This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2018 at 16:00:11 (UTC).

AETNA INC. et al v. THE PEOPLE' CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 AETNA INC filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against THE PEOPLE' CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is BERLE M. SCHILLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-04354

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BERLE M. SCHILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

AETNA INC.

Defendants

DAVID WANGER

PCH LABS, INC.

MISSION TOXICOLOGY II, LLC

THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC

PCH MANAGEMENT NEWMAN, LLC

SETH GUTERMAN

MISSION TOXICOLOGY, LLC

JESSE SAUCEDO, JR.

MICHAEL L. MURPHY

PCH LAB SERVICES, LLC

SUN ANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC

INTEGRITYANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC

MISSION TOXICOLOGY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC

SUN CLINIC LABORATORY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREGORY S. VOSHELL

Attorney at ELLIOTT GREENLEAF, P.C.

925 Harvest Dr, Suite 300

Blue Bell, PA 19422

BRIAN GRADY

Attorney at ELLIOTT GREENLEAF, P.C.

925 Harvest Drive, Suite 300

Blue Bell, PA 19422

FREDERICK P. SANTARELLI

Attorney at ELLIOTT GREENLEAF, P.C.

Union Meeting Corporate Center V, Suite 300, 925 Harvest Drive, P.O. Box 3010

Blue Bell, PA 19422

JOHN M. ELLIOTT

Attorney at ELLIOTT GREENLEAF, P.C.

925 Harvest Dr., Ste 300, P.O. Box 3010

Blue Bell, PA 19422

KATE SEMMLER CORNELIUS

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP

600 Travis St, Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002

RONALD G. FRANKLIN

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP

600 Travis St, Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002

BRETT W. BARNETT

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP

7700 West Wacker Dr Suite 4100

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS B. FIDDLER

Attorney at WHITE & WILLIAMS, LLP

1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, Suite 1800

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7395

VINCENT N. BARBERA

Attorney at WHITE & WILLIAMS LLP

1650 Market St, One Liberty Pl Ste 1800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ANDREW F. SUSKO

Attorney at WHITE & WILLIAMS LLP

1800 One Liberty Pl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

NICHOLAS M. CENTRELLA

Attorney at CONRAD O'BRIEN

1500 Market St., Centre Square, West Tower 39Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

YUSSUF ABDEL-ALEEM

Attorney at JOSEPH ALEEM & SLOWIK LLC

1355 Peachtree St Ne Suite 700

Atlanta, GA 30309

B. KURT COPPER

Attorney at JONES DAY

325 John H. Mcconnell Blvd., Suite 600

Columbus, OH 43215

STEPHEN G. SOZIO

Attorney at JONES DAY

North Point, 901 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#91

(#91) ORDER THAT THE MOTION #56 IS GRANTED IN PART. THE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED AND TEH MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AS MOOT. THIS LITIGATION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS. THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC, PCH MANAGEMENT NEWMAN, LLC, AND PCH LAB SERVICES, LCC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #61 IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANTS DR. SETH GUTERMAN AND DAVID WANGER'S MOTION TO DISMISS #63 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 3/13/18. 3/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

#90

(#90) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 3/13/18. 3/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

63 #1

Exhibit A-D

#63

(#91) ORDER THAT THE MOTION #56 IS GRANTED IN PART. THE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED AND TEH MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AS MOOT. THIS LITIGATION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS. THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC, PCH MANAGEMENT NEWMAN, LLC, AND PCH LAB SERVICES, LCC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #61 IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANTS DR. SETH GUTERMAN AND DAVID WANGER'S MOTION TO DISMISS #63 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 3/13/18. 3/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

62 #1

Exhibit A-B

#62

(#89) ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PCH DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION #62 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 3/13/18. 3/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

61 #1

Exhibit A-J

#61

(#91) ORDER THAT THE MOTION #56 IS GRANTED IN PART. THE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED AND TEH MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AS MOOT. THIS LITIGATION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS. THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC, PCH MANAGEMENT NEWMAN, LLC, AND PCH LAB SERVICES, LCC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #61 IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANTS DR. SETH GUTERMAN AND DAVID WANGER'S MOTION TO DISMISS #63 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 3/13/18. 3/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

#56

(#91) ORDER THAT THE MOTION #56 IS GRANTED IN PART. THE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED AND TEH MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AS MOOT. THIS LITIGATION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS. THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC, PCH MANAGEMENT NEWMAN, LLC, AND PCH LAB SERVICES, LCC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #61 IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANTS DR. SETH GUTERMAN AND DAVID WANGER'S MOTION TO DISMISS #63 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 3/13/18. 3/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT N. BARBERA on behalf of PCH LAB SERVICES, LLC, THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC (BARBERA, VINCENT) (Entered: 10/31/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To PCH Labs, Inc. (Only)(VOSHELL, GREGORY) (Entered: 10/19/2017)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN GRADY on behalf of AETNA INC., AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(GRADY, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/05/2017)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by FREDERICK P. SANTARELLI on behalf of AETNA INC., AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(SANTARELLI, FREDERICK) (Entered: 10/05/2017)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY S. VOSHELL on behalf of AETNA INC., AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(VOSHELL, GREGORY) (Entered: 10/05/2017)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AETNA INC..(tj, ) Modified on 10/3/2017 (lisad, ). (Entered: 10/02/2017)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent AETNA INC. for AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(tj, ) (Entered: 10/02/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheets

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SETH GUTERMAN, INTEGRITYANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY II, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY, LLC, MICHAEL L. MURPHY, PCH LAB SERVICES, LLC, PCH LABS, INC., PCH MANAGEMENT NEWMAN, LLC, JESSE SAUCEDO, JR, SUN CLINIC LABORATORY, LLC, THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC, DAVID WANGER, SUN ANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 166476.), filed by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AETN INC..(tj, ) Modified on 10/2/2017 (tj, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2017: #1 Civil Cover Sheets) (tj, ). Modified on 10/3/2017 (lisad, ). Modified on 10/3/2017 (tj, ). (Entered: 10/02/2017)

138 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • Original record transferred to the Western District Texas of via interdistrict transfer system. (lisad, ) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) ORDER THAT THE MOTION #56 IS GRANTED IN PART. THE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED AND TEH MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AS MOOT. THIS LITIGATION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS. THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC, PCH MANAGEMENT NEWMAN, LLC, AND PCH LAB SERVICES, LCC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #61 IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANTS DR. SETH GUTERMAN AND DAVID WANGER'S MOTION TO DISMISS #63 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 3/13/18. 3/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 3/13/18. 3/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PCH DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION #62 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 3/13/18. 3/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 3/13/18. 3/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR WEDNESDAY 3/28/2018 AT 11:00 AM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 13613) BEFORE THE HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER. IT IS EXPECTED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE CONDUCTED SUBSTANTIAL DISCOVERY BY THE TIME OF THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE. (jp, ) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Briefs in Support of Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by SETH GUTERMAN, PCH LAB SERVICES, LLC, PCH MANAGEMENT NEWMAN, LLC, THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC, DAVID WANGER.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(BARBERA, VINCENT) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) INTEGRITYANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY II, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY, LLC, MICHAEL L. MURPHY, JESSE SAUCEDO, JR, SUN ANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC, SUN CLINIC LABORATORY, LLC. REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER. (jl, ) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 2/6/18.2/6/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by INTEGRITYANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY II, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY, LLC, MICHAEL L. MURPHY, JESSE SAUCEDO, JR, SUN ANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC, SUN CLINIC LABORATORY, LLC.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CENTRELLA, NICHOLAS) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT N. BARBERA on behalf of PCH LAB SERVICES, LLC, THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC (BARBERA, VINCENT) (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To PCH Labs, Inc. (Only)(VOSHELL, GREGORY) (Entered: 10/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN GRADY on behalf of AETNA INC., AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(GRADY, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by FREDERICK P. SANTARELLI on behalf of AETNA INC., AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(SANTARELLI, FREDERICK) (Entered: 10/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY S. VOSHELL on behalf of AETNA INC., AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(VOSHELL, GREGORY) (Entered: 10/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AETNA INC..(tj, ) Modified on 10/3/2017 (lisad, ). (Entered: 10/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent AETNA INC. for AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(tj, ) (Entered: 10/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AETNA INC., AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (tj, ) Modified on 10/3/2017 (lisad, ). (Entered: 10/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Summons Issued as to SETH GUTERMAN, INTEGRITYANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY II, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY, LLC, MICHAEL L. MURPHY, PCH LAB SERVICES, LLC, PCH LABS, INC., PCH MANAGEMENT NEWMAN, LLC, JESSE SAUCEDO, JR, SUN CLINIC LABORATORY, LLC, THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC, DAVID WANGER, SUN ANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/2/17 (tj, ) Modified on 10/2/2017 (tj, ). Modified on 10/3/2017 (tj, ). (Entered: 10/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against SETH GUTERMAN, INTEGRITYANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY II, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, MISSION TOXICOLOGY, LLC, MICHAEL L. MURPHY, PCH LAB SERVICES, LLC, PCH LABS, INC., PCH MANAGEMENT NEWMAN, LLC, JESSE SAUCEDO, JR, SUN CLINIC LABORATORY, LLC, THE PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOSPITAL, LLC, DAVID WANGER, SUN ANCILLARY MANAGEMENT, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 166476.), filed by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AETN INC..(tj, ) Modified on 10/2/2017 (tj, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2017: #1 Civil Cover Sheets) (tj, ). Modified on 10/3/2017 (lisad, ). Modified on 10/3/2017 (tj, ). (Entered: 10/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less