This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:03:11 (UTC).

Adams et al v. Adient US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 Adams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Adient US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edward G. Bryant and J. Daniel Breen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01179

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Edward G. Bryant

Presiding Judge

J. Daniel Breen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shari Carter

Joyce D Adams

Francene Burton

Tiffany Burcham

Wanda Wilkinson

Betty J Maness

Amber Tulley

Patricia Yarbro

Roy Montgomery

Betty J Blankenship

Sarah Derryberry

John Belanger

Ricky Renfroe

Mary O'Dell

Pamela Melton

Brent Duke

Danny J Kee

Danny R Ratliff

Dana Williams

Defendant

Adient US LLC

145 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven J. Baker

Attorney at Steven J. Paker, P.A.

15 West La Rua Street

Pensacola, FL 32501

Robert Steve Beal

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEVE BEAL

22 Monroe Avenue

Lexington, TN 38351

Malcolm Brown Futhey, III

Attorney at THE FUTHEY LAW FIRM PLC

1440 Poplar Avenue

Memphis, TN 38104

W. Taylor Stewart

Attorney at Stewart & Stewart, P.C.

1021 Noble Street, Site 110

Anniston, AL 36201

Donald W. Stewart

Attorney at Stewart & Stewart, P.C.

1021 Noble Street, Suite 110

Anniston, AL 36201

Lena D. Beal

Attorney at BEAL LAW OFFICE

22 Monroe Ave.

Lexington, TN 38351

Defendant Attorneys

Bradford David Box

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL

P.O. Box 1147, 209 E. Main Street

Jackson, TN 38302-1147

Leah A Dundon

Attorney at BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C.

1350 I Street N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20005

Harold L. Segall

Attorney at BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND PC

1350 I Street, N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20005-3311

Other Attorneys

James E. Romzek

Attorney at Warner Norcross & Judd LLP

45000 River Ridge Drive, Suite 300

Clinton Twp, MI 48038

Richard J. Bedell

Brett Hartman Knight

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

Joseph F. Welborn, III

Attorney at WALKER TIPPS & MALONE

2300 One Nashville Place, 150 Fourth Avenue North

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint as of right pursuant to Rule 15a, proposed order submitted, by All Plaintiffs. (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#34

(#34) ORDER GRANTING #33 DEFENDANTS ADIENT US LLC AND JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.'S AGREED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 11/9/18. (skc) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

33 #2

Certificate of Consultation

33 #1

Memorandum Of Law in Support

#33

(#33) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand proposed order submitted by Adient US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law in Support, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Box, Bradford) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

32 #4

Exhibit D

32 #3

Exhibit C

32 #2

Exhibit B

#32

(#32) Notice of Correction to #23 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Exhibits being re-filed as separate attachments). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dundon, Leah) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

6 #2

Certificate of Consultation Certificate of Consultation

6 #1

Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to

#6

(#7) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT #6 Adient US LLC and Johnson Controls, Inc. answer due 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 9/19/18. (skc) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (cdi) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C- Declaration of James Romzek

1 #2

Exhibit B - Written Consent to Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adient US LLC from Henderson County Circuit Court, case number 18091-3 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2879825), filed by Adient US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Written Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit C- Declaration of James Romzek, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Box, Bradford) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint as of right pursuant to Rule 15a, proposed order submitted, by All Plaintiffs. (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER GRANTING #33 DEFENDANTS ADIENT US LLC AND JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.'S AGREED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 11/9/18. (skc) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand proposed order submitted by Adient US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law in Support, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Box, Bradford) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Notice of Correction to #23 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Exhibits being re-filed as separate attachments). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dundon, Leah) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE by Charles E Adams re #29 Reply to Response to Motion withdrawing arguments related to purported non-filing of affidavits (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' AGREED #28 MOTION FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND THE AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS PLAN TO FILE. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 11/8/18. (mbm) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order attached by Adient US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Agreed Motion for Further Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and the Amended Complaint Plaintiffs Plan to File, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Box, Bradford) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' #26 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 11/7/18. (mbm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION for Leave to File reply in support of motion remand, proposed order submitted, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Correction to #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,,,,,,,,,, (signature added to notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice of Ferro Corporation). (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charles E Adams, Joyce D Adams, Jimmy K Allen, Charlotte Angerstein, Ashley M Arnold, Jeannie Arnold, Toni Ball, Joe W Bartholomew, Mary L Bartholomew, John Belanger, Shelly Belanger, Larry T Belk, Deborah R Bingham, Jerry A Bingham, Angela Blankenship, Betty J Blankenship, Daniel Blankenship, Elaine B Blankenship, Florence Boatwright, Chris L Bostic, Eddie Bowman, Victoria Bradford, Amber Britt, Patricia L Britt, Tiffany Burcham, Evelyn Burkhead, Francene Burton, Jimmy Burton, Freddie G Carrington, Shari Carter, Shelia Clark, Jessie W Clenney, Karen J Clenney, Jacqueline Comer, Robert Compton, Jemma Cooper, Tameria K Corlew, Annette Couch, Susan Crowe, Charles Culver, Lanny D Culver, Mary F Defore, Sarah Derryberry, Brent Duke, Deena Duke, William H Duke, Beverly Dunaway, John P Dunaway, Lisa L Evans, JoAnn Faught, Tammy L Fessler, David Frizzell, Billie Golladay, Harold W Golladay, Lennon G Haggard, Carey Hart, Layne K Hart, Lisa Hart, Pamela Hart, Randy L Hart, Brenda Hayes, Cynthia G Hendrix, Gary Hendrix, Rex Herndon, Rhonda Hicks, Joseph M Holmes, Katie Holmes, James Hopewell, Kay Hughes, Arlinda Johnson, Carrie Jones, Franklin Jowers, Jean Jowers, Amanda Kee, Danny J Kee, Jerry E Kelly, Mike Landreth, Peggy Greene Lecroy, Linda Little, David Lunsford, David Mackey, Betty J Maness, Mack A Maness, Nancy H Maness, Ricky Maness, Ashley Mayo, Jerry McBride, Hazel McPeake, Betty Mchone, Dwight Melton, Pamela Melton, Marvin L Milburn, David A Miles, Donna Miles, Martha J Millen, Lawanda Montague, Roy Montgomery, Bobbie H Moore, Diann Nielson, Mary Norwood, Mary O'Dell, Douglas Pate, Harper Peacock, Antonio Pearson, Cori Perry, Gary L Pope, Helen Pope, James L Powers, Barbara Ratliff, Danny R Ratliff, Monica Rayas, Ricky Renfroe, Robert W Richardson, Royal Properties Inc., Richard Russell, Zachery Rutkowski, Gregory K Scott, Linda A Scott, Tommy S Scott, Bernice Segundo, Bobby Siegler, Timothy N Sikes, Donna Smith, Judy Smith, Kimberly Smith, Sarah Sorrell, Blake A Stanfill, Addison Stewart, Larry Taylor, Susan R Thomas, Tammie Todd, Stephanie Trotter, Amber Tulley, Chris Tulley, Tersea Tulley, Donald H Wadley, Margarett N Wadley, James J Walker, Ginger Wallace, Tammy Ward, Bruce E Webb, Mary M Webb, Samantha Wheeler, Margie Wigington, Wanda Wilkinson, Brian Williams, Dana Williams, Lana Williams, Ernest Williams, Jr., Aaron B Wilson, Tommy Wilson, Jeffrey L Wood, Brandon Woods, Jeffrey K Woods, Wilma F Woods, Dwanna Yarbro, Patricia Yarbro (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • (#8) SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2018, 10:00 A.M. CT in Chambers, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_Bryant@tnwd.uscourts.gov one weekprior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT #6 Adient US LLC and Johnson Controls, Inc. answer due 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 9/19/18. (skc) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by Adient US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Certificate of Consultation Certificate of Consultation)(Box, Bradford) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cdi) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cdi) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (cdi) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adient US LLC from Henderson County Circuit Court, case number 18091-3 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2879825), filed by Adient US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Written Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit C- Declaration of James Romzek, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Box, Bradford) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less