This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2022 at 16:52:21 (UTC).

Akira Technologies, Inc. v. Conceptant, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2017 Akira Technologies, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Conceptant, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and Ivan D. Davis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00412

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Akira Technologies, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Joshua Phipps

Andrey Mikhalchuk

Lisa Houle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Randolph Shiplett

Attorney at Randolph Law PLLC

252 N Washington Street

Falls Church, VA 22046

Nishat Azam

Attorney at Randolph Law PLLC

252 N Washington Street

Falls Church, VA 22046

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Elaine Charlson Bredehoft

Attorney at Charlson Bredehoft Cohen Brown & Jones PC

11260 Roger Bacon Dr, Suite 201

Reston, VA 20190

David Eric Murphy

Attorney at Charlson Bredehoft Cohen & Brown PC

11260 Roger Bacon Dr, Suite 201

Reston, VA 20190

Peter Charles Cohen

Attorney at Charlson Bredehoft Cohen Brown & Jones PC

11260 Roger Bacon Dr, Suite 201

Reston, VA 20190

 

Court Documents

#127

(#127) NOTICE by Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc., Joshua Phipps of Satisfaction of Bill of Costs (Cohen, Peter) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#126

(#126) Costs Taxed in amount of $ 5413.45 against Akira Technologies, Inc. (awac, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#125

(#125) USCA Mandate re #117 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this court, entered 5/8/2019, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of FRAP. (rban, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#124

(#124) Letter to Counsel regarding taxing of costs. (awac, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#123

(#123) USCA JUDGMENT affirming the Judgment of the district court as to #117 Notice of Appeal filed by Joshua Phipps, Lisa Houle, Conceptant, Inc., Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc. (dest, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#122

(#122) Unpublished Opinion of USCA re #117 Notice of Appeal- AFFIRMED. (dest, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

121 #3

Exhibit 7

121 #1

Exhibit 4

#117

(#119) Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #117 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (lcre, ) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

1 #25

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #15

Exhibit 15

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #1

Exhibit 1

412 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) NOTICE by Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc., Joshua Phipps of Satisfaction of Bill of Costs (Cohen, Peter) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) Costs Taxed in amount of $ 5413.45 against Akira Technologies, Inc. (awac, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) USCA Mandate re #117 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this court, entered 5/8/2019, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of FRAP. (rban, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) Letter to Counsel regarding taxing of costs. (awac, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) USCA JUDGMENT affirming the Judgment of the district court as to #117 Notice of Appeal filed by Joshua Phipps, Lisa Houle, Conceptant, Inc., Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc. (dest, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) Unpublished Opinion of USCA re #117 Notice of Appeal- AFFIRMED. (dest, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) NOTICE by Akira Technologies, Inc. re #118 Order on Motion to Seal,, Filing of Documents not Subject to Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 7)(Shiplett, Christopher) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) USCA Case Number 18-1655 4th Circuit, Case Manager E. Borneisen for #117 Notice of Appeal filed by Joshua Phipps, Lisa Houle, Conceptant, Inc., Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc. (dest, ) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #117 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (lcre, ) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) ORDER - Upon consideration of the pleadings, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Motion #112 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is hereby further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Seal #68 is DENIED as moot. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' Motions to Seal #54 and #78 are DENIED as moot. It is further ORDERED that the parties file publicly the documents or the portions of documents not subject to sealing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 6/9/18. **See Order for further details**(gwalk, ) (Entered: 06/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Hearing Date set for June 23, 2017 re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Cohen, Peter) (Entered: 05/26/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc., Joshua Phipps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Cohen, Peter) (Entered: 05/26/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, NuCognition, Inc., Joshua Phipps. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Peter) (Entered: 05/26/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) So Ordered re #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Shannon Munley, David Wood, and Chiron Solutions, Inc., filed by Akira Technologies, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/23/2017. (dest, ) (Entered: 05/23/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Shannon Munley, David Wood, and Chiron Solutions, Inc. by Akira Technologies, Inc. (Shiplett, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. ORDERED that all Defendants shall have up through and including May 26, 2017 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 05/10/2017. (lgue, ) (Entered: 05/10/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings by Chiron Solutions, Inc., Conceptant, Inc., Lisa Houle, Andrey Mikhalchuk, Shannon Munley, NuCognition, Inc., Joshua Phipps, David Wood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bredehoft, Elaine) (Entered: 05/08/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ) (Entered: 04/05/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Akira Technologies, Inc.. (acha, ) (Entered: 04/05/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5453129.), filed by Akira Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Civil Cover Sheet)(acha, ) (Entered: 04/05/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less