This case was last updated from PACER on 02/25/2019 at 07:55:27 (UTC).

AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Shanghai Zhengene Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Shanghai Zhengene Pharmaceuticals, Co Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01069

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Defendants

Shanghai Zhengene Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd.

Suoming Zhang

Shenzhen Chuangxin Huishi Biotechnology Co., Ltd.

Shanghai Tangrun Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lam Khanh Nguyen

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover St

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Meg Vergeront

Attorney at Stafford Rosenbaum LLP

222 West Washington Avenue, Suite 900, P.O. Box 1784

Madison, WI 53703-1784

Jeffrey Adam Mandell

Attorney at Stafford Rosenbaum LLP

P.O. Box 1784, 222 W Washington Ave, 900

Madison, WI 53701

Susan Marie Krumplitsch

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1130

Richard Allen Latta

Attorney at Stafford Rosenbaum LLP

222 West Washington Ave, Suite 900, P.O. Box 1784

Madison, WI 53701

Kyle W. Engelke

Attorney at Stafford Rosenbaum

222 W Washington Ave, 900

Madison, WI 53701

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Patrick Smith

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Richard L. Bolton

Attorney at Boardman & Clark LLP

1 South Pinckney Street, 4Th Floor, P.O. Box 927

Madison, WI 53701-0927

 

Court Documents

30 #1

Exhibit A - Waivers

#30

(#30) Brief in Opposition by Defendants Shanghai Tangrun Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd., Shanghai Zhengene Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd., Shenzhen Chuangxin Huishi Biotechnology Co., Ltd., Suoming Zhang re: #25 Motion for Substituted Service filed by AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waivers) (Bolton, Richard) Modified on 2/20/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#29

(#29) Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle W. Engelke for Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Engelke, Kyle) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

28 #7

Exhibit 7 - FedEx Tracking

28 #6

Exhibit 6 - FedEx Tracking

28 #3

Exhibit 3 - FedEx Tracking

28 #2

Exhibit 2 - FedEx Tracking

28 #1

Exhibit 1 - FedEx Tracking

#25

(#25) Motion for Substituted Service by Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Response due 2/21/2019. (Vergeront, Meg) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

2 #7

Summons - Zhang

2 #6

Summons - Immunova

2 #5

Summons - Zhengene

2 #4

Summons - Tangrun

2 #3

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit B - Proposal

2 #1

Exhibit A - Master Service Agreement

#2

(#2) Redaction to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Proposal, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Tangrun, #5 Summons - Zhengene, #6 Summons - Immunova, #7 Summons - Zhang) (Vergeront, Meg) Modified on 12/28/2018. (arw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff's motion for substituted service (dkt. #25 ) is DENIED AS MOOT in light of the corporate defendants' waivers of service (dkt. #30 -1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/20/2019. (kwf) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Brief in Opposition by Defendants Shanghai Tangrun Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd., Shanghai Zhengene Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd., Shenzhen Chuangxin Huishi Biotechnology Co., Ltd., Suoming Zhang re: #25 Motion for Substituted Service filed by AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waivers) (Bolton, Richard) Modified on 2/20/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle W. Engelke for Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Engelke, Kyle) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Declaration of Tracy Gibbs filed by Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re: #25 Motion for Substituted Service, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FedEx Tracking, #2 Exhibit 2 - FedEx Tracking, #3 Exhibit 3 - FedEx Tracking, #4 Exhibit 4 - FedEx Tracking, #5 Exhibit 5 - FedEx Tracking, #6 Exhibit 6 - FedEx Tracking, #7 Exhibit 7 - FedEx Tracking, #8 Exhibit 8 - FedEx Tracking, #9 Exhibit 9 - FedEx Tracking, #10 Exhibit 10 - FedEx Tracking, #11 Exhibit 11 - FedEx Tracking, #12 Exhibit 12 - FedEx Tracking, #13 Exhibit 13 - FedEx Tracking, #14 Exhibit 14 - FedEx Tracking, #15 Exhibit 15 - Email re: Service in China, #16 Exhibit 16 - Affidavit of Due Diligence) (Vergeront, Meg) Modified on 2/14/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Declaration of Susan Krumplitsch filed by Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re: #25 Motion for Substituted Service, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email String, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D - Email String, #5 Exhibit E - Email, #6 Exhibit F - Correspondence, #7 Exhibit G - Download Notification) (Vergeront, Meg) Modified on 2/14/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Brief in Support of #25 Motion for Substituted Service by Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Vergeront, Meg) Modified on 2/14/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Motion for Substituted Service by Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Response due 2/21/2019. (Vergeront, Meg) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #23 Motion to Admit Benjamin Patrick Smith Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/13/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Motion to Admit Benjamin Patrick Smith Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2408191.) by Defendants Shanghai Tangrun Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd., Shanghai Zhengene Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd., Shenzhen Chuangxin Huishi Biotechnology Co., Ltd., Suoming Zhang. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Smith, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Redaction to #21 Declaration by Defendant Suoming Zhang, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated 2/1/2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - E-mail Exchange) (lak) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion to Admit Lam Khanh Nguyen Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/28/2018. (lak) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Motion to Admit Lam Khanh Nguyen Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2383454.) by Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Nguyen, Lam) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Shanghai Tangrun Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd., Shanghai Zhengene Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd., Shenzhen Chuangxin Huishi Biotechnology Co., Ltd., Suoming Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Zhengene, #2 Summons - Immunova, #3 Summons - Zhang) (arw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Redaction to #4 Declaration of Susan M. Krumplitsch by Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit B - Proposal (Vergeront, Meg) Modified on 12/28/2018. (arw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Declaration of Susan M. Krumplitsch filed by Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re: #3 Motion to Seal (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit B - Proposal) (Vergeront, Meg) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion to Seal by Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Vergeront, Meg) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Redaction to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Plaintiff AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Proposal, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Tangrun, #5 Summons - Zhengene, #6 Summons - Immunova, #7 Summons - Zhang) (Vergeront, Meg) Modified on 12/28/2018. (arw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Shanghai Tangrun Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd., Shanghai Zhengene Pharmaceuticals, Co. Ltd., Shenzhen Chuangxin Huishi Biotechnology Co., Ltd., Suoming Zhang. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2383240) (Sealed Document), filed by AhR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Proposal, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Tangrun, #5 Summons - Zhengene, #6 Summons - Immunova, #7 Summons - Zhang) (Vergeront, Meg) Modified on 12/28/2018. (arw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.