This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/24/2019 at 07:14:01 (UTC).

Agnes-Sampson v. Arris International PLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 Agnes-Sampson filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Arris International PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Naomi Reice Buchwald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-12205

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Naomi Reice Buchwald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Louise Agnes-Sampson

Defendants

James A. Chiddix

Debora J. Wilson

Bruce McClelland

Arris International PLC

Doreen A. Toben

J. Timothy Bryan

Jeong Kim

Andrew W. Barron

David A. Woodle

Robert J. Stanzione

Andrew T. Heller

Barton Y. Shigemura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan Eneas Monteverde

Defendant Attorneys

Mary M Weeks

Aurora Cassirer

J. Timothy Mast

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

13 #1

Exhibit A

#13

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

#6

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit Certification

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketReceived e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:19-cv-00243, filed on 01/14/2019. (sjo) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Georgia. (ama) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES, IT IS SO ORDERED, that this action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. No further proceedings shall be had in this Court for this action. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/10/2019) (ama) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Arris International PLC, Andrew W. Barron, J. Timothy Bryan, James A. Chiddix, Andrew T. Heller, Jeong Kim, Bruce McClelland, Barton Y. Shigemura, Robert J. Stanzione, Doreen A. Toben, Debora J. Wilson, David A. Woodle. (Cassirer, Aurora) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Aurora Cassirer dated January 9, 2019. Application Granted. Responses due by 1/17/2019. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/09/2019) (ama) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Aurora Cassirer dated January 9, 2019. Document filed by Arris International PLC, Andrew W. Barron, J. Timothy Bryan, James A. Chiddix, Andrew T. Heller, Jeong Kim, Bruce McClelland, Barton Y. Shigemura, Robert J. Stanzione, Doreen A. Toben, Debora J. Wilson, David A. Woodle.(Cassirer, Aurora) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Aurora Cassirer dated January 8, 2019 re: #7 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference for Discovery addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Juan E. Monteverde dated January 3, 2019. - Opposition to Request for Expedited Discovery. Document filed by Arris International PLC, Andrew W. Barron, J. Timothy Bryan, James A. Chiddix, Andrew T. Heller, Jeong Kim, Bruce McClelland, Barton Y. Shigemura, Robert J. Stanzione, Doreen A. Toben, Debora J. Wilson, David A. Woodle. (Cassirer, Aurora) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) LETTER MOTION for Conference and/or Granting Defendants' Request to Transfer addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Aurora Cassirer dated January 8, 2019. Document filed by Arris International PLC, Andrew W. Barron, J. Timothy Bryan, James A. Chiddix, Andrew T. Heller, Jeong Kim, Bruce McClelland, Barton Y. Shigemura, Robert J. Stanzione, Doreen A. Toben, Debora J. Wilson, David A. Woodle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cassirer, Aurora) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for J. Timothy Mast to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/7/2019) (ne) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Mary Weeks to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/7/2019) (ne) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Louise Agnes-Sampson. Related Document Number: #3 . (Monteverde, Juan) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Juan E. Monteverde in Support re: #3 FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Louise Agnes-Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Louise Agnes-Sampson. (Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Louise Agnes-Sampson.(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Juan Eneas Monteverde. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Louise Agnes-Sampson; Arris International PLC; Robert J. Stanzione; Bruce McClelland; Andrew W. Barron; J. Timothy Bryan; James A. Chiddix; Andrew T. Heller; Jeong Kim; Barton Y. Shigemura; Doreen A. Toben; Debora J. Wilson; David A. Woodle. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text contained a typographical error; party text was removed. (jgo) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Arris International PLC, Andrew W. Barron, J. Timothy Bryan, James A. Chiddix, Andrew T. Heller, Jeong Kim, Bruce McClelland, Barton Y. Shigemura, Robert J. Stanzione, Doreen A. Toben, Debora J. Wilson, David A. Woodle. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16106006)Document filed by Louise Agnes-Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less