This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2019 at 07:58:34 (UTC).

Ajao v. Central Loan Administration and Reporting

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 Ajao filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Central Loan Administration and Reporting. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff and Ellen S. Carmody. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01245

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judge

Ellen S. Carmody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Olubunmi Ajao

Kentwood, MI 49508

Defendant

Central Loan Administration and Reporting

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Steven A. Jacobs

Attorney at Schneiderman and Sherman PC

23938 Research Dr., Ste. 300

Farmington Hills, MI 48335

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #7 ; denying motion for preliminary injunction #2 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#7

(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 be denied; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

10 #7

Certificate of Service

10 #6

Exhibit E

10 #5

Exhibit D

10 #4

Exhibit C

10 #3

Exhibit B

10 #2

Exhibit A

10 #1

Index

#10

(#10) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Central Loan Administration and Reporting; (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service) (Jacobs, Steven) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Central Loan Administration and Reporting served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018 (ns) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of receipt of case (ns) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Olubunmi Ajao; (ns) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Central Loan Administration and Reporting filed by Olubunmi Ajao (ns) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Central Loan Administration and Reporting; (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service) (Jacobs, Steven) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Regarding Report and Recommendation #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Olubunmi Ajao (slk) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #7 ; denying motion for preliminary injunction #2 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Central Loan Administration and Reporting served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018 (ns) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Report and Recommendation #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Olubunmi Ajao (ns) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 be denied; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Loan Administration and Reporting and delivered to US Marshal for service (ns) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Olubunmi Ajao (ns) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Olubunmi Ajao (ns) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Olubunmi Ajao (ns) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of receipt of case (ns) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Olubunmi Ajao; (ns) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Central Loan Administration and Reporting filed by Olubunmi Ajao (ns) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less