This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/28/2018 at 07:00:19 (UTC).

Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC v. BlackBerry Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against BlackBerry Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-03194

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC

Defendants

BlackBerry Corporation

BlackBerry Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Martinez

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3208

Ronald J. Schutz

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2800 Lasalle Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Benjamen C. Linden

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Ave., Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Cyrus A. Morton

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, 2800 Lasalle Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Jon Stuart Dean

Attorney at McDermott Will and Emery LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3218

Russell Hayman

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3208

Tala Toufanian Jayadevan

Attorney at McDermott, Will and Emery, LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3218

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) Statement Regarding Mediation by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 7/27/2018) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#32

(#32) ORDER STAYING CASE AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: MEDIATION re #31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Stay of Deadlines Pending Mediation filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, #30 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR: for Private Mediation to be completed by 10/12/2018. Case stayed: other than those deadlines/dates stated in this Order. Compliance hearing re name of mediator and date of mediation is set for Friday, 10/19/2018 09:01 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/13/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

31 #2

Proposed Order

31 #1

Declaration of Cyrus A. Morton in Support of Stipulation Requesting Stay of Dea

#31

(#31) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Stay of Deadlines Pending Mediation filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, BlackBerry Limited, BlackBerry Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cyrus A. Morton in Support of Stipulation Requesting Stay of Deadlines Pending Mediation, #2 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David) (Filed on 7/13/2018) Modified on 7/16/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#30

(#30) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, BlackBerry Limited, BlackBerry Corporation filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 7/13/2018) Modified on 7/15/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#29

(#29) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Service waived by BlackBerry Limited waiver sent on 6/22/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

#28

(#28) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Service waived by BlackBerry Corporation waiver sent on 6/22/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Hayman (Hayman, Russell) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Benjamen C. Linden ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12391241.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) Modified on 5/30/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Cyrus A. Morton ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12391239.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) Modified on 5/30/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Ronald J. Schutz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12391229.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) Modified on 5/30/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2018)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC ; and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

#Electronic filing error. Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet of JS44 (Rev. 8/16) used at case opening. Please complete Civil Cover Sheet JS CAND 44 ((Rev. 6/17) and re-file Amended Civil Cover Sheet as separate docket entry. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018) (Entered: 05/30/2018)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Statement Regarding Mediation by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 7/27/2018) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:18-cv-03194-YGR Re: #31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Stay of Deadlines Pending Mediation filed by BlackBerry Corporation, Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, BlackBerry Limited (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER STAYING CASE AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: MEDIATION re #31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Stay of Deadlines Pending Mediation filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, #30 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR: for Private Mediation to be completed by 10/12/2018. Case stayed: other than those deadlines/dates stated in this Order. Compliance hearing re name of mediator and date of mediation is set for Friday, 10/19/2018 09:01 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/13/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Stay of Deadlines Pending Mediation filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, BlackBerry Limited, BlackBerry Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cyrus A. Morton in Support of Stipulation Requesting Stay of Deadlines Pending Mediation, #2 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David) (Filed on 7/13/2018) Modified on 7/16/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, BlackBerry Limited, BlackBerry Corporation filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 7/13/2018) Modified on 7/15/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Service waived by BlackBerry Limited waiver sent on 6/22/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Service waived by BlackBerry Corporation waiver sent on 6/22/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Hayman (Hayman, Russell) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Stuart Dean (Dean, Jon) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Tala Toufanian Jayadevan (Jayadevan, Tala) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE DISREGARD. Signed by the Executive Committee on 5/30/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018) Modified on 5/30/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet of JS44 (Rev. 8/16) used at case opening. Please complete Civil Cover Sheet JS CAND 44 ((Rev. 6/17) and re-file Amended Civil Cover Sheet as separate docket entry. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018) (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • (#8) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/12/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Benjamen C. Linden ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12391241.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) Modified on 5/30/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Cyrus A. Morton ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12391239.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) Modified on 5/30/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Ronald J. Schutz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12391229.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) Modified on 5/30/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC ; and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12391009.). Filed byAffinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martinez, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKBERRY LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamen C. Linden

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cyrus Alcorn Morton