This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 07:21:46 (UTC).

Al-Ali v. Ken Garff Automotive Group et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 Al-Ali filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ken Garff Automotive Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mona K. Majzoub and Paul D. Borman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-12687

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mona K. Majzoub

Presiding Judge

Paul D. Borman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aashahla Al-Ali

Eastpointe, MI 48021

Defendants

Ken Garff Automotive Group

Southfield Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram

Colleen Coleman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Ryan J. Koss

Attorney at Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos & Stoner, PLLC

20700 Civic Center Drive, Suite 290

Southfield, MI 48076

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Compel Arbitration. Response due by 11/1/2018; Reply due by 11/8/2018 (LHos) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

11 #9

Exhibit H - Kettles v. Rent-Way, Inc.

11 #8

Exhibit G - Powell v. Sparrow Hospital

11 #7

Exhibit F - Foxworth v. Radio One, Inc.

11 #6

Exhibit E - Knepper v. Holley Dev. Co.

11 #5

Exhibit D - Dawson v. Rent-A-Center, Inc.

11 #4

Exhibit C - Powers v. Charles River Labs., Inc.

11 #3

Exhibit B - Complaint

11 #2

Exhibit A - Agreement

11 #1

Index of Exhibits

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Compel Arbitration by Colleen Coleman, Ken Garff Automotive Group. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Powers v. Charles River Labs., Inc., #5 Exhibit D - Dawson v. Rent-A-Center, Inc., #6 Exhibit E - Knepper v. Holley Dev. Co., #7 Exhibit F - Foxworth v. Radio One, Inc., #8 Exhibit G - Powell v. Sparrow Hospital, #9 Exhibit H - Kettles v. Rent-Way, Inc.) (Koss, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (SOso) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Colleen Coleman served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (SOso) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ken Garff Automotive Group served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (SOso) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Aashahla Al-Ali. (DPer) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument mailed to Aashahla Al-Ali, 21067 Beechwood Avenue, Eastpointe MI 48021. (LHos) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Compel Arbitration. Response due by 11/1/2018; Reply due by 11/8/2018 (LHos) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Compel Arbitration by Colleen Coleman, Ken Garff Automotive Group. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Powers v. Charles River Labs., Inc., #5 Exhibit D - Dawson v. Rent-A-Center, Inc., #6 Exhibit E - Knepper v. Holley Dev. Co., #7 Exhibit F - Foxworth v. Radio One, Inc., #8 Exhibit G - Powell v. Sparrow Hospital, #9 Exhibit H - Kettles v. Rent-Way, Inc.) (Koss, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (SOso) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Colleen Coleman served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (SOso) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ken Garff Automotive Group served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (SOso) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #7 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge, #6 Directing Service by the US Marshal on Aashahla Al-Ali at 21067 Beechwood Avenue,Eastpointe, MI 48021. (DTof) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Aashahla Al-Ali. (DPer) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Aashahla Al-Ali against defendants (DPer) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less