This case was last updated from PACER on 02/19/2018 at 07:02:26 (UTC).

adidas AG et al v. adidas.style et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 adidas AG filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against adidas style. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:17-CV-62535

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

adidas America, Inc.

Defendants

honestbz.org

adidasvs.com

yeezyboost-online.com

adidas-usstore.com

cheapnfljerseysonsale.us

yeezysboost350.uk

chaussuresadidaspascher.com

reebokamsterdam.com

nikeshoeshotstore.com

adidasnmdcitysock.com

ishockeytrojorsverige.xyz

buycheapyeezys.com

chinawholesalejerseybiz.com

reebokshoes.eu

reebokshoes.us

childrenschoice.ca

traineruksale.com

adidasnmdxr1.us

adidasultraboost.ca

260 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez

Attorney at Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 130-453

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Stephen Michael Gaffigan

Attorney at Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Blvd., #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Virgilio Gigante

Attorney at Stephen M Gaffigan PA

401 E Las Olas Boulevard, #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Summons Issued as to 11trikot.com, 2017sbkoston3hyperfeel.com, 2018adidas.com, WilsonTimber.co.uk, abhinandanjaipur.com, adidas-nmdr1.us, adidas-nmds.com, adidas-sg.com, adidas-store.net, adidas-usstore.com, adidas.style, adidas0.com, adidascheapsoutlet.com, adidashoesde.com, adidashoesonlines.cc, adidasnewshoes.com, adidasnmd-shoes.us, adidasnmdchukka.com, adidasnmdcitysock.com, adidasnmdoutlet.com, adidasnmdsaleo.top, adidasnmdsales.us, adidasnmdsingapore.com, adidasnmdsneaker.co.uk, adidasnmdxr1.us, adidasoriginalparis.com, adidasoso.com, adidasoutletshop.co.uk, adidasoutletstores.us, adidasoutletuk.com, adidasports.com, adidasrunners.co.uk, adidasshoes-outlet.com, adidasshoesonlineaustralia.com, adidasshoessaleoutlet.com, adidasshoesshopoutlet.com, adidasstansmithboostprimeknit.com, adidastsale2017.co.uk, adidasua.com, adidasultraboost.ca, adidasvs.com, adidasyeezy.info, adidasyeezy350boostv2.us, adidasyeezyboost350v2.us, adidasyeezyssale.com, adidasyeezysshops.com, adsneakerszone.com, adyeezysaleso.us, aegeantreat.com, ajhbespoke.co.uk, amanimales.com, angelicholisticpractice.co.uk, artemisyeezy.com, arthackathon.co.uk, auadidasnmd.com, ayeezystore.com, bapexadidasnmdr1.com, bestadidasyeezy.com, bestkicks.club, bestshoes.co, blackyeezys.com, blackyeezys.net, blogbelezapura.com, boostyeezy.net, borregopublishing.com, bthag.co.uk, bubblefootballverona.com, buy-adidas.com, buycheapyeezys.com, chaussuresadidaspascher.com, chaussuresyeezyboost.fr, cheapauthenticjerseyssoccer.com, cheapbaseballjerseysmlb.com, cheapjerseysnflbusiness.com, cheapjerseysnflchinaonline.com, cheapjerseysnflsupply.com, cheapjerseyswholesaleace.com, cheaplebron14.net, cheapmlbjerseysbaseball.com, cheapnbajerseysbasketball.com, cheapnflchinajerseys.us, cheapnfljerseysonsale.us, cheapsoccerauthenticjerseys.com, cheapsoccermlsjerseys.net, cheapyeezyboost.com, chi-blackhawks-shop.com, childrenschoice.ca, chinajerseyscheapnfl.cc, chinajerseysusaonline.com, chinanfljerseyswholesale.biz, chinawholesalejerseybiz.com, chinawholesalejerseyfootball.com, chinese-jerseys.com, cpselectricservices.com, darylsacheating.com, daveluy-creations.com, davisprocleaning.com, detroitredwingshockeypro.com, discountshoes.co, discountyeezyboost.com, dreamdelmundo.com, dustykahl.com, edinburghjo.co.uk, everythingwentdown.com, extraautomotivecolumbus.com, facetokicks.com, fakeyeezys.me, fakeyeezysboost350.com, fanskicks.com, filerjedi.com, fireshoestore.com, fireyzy.com, fiveandthursday.com, flexenglk.com, flightclubshoes.com, flightkicks.us, flightkickz.net, flightsizes.com, flykickss.com, foisontrading.com, footykicksusa.com, frchausport.com, friendshipinside.com, genuinesite.top, global-adidas.com, godbiess.com, godlinessonline.com, gogoyeezy.me, goodskick.club, greatkickz.com, griffithmedicalservices.com, gscstore.com, hilcotecountryclub.co.uk, himalayabattery.com, honestbz.org, hotnbajerseys.cc, hubrare.com, inletcharter.com, ishockeytrojorsverige.xyz, jerseycheapchinaonline.com, jessandpaulontheroad.com, jordansneakers.club, kickscraze.com, kicksonly.com, kicksyeezybay.com, kickwho.me, kickzclub.net, kickzlocker.com, lebron14forsale.com, myfootballfactory.com, newcheapnfljersey.com, nfljerseyscheap.org, nfljerseyscheapfromchina.us, nhljerseyswholesalechinaonline.com, nicekicks.us, nicekickss.us, niceshoesdhui.com, nikekyrie3bhm.com, nikeshoeshotstore.com, nk-sport.co.uk, nmdadidasus.com, nmdaustralia.com, nmdrunnerstore.com, originalsnmd.co.uk, ottosspecialtyfoods.com, p2all.com, perfectkicks.site, perfectsneakers.com, perfectyeezy.com, perfectyeezys.com, pharrellwilliamshappy.com, popyeezys.net, reebok-sale.com, reebokamsterdam.com, reebokau.com, reebokcheap.co.uk, reebokclassicstore.com, reebokcrossfitaustralia.com, reebokgreece.net, reebokhnljerseys.com, reebokmadrid.com, reebokonline.us, reebokoutlet.store, reebokrunningshoesuk.info, reebokshaqattaq.us, reebokshoes.eu, reebokshoes.us, reebokstoreoutlet.com, saleyeezyshop.com, scarpe-yeezy.com, sellyeezys.net, shoeout.co, shoes-store.us, shoesadidassale.com, snapshopgo.com, sneakercollege.com, sneakersadis.com, sneakerschuheshopde.com, sneakerselections.com, sneakerskicksuk.com, sneakersports.com, sneakersreebok.com, soccerboots1.com, somersetpub.co.uk, sportsbootsdirect.co.uk, staffoflifeshawano.com, stockyeezy350.com, teambiel.com, thefavorsboutique.com, thefurniturebarnbray.com, theswampbar.com, topadidas.com, topshoeus.com, trade2015.net, traineruksale.com, trois-accords.com, ultraboost2017.com, uscustodialproductsco.com, usreebokclearance.com, vibeburnaby.com, wholesale-soccerjersey.co, wholesalechinanfljerseys.org, wholesaleelitejerseysonline.com, wholesalejerseyfromchinabiz.com, wholesalejerseyscheaper.com, wholesalejerseyschinacenter.com, wholesalelimitedjerseys.com, wholesalenfljerseysforcheapest.com, xtrikots.com, yeezy-shoes.us, yeezy-shoesinc.com, yeezy350black.com, yeezy350boostau.co, yeezy350boostfr.co, yeezy350boostv3.us, yeezy350pro.com, yeezy350s.com, yeezy350v2s.com, yeezyboost-online.com, yeezyboost-shop.com, yeezyboost-up.com, yeezyboost350-v2.com, yeezyboost350-v2s.com, yeezyboost350v2sale.com, yeezyboost750uk.co, yeezyboostseasonsale.com, yeezyboostshoes.co.uk, yeezybuy.net, yeezybykanye.com, yeezycollector.com, yeezydaily.com, yeezykat.com, yeezykickss.com, yeezymark.com, yeezyoutletuk.com, yeezyperfect.com, yeezys350forsale.com, yeezys350v3.com, yeezysale.co, yeezysboost350.uk, yeezysboost350ol.us, yeezysforsale.store, yeezysshoes.us, yeezysupplyau.com, yeezysupplyss.com, yeezywat.com, yesyeezy.me, yesyeezy.online, yesyeezy.org, yesyeezy.shop, zdkshop.com. (pes) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

26 #1

Summon(s)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. re #25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

#25

(#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Order Authorizing Alternative Service. See attached Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/7/2018. (sl00) (Entered: 02/07/2018)

24 #3

Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante

24 #2

Affidavit - Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Motion for Order Autho

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#24

(#24) MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit - Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante)(Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order re #11 Order on Ex Parte Motion,, by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

#6

(#19) PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2018 re #6 EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Reebok International Limited, adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V., Reebok International Ltd. Virgilio Gigante, Esq and Stephen Gaffigan, Esq, appeared for the plaintiffs. No appearance by any defendant. Hearing held. Court to issue Report and Recommendation. Attorney Appearance(s): Stephen Michael Gaffigan, Virgilio Gigante, (Digital 14:04:15) (tw) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. identifying Corporate Parent adidas North America, Inc. for Reebok International Ltd., adidas America, Inc. (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

#4

(#4) Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #1 Complaint, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): amanimales.com, angelicholisticpractice.co.uk, artemisyeezy.com, arthackathon.co.uk, auadidasnmd.com, ayeezystore.com, bapexadidasnmdr1.com, bestadidasyeezy.com, bestkicks.club, bestshoes.co, blackyeezys.com, blackyeezys.net, blogbelezapura.com, boostyeezy.net, borregopublishing.com, bthag.co.uk, bubblefootballverona.com, buy-adidas.com, buycheapyeezys.com, chaussuresadidaspascher.com, chaussuresyeezyboost.fr, cheapauthenticjerseyssoccer.com, cheapbaseballjerseysmlb.com, cheapchinanfljerseys.us, cheapjerseysnflbusiness.com, cheapjerseysnflchinaonline.com, cheapjerseysnflsupply.com, cheapjerseyssupply.us, cheapjerseyswholesaleace.com, cheaplebron14.net, cheapmlbjerseysbaseball.com, cheapnbajerseysbasketball.com, cheapnflchinajerseys.us, cheapnfljerseysonsale.us, cheapsoccerauthenticjerseys.com, cheapsoccermlsjerseys.net, cheapyeezyboost.com, chi-blackhawks-shop.com, childrenschoice.ca, chinafootballjerseyscheap.us, chinajerseyscheapnfl.cc, chinajerseysusaonline.com, chinanfljerseyswholesale.biz, chinawholesalejerseybiz.com, chinawholesalejerseyfootball.com, chinese-jerseys.com, cpselectricservices.com, darylsacheating.com, daveluy-creations.com, davisprocleaning.com, detroitredwingshockeypro.com, discountshoes.co, discountyeezyboost.com, dreamdelmundo.com, dustykahl.com, edinburghjo.co.uk, everythingwentdown.com, extraautomotivecolumbus.com, facetokicks.com, fakeyeezys.me, fakeyeezysboost350.com, fanskicks.com, filerjedi.com, fireshoestore.com, fireyzy.com, fiveandthursday.com, flexenglk.com, flightclubshoes.com, flightkicks.us, flightkickz.net, flightsizes.com, flykickss.com, foisontrading.com, footykicksusa.com, frchausport.com, friendshipinside.com, genuinesite.top, global-adidas.com, godbiess.com, godlinessonline.com, gogoyeezy.me, goodskick.club, greatkickz.com, griffithmedicalservices.com, gscstore.com, hilcotecountryclub.co.uk, himalayabattery.com, honestbz.org, hotnbajerseys.cc, hubrare.com, inletcharter.com, ishockeytrojorsverige.xyz, jerseycheapchinaonline.com, jessandpaulontheroad.com, jordansneakers.club, kickscraze.com, kicksonly.com, kicksyeezybay.com, kickwho.me, kickzclub.net, kickzlocker.com, lebron14forsale.com, myfootballfactory.com, newcheapnfljersey.com, nfljerseyscheap.org, nfljerseyscheapfromchina.us, nhljerseyswholesalechinaonline.com, nicekicks.us, nicekickss.us, niceshoesdhui.com, nikekyrie3bhm.com, nikeshoeshotstore.com, nk-sport.co.uk, nmdadidasus.com, nmdaustralia.com, nmdrunnerstore.com, originalsnmd.co.uk, ottosspecialtyfoods.com, p2all.com, perfectkicks.site, perfectsneakers.com, perfectyeezy.com, perfectyeezys.com, pharrellwilliamshappy.com, popyeezys.net, reebokamsterdam.com, reebokau.com, reebokcheap.co.uk, reebokclassicstore.com, reebokcrossfitaustralia.com, reebokgreece.net, reebokhnljerseys.com, reebokmadrid.com, reebokonline.us, reebokoutlet.store, reebokrunningshoesuk.info, reebok-sale.com, reebokshaqattaq.us, reebokshoes.eu, reebokshoes.us, reebokstoreoutlet.com, saleyeezyshop.com, scarpe-yeezy.com, sellyeezys.net, shoeout.co, shoesadidassale.com, shoes-store.us, snapshopgo.com, sneakercollege.com, sneakersadis.com, sneakerschuheshopde.com, sneakerselections.com, sneakerskicksuk.com, sneakersports.com, sneakersreebok.com, soccerboots1.com, somersetpub.co.uk, sportsbootsdirect.co.uk, staffoflifeshawano.com, stockyeezy350.com, teambiel.com, thefavorsboutique.com, thefurniturebarnbray.com, theswampbar.com, topadidas.com, topshoeus.com, trade2015.net, traineruksale.com, trois-accords.com, ultraboost2017.com, uscustodialproductsco.com, usreebokclearance.com, vibeburnaby.com, wholesalechinanfljerseys.org, wholesaleelitejerseysonline.com, wholesalejerseyfromchinabiz.com, wholesalejerseyscheaper.com, wholesalejerseyschinacenter.com, wholesalelimitedjerseys.com, wholesalenfljerseysforcheapest.com, wholesale-soccerjersey.co, WilsonTimber.co.uk, xtrikots.com, yeezy350black.com, yeezy350boostau.co, yeezy350boostfr.co, yeezy350boostv3.us, yeezy350pro.com, yeezy350s.com, yeezy350v2s.com, yeezyboost350-v2.com, yeezyboost350-v2s.com, yeezyboost350v2sale.com, yeezyboost750uk.co, yeezyboost-online.com, yeezyboostseasonsale.com, yeezyboostshoes.co.uk, yeezyboost-shop.com, yeezyboost-up.com, yeezybuy.net, yeezybykanye.com, yeezycollector.com, yeezydaily.com, yeezykat.com, yeezykickss.com, yeezymark.com, yeezyoutletuk.com, yeezyperfect.com, yeezys350forsale.com, yeezys350v3.com, yeezysale.co, yeezysboost350.uk, yeezysboost350ol.us, yeezysforsale.store, yeezy-shoes.us, yeezy-shoesinc.com, yeezysshoes.us, yeezysupplyau.com, yeezysupplyss.com, yeezywat.com, yesyeezy.me, yesyeezy.online, yesyeezy.org, yesyeezy.shop and zdkshop.com. (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (rms1) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Reebok Marks

1 #2

Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the adidas Marks

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #1 Complaint, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): amanimales.com, angelicholisticpractice.co.uk, artemisyeezy.com, arthackathon.co.uk, auadidasnmd.com, ayeezystore.com, bapexadidasnmdr1.com, bestadidasyeezy.com, bestkicks.club, bestshoes.co, blackyeezys.com, blackyeezys.net, blogbelezapura.com, boostyeezy.net, borregopublishing.com, bthag.co.uk, bubblefootballverona.com, buy-adidas.com, buycheapyeezys.com, chaussuresadidaspascher.com, chaussuresyeezyboost.fr, cheapauthenticjerseyssoccer.com, cheapbaseballjerseysmlb.com, cheapchinanfljerseys.us, cheapjerseysnflbusiness.com, cheapjerseysnflchinaonline.com, cheapjerseysnflsupply.com, cheapjerseyssupply.us, cheapjerseyswholesaleace.com, cheaplebron14.net, cheapmlbjerseysbaseball.com, cheapnbajerseysbasketball.com, cheapnflchinajerseys.us, cheapnfljerseysonsale.us, cheapsoccerauthenticjerseys.com, cheapsoccermlsjerseys.net, cheapyeezyboost.com, chi-blackhawks-shop.com, childrenschoice.ca, chinafootballjerseyscheap.us, chinajerseyscheapnfl.cc, chinajerseysusaonline.com, chinanfljerseyswholesale.biz, chinawholesalejerseybiz.com, chinawholesalejerseyfootball.com, chinese-jerseys.com, cpselectricservices.com, darylsacheating.com, daveluy-creations.com, davisprocleaning.com, detroitredwingshockeypro.com, discountshoes.co, discountyeezyboost.com, dreamdelmundo.com, dustykahl.com, edinburghjo.co.uk, everythingwentdown.com, extraautomotivecolumbus.com, facetokicks.com, fakeyeezys.me, fakeyeezysboost350.com, fanskicks.com, filerjedi.com, fireshoestore.com, fireyzy.com, fiveandthursday.com, flexenglk.com, flightclubshoes.com, flightkicks.us, flightkickz.net, flightsizes.com, flykickss.com, foisontrading.com, footykicksusa.com, frchausport.com, friendshipinside.com, genuinesite.top, global-adidas.com, godbiess.com, godlinessonline.com, gogoyeezy.me, goodskick.club, greatkickz.com, griffithmedicalservices.com, gscstore.com, hilcotecountryclub.co.uk, himalayabattery.com, honestbz.org, hotnbajerseys.cc, hubrare.com, inletcharter.com, ishockeytrojorsverige.xyz, jerseycheapchinaonline.com, jessandpaulontheroad.com, jordansneakers.club, kickscraze.com, kicksonly.com, kicksyeezybay.com, kickwho.me, kickzclub.net, kickzlocker.com, lebron14forsale.com, myfootballfactory.com, newcheapnfljersey.com, nfljerseyscheap.org, nfljerseyscheapfromchina.us, nhljerseyswholesalechinaonline.com, nicekicks.us, nicekickss.us, niceshoesdhui.com, nikekyrie3bhm.com, nikeshoeshotstore.com, nk-sport.co.uk, nmdadidasus.com, nmdaustralia.com, nmdrunnerstore.com, originalsnmd.co.uk, ottosspecialtyfoods.com, p2all.com, perfectkicks.site, perfectsneakers.com, perfectyeezy.com, perfectyeezys.com, pharrellwilliamshappy.com, popyeezys.net, reebokamsterdam.com, reebokau.com, reebokcheap.co.uk, reebokclassicstore.com, reebokcrossfitaustralia.com, reebokgreece.net, reebokhnljerseys.com, reebokmadrid.com, reebokonline.us, reebokoutlet.store, reebokrunningshoesuk.info, reebok-sale.com, reebokshaqattaq.us, reebokshoes.eu, reebokshoes.us, reebokstoreoutlet.com, saleyeezyshop.com, scarpe-yeezy.com, sellyeezys.net, shoeout.co, shoesadidassale.com, shoes-store.us, snapshopgo.com, sneakercollege.com, sneakersadis.com, sneakerschuheshopde.com, sneakerselections.com, sneakerskicksuk.com, sneakersports.com, sneakersreebok.com, soccerboots1.com, somersetpub.co.uk, sportsbootsdirect.co.uk, staffoflifeshawano.com, stockyeezy350.com, teambiel.com, thefavorsboutique.com, thefurniturebarnbray.com, theswampbar.com, topadidas.com, topshoeus.com, trade2015.net, traineruksale.com, trois-accords.com, ultraboost2017.com, uscustodialproductsco.com, usreebokclearance.com, vibeburnaby.com, wholesalechinanfljerseys.org, wholesaleelitejerseysonline.com, wholesalejerseyfromchinabiz.com, wholesalejerseyscheaper.com, wholesalejerseyschinacenter.com, wholesalelimitedjerseys.com, wholesalenfljerseysforcheapest.com, wholesale-soccerjersey.co, WilsonTimber.co.uk, xtrikots.com, yeezy350black.com, yeezy350boostau.co, yeezy350boostfr.co, yeezy350boostv3.us, yeezy350pro.com, yeezy350s.com, yeezy350v2s.com, yeezyboost350-v2.com, yeezyboost350-v2s.com, yeezyboost350v2sale.com, yeezyboost750uk.co, yeezyboost-online.com, yeezyboostseasonsale.com, yeezyboostshoes.co.uk, yeezyboost-shop.com, yeezyboost-up.com, yeezybuy.net, yeezybykanye.com, yeezycollector.com, yeezydaily.com, yeezykat.com, yeezykickss.com, yeezymark.com, yeezyoutletuk.com, yeezyperfect.com, yeezys350forsale.com, yeezys350v3.com, yeezysale.co, yeezysboost350.uk, yeezysboost350ol.us, yeezysforsale.store, yeezy-shoes.us, yeezy-shoesinc.com, yeezysshoes.us, yeezysupplyau.com, yeezysupplyss.com, yeezywat.com, yesyeezy.me, yesyeezy.online, yesyeezy.org, yesyeezy.shop and zdkshop.com. (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Summons Issued as to 11trikot.com, 2017sbkoston3hyperfeel.com, 2018adidas.com, WilsonTimber.co.uk, abhinandanjaipur.com, adidas-nmdr1.us, adidas-nmds.com, adidas-sg.com, adidas-store.net, adidas-usstore.com, adidas.style, adidas0.com, adidascheapsoutlet.com, adidashoesde.com, adidashoesonlines.cc, adidasnewshoes.com, adidasnmd-shoes.us, adidasnmdchukka.com, adidasnmdcitysock.com, adidasnmdoutlet.com, adidasnmdsaleo.top, adidasnmdsales.us, adidasnmdsingapore.com, adidasnmdsneaker.co.uk, adidasnmdxr1.us, adidasoriginalparis.com, adidasoso.com, adidasoutletshop.co.uk, adidasoutletstores.us, adidasoutletuk.com, adidasports.com, adidasrunners.co.uk, adidasshoes-outlet.com, adidasshoesonlineaustralia.com, adidasshoessaleoutlet.com, adidasshoesshopoutlet.com, adidasstansmithboostprimeknit.com, adidastsale2017.co.uk, adidasua.com, adidasultraboost.ca, adidasvs.com, adidasyeezy.info, adidasyeezy350boostv2.us, adidasyeezyboost350v2.us, adidasyeezyssale.com, adidasyeezysshops.com, adsneakerszone.com, adyeezysaleso.us, aegeantreat.com, ajhbespoke.co.uk, amanimales.com, angelicholisticpractice.co.uk, artemisyeezy.com, arthackathon.co.uk, auadidasnmd.com, ayeezystore.com, bapexadidasnmdr1.com, bestadidasyeezy.com, bestkicks.club, bestshoes.co, blackyeezys.com, blackyeezys.net, blogbelezapura.com, boostyeezy.net, borregopublishing.com, bthag.co.uk, bubblefootballverona.com, buy-adidas.com, buycheapyeezys.com, chaussuresadidaspascher.com, chaussuresyeezyboost.fr, cheapauthenticjerseyssoccer.com, cheapbaseballjerseysmlb.com, cheapjerseysnflbusiness.com, cheapjerseysnflchinaonline.com, cheapjerseysnflsupply.com, cheapjerseyswholesaleace.com, cheaplebron14.net, cheapmlbjerseysbaseball.com, cheapnbajerseysbasketball.com, cheapnflchinajerseys.us, cheapnfljerseysonsale.us, cheapsoccerauthenticjerseys.com, cheapsoccermlsjerseys.net, cheapyeezyboost.com, chi-blackhawks-shop.com, childrenschoice.ca, chinajerseyscheapnfl.cc, chinajerseysusaonline.com, chinanfljerseyswholesale.biz, chinawholesalejerseybiz.com, chinawholesalejerseyfootball.com, chinese-jerseys.com, cpselectricservices.com, darylsacheating.com, daveluy-creations.com, davisprocleaning.com, detroitredwingshockeypro.com, discountshoes.co, discountyeezyboost.com, dreamdelmundo.com, dustykahl.com, edinburghjo.co.uk, everythingwentdown.com, extraautomotivecolumbus.com, facetokicks.com, fakeyeezys.me, fakeyeezysboost350.com, fanskicks.com, filerjedi.com, fireshoestore.com, fireyzy.com, fiveandthursday.com, flexenglk.com, flightclubshoes.com, flightkicks.us, flightkickz.net, flightsizes.com, flykickss.com, foisontrading.com, footykicksusa.com, frchausport.com, friendshipinside.com, genuinesite.top, global-adidas.com, godbiess.com, godlinessonline.com, gogoyeezy.me, goodskick.club, greatkickz.com, griffithmedicalservices.com, gscstore.com, hilcotecountryclub.co.uk, himalayabattery.com, honestbz.org, hotnbajerseys.cc, hubrare.com, inletcharter.com, ishockeytrojorsverige.xyz, jerseycheapchinaonline.com, jessandpaulontheroad.com, jordansneakers.club, kickscraze.com, kicksonly.com, kicksyeezybay.com, kickwho.me, kickzclub.net, kickzlocker.com, lebron14forsale.com, myfootballfactory.com, newcheapnfljersey.com, nfljerseyscheap.org, nfljerseyscheapfromchina.us, nhljerseyswholesalechinaonline.com, nicekicks.us, nicekickss.us, niceshoesdhui.com, nikekyrie3bhm.com, nikeshoeshotstore.com, nk-sport.co.uk, nmdadidasus.com, nmdaustralia.com, nmdrunnerstore.com, originalsnmd.co.uk, ottosspecialtyfoods.com, p2all.com, perfectkicks.site, perfectsneakers.com, perfectyeezy.com, perfectyeezys.com, pharrellwilliamshappy.com, popyeezys.net, reebok-sale.com, reebokamsterdam.com, reebokau.com, reebokcheap.co.uk, reebokclassicstore.com, reebokcrossfitaustralia.com, reebokgreece.net, reebokhnljerseys.com, reebokmadrid.com, reebokonline.us, reebokoutlet.store, reebokrunningshoesuk.info, reebokshaqattaq.us, reebokshoes.eu, reebokshoes.us, reebokstoreoutlet.com, saleyeezyshop.com, scarpe-yeezy.com, sellyeezys.net, shoeout.co, shoes-store.us, shoesadidassale.com, snapshopgo.com, sneakercollege.com, sneakersadis.com, sneakerschuheshopde.com, sneakerselections.com, sneakerskicksuk.com, sneakersports.com, sneakersreebok.com, soccerboots1.com, somersetpub.co.uk, sportsbootsdirect.co.uk, staffoflifeshawano.com, stockyeezy350.com, teambiel.com, thefavorsboutique.com, thefurniturebarnbray.com, theswampbar.com, topadidas.com, topshoeus.com, trade2015.net, traineruksale.com, trois-accords.com, ultraboost2017.com, uscustodialproductsco.com, usreebokclearance.com, vibeburnaby.com, wholesale-soccerjersey.co, wholesalechinanfljerseys.org, wholesaleelitejerseysonline.com, wholesalejerseyfromchinabiz.com, wholesalejerseyscheaper.com, wholesalejerseyschinacenter.com, wholesalelimitedjerseys.com, wholesalenfljerseysforcheapest.com, xtrikots.com, yeezy-shoes.us, yeezy-shoesinc.com, yeezy350black.com, yeezy350boostau.co, yeezy350boostfr.co, yeezy350boostv3.us, yeezy350pro.com, yeezy350s.com, yeezy350v2s.com, yeezyboost-online.com, yeezyboost-shop.com, yeezyboost-up.com, yeezyboost350-v2.com, yeezyboost350-v2s.com, yeezyboost350v2sale.com, yeezyboost750uk.co, yeezyboostseasonsale.com, yeezyboostshoes.co.uk, yeezybuy.net, yeezybykanye.com, yeezycollector.com, yeezydaily.com, yeezykat.com, yeezykickss.com, yeezymark.com, yeezyoutletuk.com, yeezyperfect.com, yeezys350forsale.com, yeezys350v3.com, yeezysale.co, yeezysboost350.uk, yeezysboost350ol.us, yeezysforsale.store, yeezysshoes.us, yeezysupplyau.com, yeezysupplyss.com, yeezywat.com, yesyeezy.me, yesyeezy.online, yesyeezy.org, yesyeezy.shop, zdkshop.com. (pes) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. re #25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 02/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Order Authorizing Alternative Service. See attached Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/7/2018. (sl00) (Entered: 02/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit - Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante)(Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #21 Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/31/2018. (ecz) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting #6 Ex Parte Motion,,,, filed by Reebok International Limited, adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V., Reebok International Ltd. ; Adopting #20 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/24/2018. (tm) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order re #11 Order on Ex Parte Motion,, by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction recommending that the Motion for Preliminary Injunction be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 2/6/2018. See attached Report and Recommendation for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 1/23/2018. (sl00) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2018 re #6 EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Reebok International Limited, adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V., Reebok International Ltd. Virgilio Gigante, Esq and Stephen Gaffigan, Esq, appeared for the plaintiffs. No appearance by any defendant. Hearing held. Court to issue Report and Recommendation. Attorney Appearance(s): Stephen Michael Gaffigan, Virgilio Gigante, (Digital 14:04:15) (tw) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Order Dismissing Party cheapjerseyssupply.us, chinafootballjerseyscheap.us, adidasprice.com and cheapchinanfljerseys.us re #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/23/2018. (tm) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PATRICK M. HUNT. See Order attached for details that modifies deadlines, page limitations and the discovery objections and conferral requirements before the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 1/4/2018. (sl00) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Sealed Order Referring #6 Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order filed by Reebok International Limited, adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V., Reebok International Ltd. to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/3/2018. (nc) Modified to unseal per DE #11 on 1/10/2018 (cbr). (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #7 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Document Restricted Due to Error; The original document contained a scrivener's error with regard to the Magistrate Judge's name. The corrected document has been attached to this notice. (tm) (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/3/2018. (tm) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/3/2018) (tm). (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Mia Nidia Gutierrez in Support of Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit 1 part 1 - to Declaration of Virgilio Gigante, #5 Exhibit 1 part 2 - to Declaration of Virgilio Gigante, #6 Exhibit 1 part 3 - to Declaration of Virgilio Gigante, #7 Exhibit 1 part 4 - to Declaration of Virgilio Gigante, #8 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Virgilio Gigante, #9 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Virgilio Gigante) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified to unseal per DE #11 on 1/10/2018 (cbr). (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. identifying Corporate Parent adidas North America, Inc. for Reebok International Ltd., adidas America, Inc. (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #1 Complaint, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): amanimales.com, angelicholisticpractice.co.uk, artemisyeezy.com, arthackathon.co.uk, auadidasnmd.com, ayeezystore.com, bapexadidasnmdr1.com, bestadidasyeezy.com, bestkicks.club, bestshoes.co, blackyeezys.com, blackyeezys.net, blogbelezapura.com, boostyeezy.net, borregopublishing.com, bthag.co.uk, bubblefootballverona.com, buy-adidas.com, buycheapyeezys.com, chaussuresadidaspascher.com, chaussuresyeezyboost.fr, cheapauthenticjerseyssoccer.com, cheapbaseballjerseysmlb.com, cheapchinanfljerseys.us, cheapjerseysnflbusiness.com, cheapjerseysnflchinaonline.com, cheapjerseysnflsupply.com, cheapjerseyssupply.us, cheapjerseyswholesaleace.com, cheaplebron14.net, cheapmlbjerseysbaseball.com, cheapnbajerseysbasketball.com, cheapnflchinajerseys.us, cheapnfljerseysonsale.us, cheapsoccerauthenticjerseys.com, cheapsoccermlsjerseys.net, cheapyeezyboost.com, chi-blackhawks-shop.com, childrenschoice.ca, chinafootballjerseyscheap.us, chinajerseyscheapnfl.cc, chinajerseysusaonline.com, chinanfljerseyswholesale.biz, chinawholesalejerseybiz.com, chinawholesalejerseyfootball.com, chinese-jerseys.com, cpselectricservices.com, darylsacheating.com, daveluy-creations.com, davisprocleaning.com, detroitredwingshockeypro.com, discountshoes.co, discountyeezyboost.com, dreamdelmundo.com, dustykahl.com, edinburghjo.co.uk, everythingwentdown.com, extraautomotivecolumbus.com, facetokicks.com, fakeyeezys.me, fakeyeezysboost350.com, fanskicks.com, filerjedi.com, fireshoestore.com, fireyzy.com, fiveandthursday.com, flexenglk.com, flightclubshoes.com, flightkicks.us, flightkickz.net, flightsizes.com, flykickss.com, foisontrading.com, footykicksusa.com, frchausport.com, friendshipinside.com, genuinesite.top, global-adidas.com, godbiess.com, godlinessonline.com, gogoyeezy.me, goodskick.club, greatkickz.com, griffithmedicalservices.com, gscstore.com, hilcotecountryclub.co.uk, himalayabattery.com, honestbz.org, hotnbajerseys.cc, hubrare.com, inletcharter.com, ishockeytrojorsverige.xyz, jerseycheapchinaonline.com, jessandpaulontheroad.com, jordansneakers.club, kickscraze.com, kicksonly.com, kicksyeezybay.com, kickwho.me, kickzclub.net, kickzlocker.com, lebron14forsale.com, myfootballfactory.com, newcheapnfljersey.com, nfljerseyscheap.org, nfljerseyscheapfromchina.us, nhljerseyswholesalechinaonline.com, nicekicks.us, nicekickss.us, niceshoesdhui.com, nikekyrie3bhm.com, nikeshoeshotstore.com, nk-sport.co.uk, nmdadidasus.com, nmdaustralia.com, nmdrunnerstore.com, originalsnmd.co.uk, ottosspecialtyfoods.com, p2all.com, perfectkicks.site, perfectsneakers.com, perfectyeezy.com, perfectyeezys.com, pharrellwilliamshappy.com, popyeezys.net, reebokamsterdam.com, reebokau.com, reebokcheap.co.uk, reebokclassicstore.com, reebokcrossfitaustralia.com, reebokgreece.net, reebokhnljerseys.com, reebokmadrid.com, reebokonline.us, reebokoutlet.store, reebokrunningshoesuk.info, reebok-sale.com, reebokshaqattaq.us, reebokshoes.eu, reebokshoes.us, reebokstoreoutlet.com, saleyeezyshop.com, scarpe-yeezy.com, sellyeezys.net, shoeout.co, shoesadidassale.com, shoes-store.us, snapshopgo.com, sneakercollege.com, sneakersadis.com, sneakerschuheshopde.com, sneakerselections.com, sneakerskicksuk.com, sneakersports.com, sneakersreebok.com, soccerboots1.com, somersetpub.co.uk, sportsbootsdirect.co.uk, staffoflifeshawano.com, stockyeezy350.com, teambiel.com, thefavorsboutique.com, thefurniturebarnbray.com, theswampbar.com, topadidas.com, topshoeus.com, trade2015.net, traineruksale.com, trois-accords.com, ultraboost2017.com, uscustodialproductsco.com, usreebokclearance.com, vibeburnaby.com, wholesalechinanfljerseys.org, wholesaleelitejerseysonline.com, wholesalejerseyfromchinabiz.com, wholesalejerseyscheaper.com, wholesalejerseyschinacenter.com, wholesalelimitedjerseys.com, wholesalenfljerseysforcheapest.com, wholesale-soccerjersey.co, WilsonTimber.co.uk, xtrikots.com, yeezy350black.com, yeezy350boostau.co, yeezy350boostfr.co, yeezy350boostv3.us, yeezy350pro.com, yeezy350s.com, yeezy350v2s.com, yeezyboost350-v2.com, yeezyboost350-v2s.com, yeezyboost350v2sale.com, yeezyboost750uk.co, yeezyboost-online.com, yeezyboostseasonsale.com, yeezyboostshoes.co.uk, yeezyboost-shop.com, yeezyboost-up.com, yeezybuy.net, yeezybykanye.com, yeezycollector.com, yeezydaily.com, yeezykat.com, yeezykickss.com, yeezymark.com, yeezyoutletuk.com, yeezyperfect.com, yeezys350forsale.com, yeezys350v3.com, yeezysale.co, yeezysboost350.uk, yeezysboost350ol.us, yeezysforsale.store, yeezy-shoes.us, yeezy-shoesinc.com, yeezysshoes.us, yeezysupplyau.com, yeezysupplyss.com, yeezywat.com, yesyeezy.me, yesyeezy.online, yesyeezy.org, yesyeezy.shop and zdkshop.com. (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (rms1) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (rms1) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief And Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10280381, filed by adidas International Marketing B.V., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the adidas Marks, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Reebok Marks)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less