This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:39:59 (UTC).

Albany Foam & Supply, Inc. v. Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2013 Albany Foam Supply, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary (MDL2196). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:13-PF-10002

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary (MDL2196)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albany Foam & Supply, Inc.

Defendants

FFP Holdings, LLC

Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company

Valle Foam Industries, Inc

Domfoam International, Inc

Carpenter Company

Woodbridge Foam Corporation

Flexible Foam Products LLC

Flexible Foam Products, Inc.

Scottdel, Inc.

Foamex Innovations, Inc.

Future Foam, Inc.

Vitafoam Products Canada Limited

Vitafoam, Inc.

British Vita Unlimited

Mohawk Industries Inc.

Leggett & Platt Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James P. Lynch

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Williams & Connolly

725 Twelfth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Charles E. Tompkins

Attorney at Williams Montgomery & John

233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley R. Love

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Anitra G. Royster

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Durham

4721 Emperor Blvd.

Durham, NC 27703

Frank A. Hirsch, Jr.

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Durham

555 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601

Heather B. Adams

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Alston & Bird - Durham

4721 Emperor Blvd.

Durham, NC 27703

Matthew P. McGuire

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Durham

555 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601

Matthew D. Montaigne

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Durham

555 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601

Michael R. Hoernlein

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Charlotte

101 South Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28280

Richard A. McAvoy

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Durham

555 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601

Bethany G. Lukitsch

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Howard Feller

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

James H. Walsh

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Allison C. Kop

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher - San Francisco

555 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Candice E.M. Ray

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Cynthia E. Richman

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher - Washington

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Daniel G. Swanson

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher - Los Angeles

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Dhananjay S. Manthripragada

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher - Los Angeles

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jamie E. France

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Nicola T. Hanna

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher - Irvine

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

39 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Order of case closing per the attached Order of termination of multidistrict litigation filed in the master docket, MDL 2196, 1:10md2196, document no. 2114. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/2/2016. (R,Sh) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

#17

(#17) Order of Dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiff's claims against Carpenter Company. Related document #16 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 1/7/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

16 #1

Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) Order of Dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiff's claims against defendants Vitafoam, Inc., Vitafoam Products Canada Limited and British Vita Unlimited pursuant to FRCP 41. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/29/13.(S,R) (Entered: 08/29/2013)

#14

(#14) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Ryan, Peter) (Entered: 04/18/2013)

#13

(#13) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Flexible Foam Products, Inc.. (Millard, Kendall) (Entered: 04/15/2013)

#12

(#12) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Carpenter Company. (Lukitsch, Bethany) (Entered: 04/15/2013)

#11

(#11) Answer to #1 Complaint filed by British Vita Unlimited, Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, Vitafoam, Inc.. (Coleman, Timothy) (Entered: 04/15/2013)

#10

(#10) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. (McGuire, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2013)

#9

(#9) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Future Foam, Inc.. (Blinn, Meghan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)

#8

(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Woodbridge Foam Corporation. (Kop, Allison) (Entered: 04/08/2013)

#7

(#7) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Leggett & Platt Inc.. (Novion, Laurie) (Entered: 04/01/2013)

#6

(#6) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Mohawk Industries Inc.. (Bonder, Teresa) (Entered: 04/01/2013)

#5

(#5) FILING ERROR. Incomplete document Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Leggett & Platt Inc. (Novion, Laurie) Modified on 4/2/2013 (S,R). (Entered: 04/01/2013)

#4

(#4) Return of Service by Clerk by Federal Express Overnight Delivery executed upon British Vita Unlimited on 3/4/2013; Carpenter Company on 3/4/2013; Domfoam International, Inc on 3/4/2013; Flexible Foam Products, Inc. on 3/4/2013; Foamex Innovations, Inc. on 3/4/2013; Future Foam, Inc. on 3/4/2013; Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company on 3/4/2013; Leggett & Platt Inc. on 3/4/2013; Mohawk Industries Inc. on 3/4/2013; Valle Foam Industries, Inc on 3/4/2013; Vitafoam Products Canada Limited on 3/4/2013; Vitafoam, Inc. on 3/4/2013; Woodbridge Foam Corporation on 3/4/2013, filed on behalf of Albany Foam & Supply, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Lynch, James) (Entered: 03/05/2013)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order of case closing per the attached Order of termination of multidistrict litigation filed in the master docket, MDL 2196, 1:10md2196, document no. 2114. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/2/2016. (R,Sh) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Order of Dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiff's claims against Carpenter Company. Related document #16 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 1/7/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Carpenter Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lukitsch, Bethany) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Order of Dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiff's claims against defendants Vitafoam, Inc., Vitafoam Products Canada Limited and British Vita Unlimited pursuant to FRCP 41. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/29/13.(S,R) (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Ryan, Peter) (Entered: 04/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Flexible Foam Products, Inc.. (Millard, Kendall) (Entered: 04/15/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Carpenter Company. (Lukitsch, Bethany) (Entered: 04/15/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Answer to #1 Complaint filed by British Vita Unlimited, Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, Vitafoam, Inc.. (Coleman, Timothy) (Entered: 04/15/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. (McGuire, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Future Foam, Inc.. (Blinn, Meghan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Woodbridge Foam Corporation. (Kop, Allison) (Entered: 04/08/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Leggett & Platt Inc.. (Novion, Laurie) (Entered: 04/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Mohawk Industries Inc.. (Bonder, Teresa) (Entered: 04/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR. Incomplete document Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Leggett & Platt Inc. (Novion, Laurie) Modified on 4/2/2013 (S,R). (Entered: 04/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service by Clerk by Federal Express Overnight Delivery executed upon British Vita Unlimited on 3/4/2013; Carpenter Company on 3/4/2013; Domfoam International, Inc on 3/4/2013; Flexible Foam Products, Inc. on 3/4/2013; Foamex Innovations, Inc. on 3/4/2013; Future Foam, Inc. on 3/4/2013; Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company on 3/4/2013; Leggett & Platt Inc. on 3/4/2013; Mohawk Industries Inc. on 3/4/2013; Valle Foam Industries, Inc on 3/4/2013; Vitafoam Products Canada Limited on 3/4/2013; Vitafoam, Inc. on 3/4/2013; Woodbridge Foam Corporation on 3/4/2013, filed on behalf of Albany Foam & Supply, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Lynch, James) (Entered: 03/05/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons issued for service upon Carpenter Company, Domfoam International, Inc, Flexible Foam Products, Inc., Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company, Leggett & Platt Inc., Mohawk Industries Inc., Valle Foam Industries, Inc, Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, Vitafoam, Inc., Woodbridge Foam Corporation. (S,R) (Entered: 03/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons . filed by Albany Foam & Supply, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Lynch, James) (Entered: 02/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 350, Receipt number 0647-5837866. Filed by Albany Foam & Supply, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tompkins, Charles) (Entered: 02/15/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Domfoam International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Woodbridge Foam Corporation is a litigant