This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2018 at 07:51:20 (UTC).

Akin v. Talbott et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 Akin filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Talbott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00183

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caroline Akin

Defendants

Deidre Talbott

Dara Talbott

John Talbott

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Sean McEvoy

Attorney at Fried Rogers Goldberg LLC

3550 Lenox Road Northeast,, Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30326

Joseph A Fried

Attorney at Fried Rogers Goldberg LLC

3550 Lenox Road Northeast,, Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30326

Defendant Attorneys

Travis B Holly

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz (Chatt)

1900 Republic Centre, 633 Chestnut Street

Chattanooga, TN 37450

K Stephen Powers

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz (Chatt)

1900 Republic Centre, 633 Chestnut Street

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Leslie T Foster

Attorney at Spears, Moore, Rebman & Williams P.C.

601 Market Street, Suite 400

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Joseph R White

Attorney at Spears, Moore, Rebman & Williams P.C.

601 Market Street, Suite 400

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG, ) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#18

(#18) CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Honorable Christopher Steger, USMJ. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/27/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF CONSENT by Dara Talbott, Deidre Talbott, John Talbott (Powers, K) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

16 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge

#16

(#16) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dara Talbott, Deidre Talbott, John Talbott.(Powers, K) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendants on 08/15/2018, filed by Caroline Akin. (McEvoy, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: The above style case has been determined to be related to Ivy Torres v. Dara Talbott, et al., Case No. 1:18-CV-176-PLR-CHS. Therefore, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Pamela L. Reeves, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Any matters routinely considered by a magistrate judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and the Rules of this Court, are REASSIGNED to the Honorable Christopher H. Steger, United States Magistrate Judge.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/17/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/9/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/9/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/9/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

2 #3

Summons USAA Casualty Insurance Company

2 #2

Summons Deidre Talbott

2 #1

Summons John Talbott

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Dara Talbott, Deidre Talbott, John Talbott, USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons John Talbott, #2 Summons Deidre Talbott, #3 Summons USAA Casualty Insurance Company)(aws, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

1 #2

Summons Dara Talbott Summons

1 #1

Other Civil Coversheet

#1

(#11) SEPARATE ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(White, Joseph) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG, ) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Honorable Christopher Steger, USMJ. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/27/18. (ABF) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE OF CONSENT by Dara Talbott, Deidre Talbott, John Talbott (Powers, K) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dara Talbott, Deidre Talbott, John Talbott.(Powers, K) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Certificate of Corporate Interest by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (White, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUPPLEMENT to #11 Answer to Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (White, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #11 Answer to Complaint : requirements due by 9/10/2018. (AML, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SEPARATE ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(White, Joseph) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed USAA Casualty Insurance Company served on 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AML, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendants on 08/15/2018, filed by Caroline Akin. (McEvoy, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: The above style case has been determined to be related to Ivy Torres v. Dara Talbott, et al., Case No. 1:18-CV-176-PLR-CHS. Therefore, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Pamela L. Reeves, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Any matters routinely considered by a magistrate judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and the Rules of this Court, are REASSIGNED to the Honorable Christopher H. Steger, United States Magistrate Judge.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/17/18. (ABF) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • (#6) ORDER RELATING CASES. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Case No. 1:18-cv-176. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(1). Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Pamela Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher Steger, this case will also be assigned to those same judges. However, consolidation is not ordered. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8/9/18. (Steger, Christopher) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/9/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/9/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/9/18. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Dara Talbott, Deidre Talbott, John Talbott, USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons John Talbott, #2 Summons Deidre Talbott, #3 Summons USAA Casualty Insurance Company)(aws, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3738737.), filed by Caroline Akin. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons Dara Talbott Summons, #3 Summons John Talbott Summons, #4 Summons Deidre Talbott Summons, #5 Summons USAA Casualty Insurance Company)(McEvoy, Robert) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less