This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:36:18 (UTC).

Adams v. Osborne et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Adams filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Osborne. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-00102

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Adams

Defendants

Steve Towler

Bob Green

William L. Boblett, Jr.

Linda Day

John Does

Jana Osborne

Kimberly Fitch

Bobby Jack Woods

Randall Stapleton

Boyd County Fiscal Court

Tim Wechsler

Boyd County School Board

Tammy Pruitt

Dr. Judy Nichols

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sebastian M. Joy

Attorney at Joy Law Office

2710 Louisa St, P.O. Box 411

Catlettsburg, KY 41129

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey C. Mando

Attorney at Adams, Stepner, Woltermann & Dusing, PLLC

40 W. Pike Street

Covington, KY 41011

Elizabeth Anna Deener

Attorney at Landrum & Shouse LLP - Lexington

106 W. Vine Street, Suite 800, P.O. Box 951

Lexington, KY 40588-951

John G. McNeill

Attorney at Landrum & Shouse LLP - Lexington

106 W. Vine Street, Suite 800, P.O. Box 951

Lexington, KY 40588-951

Tia Jenay Combs

Attorney at Mazanac, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.

230 Lexington Green Circle, Suite 605

Lexington, KY 40503

Teresa Taylor Combs

Attorney at Mazanac, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.

230 Lexington Green Circle, Suite 605

Lexington, KY 40503

Christina L. Vessels

Attorney at Mazanac, Raskin & Ryder Co., L.P.A.

230 Lexington Green Circle, Suite 605

Lexington, KY 40503

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Memorandum in Support

#14

(#14) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Linda Day, Bob Green, Dr. Judy Nichols, Tammy Pruitt, Randall Stapleton (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Deener, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#13

(#13) FIRST REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Joy, Sebastian) Modified on 11/27/2018 to add filers (JLS). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: By 11/16/18, counsel conduct R26(f) meeting; 2)at time of meeting, exchange R26(a)(1) disclosures and supplement thereafter when required by R26(e); 3) Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/1/2018 w/info listed herein.. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 11/6/18.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Boyd County Fiscal Court, Steve Towler, Tim Wechsler(Individually), Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Individually).(Mando, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

1 #13

Summons Jana Osborne

1 #12

Summons Kimberly Fitch

1 #11

Summons William L. Boblett, Jr.

1 #10

Summons Bob Green

1 #9

Summons Boyd County School Board

1 #7

Summons Tammy Pruitt

1 #6

Summons Linda Day

1 #5

Summons Dr. Judy Nichols

1 #4

Summons Tim Wechsler

1 #3

Summons Bobby Jack Woods

1 #2

Summons Steve Towler

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Linda Day, Bob Green, Dr. Judy Nichols, Tammy Pruitt, Randall Stapleton (KSS) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Linda Day, Bob Green, Dr. Judy Nichols, Tammy Pruitt, Randall Stapleton (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Deener, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JLS) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FIRST REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Joy, Sebastian) Modified on 11/27/2018 to add filers (JLS). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: By 11/16/18, counsel conduct R26(f) meeting; 2)at time of meeting, exchange R26(a)(1) disclosures and supplement thereafter when required by R26(e); 3) Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/1/2018 w/info listed herein.. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 11/6/18.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Boyd County Fiscal Court, Steve Towler, Tim Wechsler(Individually), Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Individually).(Mando, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by William L. Boblett, Jr(In His Official Capacity as Superintendent of Boyd County School District), William L. Boblett, Jr(Individually), Boyd County School Board, Linda Day, Kimberly Fitch(In Her Official Capacity as Principal of Boyd County Middle School), Kimberly Fitch(Individually), Bob Green, Dr. Judy Nichols, Tammy Pruitt, Randall Stapleton.(Deener, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Upon agreement of the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants Kimberly Fitch, Ind., and Official capacity, William L. Boblett, Jr. Ind. and in his Official Capacity, Bob Green, Randall Stapleton, Tammy Pruitt, Linda Day, Dr. Judy Nichols in their official capacities as Board Members of the Boyd County School Board, and the Boyd County School Board be and are hereby granted an extension of time up through and including November 5, 2018 to file an Answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/31/18.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***PROPOSED AGREED ORDER SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #8 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extension of time to answer by William L. Boblett, Jr(In His Official Capacity as Superintendent of Boyd County School District), William L. Boblett, Jr(Individually), Boyd County School Board, Linda Day, Kim (KSS) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extension of time to answer by William L. Boblett, Jr(In His Official Capacity as Superintendent of Boyd County School District), William L. Boblett, Jr(Individually), Boyd County School Board, Linda Day, Kimberly Fitch(In Her Official Capacity as Principal of Boyd County Middle School), Kimberly Fitch(Individually), Bob Green, Dr. Judy Nichols, Tammy Pruitt, Randall Stapleton. (Deener, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/31/2018 to add filers (KSS). (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Jana Osborne(In Her Official Capacity As Assistant Principal of Boyd County Middle School), Jana Osborne(Individually).(Vessels, Christina) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Adams via private server to William L. Boblett, Jr(In His Official Capacity as Superintendent of Boyd County School District) served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018; William L. Boblett, Jr(Individually) served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018; Linda Day served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; Kimberly Fitch(In Her Official Capacity as Principal of Boyd County Middle School) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Kimberly Fitch(Individually) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Bob Green served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; Dr. Judy Nichols served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; Jana Osborne(In Her Official Capacity As Assistant Principal of Boyd County Middle School) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Jana Osborne(Individually) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Tammy Pruitt served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; Randall Stapleton served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; Steve Towler served on 10/3/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Tim Wechsler(Individually) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Bobby Jack Woods(In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department) served on 10/3/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Bobby Jack Woods(Individually) served on 10/3/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Joy, Sebastian) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AGREED ORDER : #4 Proposed Agreed Order Boyd County Fiscal Court, Steve Towler, Tim Wechsler(Individually), Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods (Individually) and Bobby Jack Woods (In His Official Capacity as Boyd County Sheriff), Be and Are Hereby Granted an extension of time up through and including 11/5/2018 to file an Answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/23/18.(JLS)cc: COR (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: #4 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Boyd County Fiscal Court, Steve Towler, Tim Wechsler(Individually), Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department (JLS) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Boyd County Fiscal Court, Steve Towler, Tim Wechsler(Individually), Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Individually). (Mando, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/22/2018 to add filer (JLS). (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to William L. Boblett, Jr(In His Official Capacity as Superintendent of Boyd County School District), William L. Boblett, Jr(Individually), Boyd County Fiscal Court, Boyd County School Board, Linda Day, Kimberly Fitch(In Her Official Capacity as Principal of Boyd County Middle School), Kimberly Fitch(Individually), Bob Green, Dr. Judy Nichols, Jana Osborne(In Her Official Capacity As Assistant Principal of Boyd County Middle School), Jana Osborne(Individually), Tammy Pruitt, Randall Stapleton, Steve Towler, Tim Wechsler(Individually), Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Individually); Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLS) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (JLS) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4181690), filed by Michael Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Steve Towler, #3 Summons Bobby Jack Woods, #4 Summons Tim Wechsler, #5 Summons Dr. Judy Nichols, #6 Summons Linda Day, #7 Summons Tammy Pruitt, #8 Summons Randall Stapleton, #9 Summons Boyd County School Board, #10 Summons Bob Green, #11 Summons William L. Boblett, Jr., #12 Summons Kimberly Fitch, #13 Summons Jana Osborne)(JLS) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.