This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/02/2018 at 07:35:30 (UTC).

Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc v. Ipe Woods USA LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 Advantage Trim Lumber of Florida Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Ipe Woods USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott W Skavdahl and Kelly H Rankin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00163

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott W Skavdahl

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Steven Rossi

Ipe Woods USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Matthew D Kaufman

Attorney at HATHAWAY & KUNZ PC

2515 Warren Avenue Suite 500, Po Box 1208

Cheyenne, WY 82003-1208

Jennifer L Friedman

Attorney at SCHRODER JOSEPH & ASSOCIATES LLP

392 Pearl Street, Suite 301

Buffalo, NY 14202

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Robert C Griffin

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK PLLP

Po Box 2529, 490 North 31St Street, Suite 500

Billings, MT 59103-2529

Dallas J Lain

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK PLLP

237 Storey Boulevard, Suite 110

Cheyenne, WY 82009

 

Court Documents

#32

31 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion

#31

30 #2

Exhibit

30 #1

Exhibit

#30

#29

28 #1

Proposed Order

#12

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Defendants' Counterclaims is extended up to and including December 3, 2018. (Court Staff, sjh) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi, Counter Claimants Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Lain, Dallas) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is extended up to and including November 20, 2018. (Court Staff, sjh) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Second MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response deadline filed by Defendants Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lain, Dallas) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Ipe Woods USA LLC,. (Lain, Dallas) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand,, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc by Steven Rossi, Ipe Woods USA LLC. (Lain, Dallas) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Ipe Woods USA, LLC and Steven Rossi's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is extended up to and including November 16, 2018. (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) First MOTION for Extension of Time (Dispositive) requesting extension of Time for Defendant to Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Ipe Woods USA LLC, Steven Rossi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lain, Dallas) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Hearing on #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 01:00 PM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. Steven Rossi served on 10/9/2018, answer due on 10/30/2018 (Kaufman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Jennifer L Friedman. Receipt CHY029640. (Court Staff, sjk) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Jennifer L. Friedman for Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jennifer L. Friedman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Praecipe for Summonses filed by Plaintiff Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc, 2 issued. (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D Kaufman on behalf of Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (2 summonses issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029639.), filed by Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANTAGE TRIM & LUMBER OF FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer L Friedman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew D Kaufman