filing of redacted versions of these documents on the public docket is granted, and only the parties to this action and the court itself shall have access to the unredacted documents; 2. Plaintiffs' are directed to file the redacted grower's list and ranch map index on the court's docket within seven (7) days; and 3. To the extent the court's prior 179 order required plaintiffs to file unredacted versions of these documents, it is withdrawn.)(Gaumnitz, R)

#179

(#179) ORDER Denying 177 Request for Sealing, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/12/2017. (Since plaintiffs sought to use these documents in connection with their class certification motion, plaintiffs are directed to file the unredacted versions of these documents on the courts docket within seven (7) days of this order.)(Gaumnitz, R)

#171

(#171) ORDER Directing Additional Briefing (re 145 plaintiff's motion for class certification), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/19/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)

#144

(#144) ORDER Granting Relief From Page Limitations and Extending Deadline for Filing Reply Brief (Doc. 143 ), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/30/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)

#142

(#142) ORDER on Defendants' 136 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Leave to Amend Answer, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/12/2017. (The hearing set for 1/17/2017 is vacated. The matter is taken under submission and a written order will follow eventually, though not until appellate proceedings before the Ninth Circuit in the related case of Fowler Packing Co., Inc. v. Lanier, No. 1:16-cv-00106-DAD-SAB have concluded.)(Gaumnitz, R)

#139

(#139) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DEPOSIT FUNDS PURSUANT TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA LOCAL RULE 150. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/15/2016. (Hernandez, M)

#135

(#135) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, WITH A DUE DATE OF MARCH 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/9/2016. (Hernandez, M)

#128

(#128) ORDER Denying 117 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/19/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)

#96

(#96) ORDER RE STIPULATION RE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONIC RECORDS AND UNDERLYING RAW DATA. The defendants shall pay for the cost of production and redaction and that production will be provided on or before Monday, June 6, 2016 by 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/17/2016. (Hernandez, M)

#77

(#77) ORDER Denying 47 Motion For Trial Plan, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/13/2016. (Defendants' motion for an order requiring plaintiffs to submit a detailed trial plan with their motion for class certification is denied at this time without prejudice. The previously noticed April 19, 2016 hearing on defendants' motion is vacated.) (Gaumnitz, R)

#68

(#68) ORDER RE STIPULATION VACATING APRIL 27, 2016 HEARING AND BRIEFING DATES ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/8/2016. (Hernandez, M)

#63

(#63) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AT PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/2016. (Hernandez, M)

#55

(#55) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AT PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION. The Court sets the hearing on defendants motion to compel further responses at plaintiffs deposition to March 16, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Plaintiffs reply to defendants opposition to the motion for approval of opt-out disclosure notice shall be filed no later than March 9, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/4/2016. (Hernandez, M)

#41

(#41) ORDER DENYING 35 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/7/2016. (Hernandez, M)

#40

(#40) ORDER VACATING the December 30, 2015, hearing on defendants' motion for reconsideration, document 35 . The Court, having reviewed the record, finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument. See Local Rule 230(g). Accordingly, the matter is taken under submission. The previously scheduled hearing set on December 30, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. is vacated and the parties will not be required to appear at that time. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/24/2015. (Rooney, M)

#33

(#33) ORDER Partially GRANTING Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Compel; and DENYING 29 Motion for Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/29/2015. (Kusamura, W)

#27

(#27) ORDER re STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/21/2015. (Kusamura, W)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#185) ORDER GRANTING Motion for Class Certification IN PART and DENYING Motion for Trial Plan 145 , 149 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/24/2018. (Hellings, J)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#182) ORDER Granting Request for Redaction, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/19/2017. (1. Defendants' 180 request for the filing of redacted versions of these documents on the public docket is granted, and only the parties to this action and the court itself shall have access to the unredacted documents; 2. Plaintiffs' are directed to file the redacted grower's list and ranch map index on the court's docket within seven (7) days; and 3. To the extent the court's prior 179 order required plaintiffs to file unredacted versions of these documents, it is withdrawn.)(Gaumnitz, R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#179) ORDER Denying 177 Request for Sealing, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/12/2017. (Since plaintiffs sought to use these documents in connection with their class certification motion, plaintiffs are directed to file the unredacted versions of these documents on the courts docket within seven (7) days of this order.)(Gaumnitz, R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#171) ORDER Directing Additional Briefing (re 145 plaintiff's motion for class certification), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/19/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#144) ORDER Granting Relief From Page Limitations and Extending Deadline for Filing Reply Brief (Doc. 143 ), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/30/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#142) ORDER on Defendants' 136 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Leave to Amend Answer, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/12/2017. (The hearing set for 1/17/2017 is vacated. The matter is taken under submission and a written order will follow eventually, though not until appellate proceedings before the Ninth Circuit in the related case of Fowler Packing Co., Inc. v. Lanier, No. 1:16-cv-00106-DAD-SAB have concluded.)(Gaumnitz, R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#139) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DEPOSIT FUNDS PURSUANT TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA LOCAL RULE 150. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/15/2016. (Hernandez, M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#135) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, WITH A DUE DATE OF MARCH 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/9/2016. (Hernandez, M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) ORDER Denying 117 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/19/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) ORDER RE THIRD STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATE FOR FILING OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification shall be filed on or before December 21, 2016 and Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification shall be filed on or before January 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/11/2016. (Hernandez, M)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) ORDER Granting 97 Motion Motion For Reconsideration in Part, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/16/2016. (The magistrate judge's order requiring plaintiffs at their depositions to divulge the identities of putative class members who attended meetings with class counsel is overruled. Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is denied in all other respects.) (Gaumnitz, R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) ORDER RE STIPULATION RE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONIC RECORDS AND UNDERLYING RAW DATA. The defendants shall pay for the cost of production and redaction and that production will be provided on or before Monday, June 6, 2016 by 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/17/2016. (Hernandez, M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) ORDER Denying 47 Motion For Trial Plan, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/13/2016. (Defendants' motion for an order requiring plaintiffs to submit a detailed trial plan with their motion for class certification is denied at this time without prejudice. The previously noticed April 19, 2016 hearing on defendants' motion is vacated.) (Gaumnitz, R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) ORDER RE STIPULATION VACATING APRIL 27, 2016 HEARING AND BRIEFING DATES ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/8/2016. (Hernandez, M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AT PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/2016. (Hernandez, M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AT PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION. The Court sets the hearing on defendants motion to compel further responses at plaintiffs deposition to March 16, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Plaintiffs reply to defendants opposition to the motion for approval of opt-out disclosure notice shall be filed no later than March 9, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/4/2016. (Hernandez, M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER DENYING 35 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/7/2016. (Hernandez, M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER VACATING the December 30, 2015, hearing on defendants' motion for reconsideration, document 35 . The Court, having reviewed the record, finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument. See Local Rule 230(g). Accordingly, the matter is taken under submission. The previously scheduled hearing set on December 30, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. is vacated and the parties will not be required to appear at that time. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/24/2015. (Rooney, M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER Partially GRANTING Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Compel; and DENYING 29 Motion for Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/29/2015. (Kusamura, W)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER re STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/21/2015. (Kusamura, W)

    Read MoreRead Less