This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2018 at 13:45:46 (UTC).

Al-Mowafak et al v. Trump et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2017 Al-Mowafak filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Trump. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00557

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACLU of Northern California

Wasim Ghaleb

Jewish Family & Community Services East Bay

John Doe

Hadil Al-Mowafak

Defendants

Donald Trump

Rex W Tillerson

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

U.S. Customs and Border Protection

U.S. Department of State

Kevin McAleenan

John Kelly

Carrie Azurin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham

Vakili Bardis

Novella Yvette Coleman

William S. Freeman

Lee Gelernt

Omar C. Jadwat

Ian Asher Kanig

R. Adam Lauridsen

Robert Adam Lauridsen

John David Loy

Julia Harumi Mass, Esq.

Jennifer C. Newell

Jay Rapaport

Michael Temple Risher

Eduardo E. Santacana

Andre Ivan Segura

Christine Patricia Sun

Frances Cheston Thacher

Cecillia Derphine Wang

Grace Yu-Ting Yang

 

Court Documents

#59

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) ORDER granting 58 STIPULATION regarding schedule for 57 MOTION to Stay. Response due by 4/11/2017. Reply due by 4/13/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/06/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Certificate of Interested Entities by ACLU of Northern California, Hadil Al-Mowafak, John Doe, Wasim Ghaleb, Jewish Family & Community Services East Bay [Plaintiffs' Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons] (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 2/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Summons Issued as to Carrie Azurin. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Summons Issued as to Kevin McAleenan. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Summons Issued as to John Kelly. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Summons Issued as to Rex W Tillerson. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of State. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ERRONEOUSLY POSTED: PLEASE DISREGARD Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of State. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017) Modified on 2/3/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge; by ACLU of Northern California, Hadil Al-Mowafak, JOHN DOE, Wasim Ghaleb, Jewish Family & Community Services East Bay. (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 2/2/2017) Modified on 2/3/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Proposed Summons. (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 2/2/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Proposed Summons. (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 2/2/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proposed Summons. (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 2/2/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proposed Summons. (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 2/2/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons. (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 2/2/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 2/2/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 2/2/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 2/2/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11127128.). Filed byJOHN DOE, Wasim Ghaleb, ACLU of Northern California, Hadil Al-Mowafak, Jewish Family & Community Services East Bay. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 2/2/2017) Modified on 2/3/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACLU OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where Jewish Family and Children's Services is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Customs and Border Protection is a litigant

Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant