This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2017 at 04:41:01 (UTC).

Adell, Mark v. Boughton, Gary et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 Adell, Mark filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Boughton, Gary. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00877

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Anthony Adell

Boscobel, WI 53805

Defendants

Ellen Ray

Jane Does

Gary Boughton

Kristen Running

Mary Bartels

Beth Edge

Sandra McArdle

Jolinda Waterman

Not Classified By Court

WSPF Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Corey Francis Finkelmeyer

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 11/7/2017. #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee GRANTED. #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Waive Initial Partial Filing Fee GRANTED. Plaintiff PERMITTED to proceed on the following claims: deliberate indifference to serious medical needs, in violation of the Eighth Amendment, against all Defendants; and retaliation, in violation of the First Amendment, against Defendants Jolina Waterman, Beth Edge, K. Running, M. Bartels, and Jane Does. Copies of Plaintiff's Complaint and this Order to be electronically SENT to the Wisconsin DOJ for service on Defendants, who shall file a responsive pleading within 60 days. Agency having custody of Plaintiff to COLLECT the balance of the filing fee from his institution trust account in accordance with this Order. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mark Anthony Adell and Warden at Wisconsin Secure Program Facility) (jm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

#11

(#11) Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-01434. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak) (Entered: 11/17/2017)

#10

(#10) Order signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 11/17/2017 to TRANSFER CASE to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin. Clerk of Court DIRECTED to take all appropriate steps to effectuate this transfer. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mark Anthony Adell at Wisconsin Secure Program Facility)(jm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 11/17/2017)

9 #3

Cover Letter

9 #2

Copy of [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee

9 #1

Bookmarked Exhibits

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mark Anthony Adell. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Exhibits, #2 Copy of #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee, #3 Cover Letter)(mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 11/13/2017)

#6

(#6) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Mark Anthony Adell. (lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2017)

#5

(#5) ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/23/2017 that on or before 11/13/2017, Plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $1.45 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mark Anthony Adell and Warden at Wisconsin Secure Program Facility)(jm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 10/23/2017)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Mark Anthony Adell. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 10/20/2017)

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Bookmarked Exhibits

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mark Anthony Adell. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Exhibits, #2 Cover Letter)(mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 10/20/2017)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 11/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-01434. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak) (Entered: 11/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Order signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 11/17/2017 to TRANSFER CASE to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin. Clerk of Court DIRECTED to take all appropriate steps to effectuate this transfer. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mark Anthony Adell at Wisconsin Secure Program Facility)(jm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 11/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mark Anthony Adell. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Exhibits, #2 Copy of #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee, #3 Cover Letter)(mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 11/7/2017. #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee GRANTED. #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Waive Initial Partial Filing Fee GRANTED. Plaintiff PERMITTED to proceed on the following claims: deliberate indifference to serious medical needs, in violation of the Eighth Amendment, against all Defendants; and retaliation, in violation of the First Amendment, against Defendants Jolina Waterman, Beth Edge, K. Running, M. Bartels, and Jane Does. Copies of Plaintiff's Complaint and this Order to be electronically SENT to the Wisconsin DOJ for service on Defendants, who shall file a responsive pleading within 60 days. Agency having custody of Plaintiff to COLLECT the balance of the filing fee from his institution trust account in accordance with this Order. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mark Anthony Adell and Warden at Wisconsin Secure Program Facility) (jm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Waive Initial Partial Filing Fee by Mark Anthony Adell. (Attachments: #1 Disbursement Request)(lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Mark Anthony Adell. (lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 10/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/23/2017 that on or before 11/13/2017, Plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $1.45 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mark Anthony Adell and Warden at Wisconsin Secure Program Facility)(jm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 10/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Mark Anthony Adell. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 10/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from the clerk to Mark Anthony Adell re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form and trust account statement be filed within 21 days (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 10/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Mark Anthony Adell. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 10/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mark Anthony Adell. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Exhibits, #2 Cover Letter)(mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/17/2017.] (Entered: 10/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less