This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/06/2019 at 08:01:02 (UTC).

Air Control Music, Inc. et al v. Monger Entertainment Group Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 Air Control Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Monger Entertainment Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05132

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Air Control Music, Inc.

Uh Oh Entertainment

Boomer X Publishing, Inc.

North Avenue Music

Bovina Music, Inc.

Dead Game Publishing

Divine Mill Music

Fingaz Goal Music

Defendants

Sampson B. Monger

Bernice P. Monger

Monger Entertainment Group Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Latoya Brisbane

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (jtj) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#7

(#7) Standing Order: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto.To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/13/2018. (jtj) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED AO 121 . (Brisbane, Latoya) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air Control Music, Inc., Boomer X Publishing, Inc., Bovina Music, Inc., Dead Game Publishing, Divine Mill Music, Fingaz Goal Music, North Avenue Music, Uh Oh Entertainment. (eop) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Bernice P. Monger. (eop) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Sampson B. Monger. (eop) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Monger Entertainment Group Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit - Schdule A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Boomer X Publishing, Inc., Bovina Music, Inc., Fingaz Goal Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, North Avenue Music, Air Control Music, Inc., Dead Game Publishing and Divine Mill Music. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8258902) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/08/2018)

 

Docket Entries

11/13/2018
View Court Documents

(#8) AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (jtj) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2018
View Court Documents

(#7) Standing Order: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto.To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/13/2018. (jtj) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2018
View Court Documents

(#6) PROPOSED AO 121 . (Brisbane, Latoya) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2018

Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2018
View Court Documents

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air Control Music, Inc., Boomer X Publishing, Inc., Bovina Music, Inc., Dead Game Publishing, Divine Mill Music, Fingaz Goal Music, North Avenue Music, Uh Oh Entertainment. (eop) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2018
View Court Documents

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Bernice P. Monger. (eop) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2018
View Court Documents

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Sampson B. Monger. (eop) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2018
View Court Documents

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Monger Entertainment Group Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2018
View Court Documents

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Boomer X Publishing, Inc., Bovina Music, Inc., Fingaz Goal Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, North Avenue Music, Air Control Music, Inc., Dead Game Publishing and Divine Mill Music. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8258902) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/08/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less