This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2021 at 01:59:58 (UTC).

Air Kiribati Limited v. CAAMS, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/20/2014 Air Kiribati Limited filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAAMS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and Dennis Howell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00300

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

Dennis Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Air Kiribati Limited

Counter Claimant and Defendant

CAAMS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Inez Carteen

Attorney at Howard and Howard Attorneys PLLC

2049 Century Park E, Suite 330

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Wyatt S. Stevens

Attorney at Roberts & Stevens, P.A.

One West Pack Sq., Suite 1100, P.O. Box 7647

Asheville, NC 28802

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Joseph Pinckney McGuire

Attorney at McGuire, Wood & Bissette, P. A.

P. O. Box 3180

Asheville, NC 28802-3180

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice with consent by Trustee by Air Kiribati Limited (Stevens, Wyatt) Modified text on 11/17/2017 (kby). (Entered: 11/16/2017)

#46

(#46) ORDER that, within 180 days of the entry of this Order, the parties shall file the pleadings necessary to dismiss this case re #45 Status Report. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 07/07/2017. (thh) (Entered: 07/07/2017)

#45

(#45) STATUS REPORT by Air Kiribati Limited (Stevens, Wyatt) (Entered: 07/05/2017)

#44

(#44) ORDER parties Status Report regarding this action due by 7/6/2017. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/22/17. (ejb) (Entered: 06/22/2017)

43 #3

Exhibit

43 #2

Envelope

43 #1

Letter

#43

(#43) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by CAAMS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Duplicate paperwork received in Charlotte Clerk's office)(emw) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

#41

(#41) ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/16/15. (emw) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Air Kiribati Limited re #7 Sealed Document, #6 Order on Motion to Seal Document (Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Air Kiribati Limited re #7 Sealed Document, #6 Order on Motion to Seal Document (Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to CAAMS, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

4 #1

Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Air Kiribati Limited's Motion to Seal E

#4

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/01/14. (emw) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air Kiribati Limited (Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Inez Damji on behalf of Air Kiribati Limited (Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

#1

(#7) Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): re: #1 Complaint (available to Air Kiribati Limited, CAAMS, LLC) (Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice with consent by Trustee by Air Kiribati Limited (Stevens, Wyatt) Modified text on 11/17/2017 (kby). (Entered: 11/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER that, within 180 days of the entry of this Order, the parties shall file the pleadings necessary to dismiss this case re #45 Status Report. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 07/07/2017. (thh) (Entered: 07/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) STATUS REPORT by Air Kiribati Limited (Stevens, Wyatt) (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER parties Status Report regarding this action due by 7/6/2017. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/22/17. (ejb) (Entered: 06/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by CAAMS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Duplicate paperwork received in Charlotte Clerk's office)(emw) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Docket(#42) ***PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR. (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/16/15. (emw) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE by Air Kiribati Limited of Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carteen, Lisa) (Entered: 11/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER granting #38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Defendant will continue to be represented by the law firm of McGuire, Wood & Bissette, P.A. in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/05/15. (emw) (Main Document 39 replaced with correct PDF on 11/5/2015) (emw). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 11/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CAAMS, LLC. (McGuire, Joseph). Motions referred to Dennis Howell. (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Air Kiribati Limited. CAAMS, LLC served on 11/25/2014, answer due 12/16/2014. (Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Air Kiribati Limited re #7 Sealed Document, #6 Order on Motion to Seal Document (Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): re: #1 Complaint (available to Air Kiribati Limited, CAAMS, LLC) (Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/01/14. (emw) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to CAAMS, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • DocketNOTICE: Case was filed in wrong division. Case has been copied from 3:14-cv-650 to 1:14-cv-300. Please use 1:14-cv-300 for all future pleadings. (eef) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Seal Exhibit "A" to Air Kiribati Limited's Complaint by Air Kiribati Limited. Responses due by 12/8/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Air Kiribati Limited's Motion to Seal Exhibit "A" to Complaint)(Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air Kiribati Limited (Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Inez Damji on behalf of Air Kiribati Limited (Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CAAMS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-2490888), filed by Air Kiribati Limited.(Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Pinckney McGuire