This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 11:38:10 (UTC).

Ak-Chin Indian Community v. Central Arizona Water Conservation District

Case Summary

On 03/28/2017 Ak-Chin Indian Community filed an Other lawsuit against Central Arizona Water Conservation District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is David G Campbell. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-00918

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David G Campbell

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Ak-Chin Indian Community

Defendants, Counter Claimants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Central Arizona Water Conservation District

Leslie Meyers

United States of America

Ryan Zinke

United States Bureau of Reclamation

Terry Fulp

United States Department of Interior

David Murillo

Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

Leslie Meyers

United States of America

Ryan Zinke

United States Bureau of Reclamation

Terry Fulp

United States Department of Interior

David Murillo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan Jean Fidel

Charles W Galbraith

Catherine F Munson

Robert Fred Palmquist

Mark Howard Reeves

Defendant, Counter Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Sara Jane Agne

Sarah Elizabeth Delaney

Brett William Johnson

David Scott Johnson

Jay Michael Johnson

 

Court Documents

#89

(#89) ORDER granting 76 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 76 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/12/2018.(DGC, nvo)

#61

(#61) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Joinder of Additional Parties. The United States shall respond to Ak-Chin's complaint on or before 9/1/2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/27/2017.(DGC, nvo)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) ORDER granting 76 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 76 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/12/2018.(DGC, nvo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Joinder of Additional Parties. The United States shall respond to Ak-Chin's complaint on or before 9/1/2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/27/2017.(DGC, nvo)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ak-Chin Indian Community is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL ARIZONA WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant